REMTEK SERVICES, INC. v. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: REMTEK SERVICES, INC.
Defendant: JANE DOES 1-100, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 and JOHN DOES 1-100
Case Number: 1:2019cv12790
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Robert B Kugler
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER The Court has scheduled a telephone status conference for August 2, 2019, at 11:30 a.m. to address the July 10, 2019, joint letter from the parties. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 07/18/2019. (Solomon, D)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from Parties Regarding ESI and Protective Order re #11 Letter, #10 Scheduling Order. (DIEHL, ROBERT)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Defendant, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (REILEY, WILLIAM)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER IN ARBITRATION CASE: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/18/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 6/19/2019. (rss, )
June 19, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: In-Person Initial Conference held on 6/19/2019. (nar)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by PRISCILLA J. TRIOLO on behalf of REMTEK SERVICES, INC. (TRIOLO, PRISCILLA)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT ANTHONY DIEHL on behalf of REMTEK SERVICES, INC. (DIEHL, ROBERT)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by REMTEK SERVICES, INC.. (DIEHL, ROBERT)
June 13, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 7/15/2019 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rss, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. Responses due by 7/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(REILEY, WILLIAM)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER Due to a scheduling conflict, the Court hereby reschedules the in-person Initial Conference previously set for June 13, 2019. The new date and time of the in-person Initial Conference is June 19, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. in Room 2040 - Camden. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 5/30/19. (nar)
May 24, 2019 Clerk's Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/12/2019. (dmr)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(REILEY, WILLIAM)
May 22, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set for 6/13/2019 02:00 PM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 5/22/2019. (cry, )
May 22, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (cry, )
May 22, 2019 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (REILEY, WILLIAM)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. from Superior Court of New Jersey, case number L-460-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9685476), filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(REILEY, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REMTEK SERVICES, INC. v. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Represented By: WILLIAM PATRICK REILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REMTEK SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: ROBERT ANTHONY DIEHL
Represented By: PRISCILLA J. TRIOLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?