OKPOR v. DABO et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL OKPOR
Defendant: JOHN DOE #1-#10, CARLOS RODRIGUEZ, KANDE DABO, ABDUL FALL, CARLO SHIPPING INTERNATIONAL INC. and BILLOR JABBIE
Case Number: 1:2019cv09914
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00972. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 15, 2019 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
April 15, 2019 Original record transferred to the District of New Jersey via interdistrict transfer system (originally transferred on 3/25/2019; resent per Order #6 due to additional filing docketed after transfer).(md)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO FORWARD PLFF MICHAEL OKPOR'S OBJECTION (ECF NO. 5) TO THE CLERK OF COURT OF THE U.S.D.C. FOR THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY. OKPOR IS ADVISED TO SEND ALL FUTURE PLEADINGS TO THE CLERK OF COURT FOR THE U.S.D.C. FOR THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 4/11/19. 4/12/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLFF.(kw, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 OBJECTION TO TRANSFER TO US DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY, by MICHAEL OKPOR. (va, ) Modified on 4/11/2019 (md).
April 4, 2019 Letter mailed to pro se party regarding transfer of case. (va, )
March 25, 2019 Original record transferred to the District of New Jersey via interdistrict transfer system. (md)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT UPON CONSIDERATION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (ECF NO. #1 ) THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER THIS ACTION FORTHWITH TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY; THE MOTION IS LEFT TO THE DISCRETION OF THE TRANSFEREE COURT. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 03/15/2019.03/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(nd, )
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf)
March 7, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against CARLO SHIPPING INTERNATIONAL INC., KANDE DABO, ABDUL FALL, BILLOR JABBIE, JOHN DOE 1-10, CARLOS RODRIGUEZ, filed by MICHAEL OKPOR. (No Envelope Included).(ahf)
March 7, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY MICHAEL OKPOR.(ahf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/15/2019: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (cry, ).
March 7, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MICHAEL OKPOR. (ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OKPOR v. DABO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE #1-#10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARLOS RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KANDE DABO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABDUL FALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARLO SHIPPING INTERNATIONAL INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILLOR JABBIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL OKPOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?