LENAPE REGIONAL HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION v. FLEX MEMBRANE INTERNATIONAL CORP. et al
Plaintiff: LENAPE REGIONAL HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION
Defendant: FLEX MEMBRANE INTERNATIONAL CORP., RONALD MARKS ASSOCIATES, INC. D/B/A RMA TECHNOLOGIES and RONALD MARKS ASSOCIATES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv13035
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph H Rodriguez
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by BRANDON RELL CROKER on behalf of LENAPE REGIONAL HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CROKER, BRANDON)
July 22, 2019 Filing 21 BRIEF in Opposition filed by LENAPE REGIONAL HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(MYERS, ANNE)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER in response to letter regarding third party complaint or amended pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 7/18/2019. (dmr)
July 17, 2019 Filing 19 Letter from Timothy P. Malacrida, Esq. on behalf of Defendant Ronald Marks Associates, d/b/a RMA Technologies. (MALACRIDA, TIMOTHY)
July 17, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #18 MOTION for Leave to File a Third-Party Complaint. Motion set for 8/19/2019 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
July 16, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File a Third-Party Complaint by FLEX MEMBRANE INTERNATIONAL CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Certification)(CHENEY, WILLIAM)
July 8, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by RONALD MARKS ASSOCIATES, INC. re #6 MOTION to Dismiss in lieu of Answer (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MALACRIDA, TIMOTHY)
July 1, 2019 Filing 16 BRIEF in Opposition filed by LENAPE REGIONAL HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION re #6 MOTION to Dismiss in lieu of Answer (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(MYERS, ANNE)
June 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment. Motion set for 8/5/2019 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by LENAPE REGIONAL HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MYERS, ANNE)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: In-person Status Conference set for 10/29/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 2/28/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/30/2020, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/21/2019. (dmr)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCHNEIDER'S STANDING ORDER IN ALL CIVIL CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/21/2019. (dmr)
June 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment. Motion set for 7/15/2019 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
June 19, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 6/19/2019. (tf, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment by FLEX MEMBRANE INTERNATIONAL CORP.. Responses due by 7/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Statement of Material Facts, #3 Brief on Behalf of Deft. Flex Membrane International in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R.Civ. P. 12(b)(6), #4 Certification of William W. Cheney, III, Esquire, #5 Exhibit A through G, #6 Exhibit H through Z, #7 Exhibit AA through MM, #8 Certificate of Service)(CHENEY, WILLIAM)
June 12, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss in lieu of Answer. Motion set for 7/15/2019 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by LENAPE REGIONAL HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION re #6 MOTION to Dismiss in lieu of Answer (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MYERS, ANNE)
June 12, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE -. A 6.1 Application for a Clerk's extension #9 was incorrectly submitted using the Motion event. The Clerk is not able to grant 6.1 Applications in regards to a motion. Please review the rule regarding extensions for motions and submit a proper request using the "Letter Rule 7.1" event found under Responses and Replies. event This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dmr)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by LENAPE REGIONAL HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MYERS, ANNE)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss in lieu of Answer by LENAPE REGIONAL HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MYERS, ANNE)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FLEX MEMBRANE INTERNATIONAL CORP.. (MEAD, WILLIAM)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RONALD MARKS ASSOCIATES, INC. D/B/A RMA TECHNOLOGIES. (MALACRIDA, TIMOTHY)
June 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss in lieu of Answer. Motion set for 7/1/2019 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss in lieu of Answer by RONALD MARKS ASSOCIATES, INC. D/B/A RMA TECHNOLOGIES. Responses due by 6/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Brief, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit Exhibit G)(MALACRIDA, TIMOTHY)
June 4, 2019 Clerk's Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by FLEX MEMBRANE INTERNATIONAL CORP. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/19/2019. (dmr)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant, Flex Membrane International Corp... (MEAD, WILLIAM)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY PAUL MALACRIDA on behalf of RONALD MARKS ASSOCIATES, INC. D/B/A RMA TECHNOLOGIES (MALACRIDA, TIMOTHY)
May 30, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (ssp, )
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set for 6/19/2019 02:00 PM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 5/30/2019. (ssp, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by ANNE ROBBINS MYERS on behalf of LENAPE REGIONAL HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MYERS, ANNE)
May 29, 2019 Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FLEX MEMBRANE INTERNATIONAL CORP. from SUPERIOR COURT BURLINGTON COUNTY, case number BUR L 2041 17. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9700988), filed by FLEX MEMBRANE INTERNATIONAL CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT B, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT C, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT D, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT E, #7 Exhibit EXHIBIT F, #8 Certificate of Service)(MEAD, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LENAPE REGIONAL HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION v. FLEX MEMBRANE INTERNATIONAL CORP. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LENAPE REGIONAL HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION
Represented By: R. TAYLOR RUILOVA
Represented By: ANNE ROBBINS MYERS
Represented By: BRANDON RELL CROKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLEX MEMBRANE INTERNATIONAL CORP.
Represented By: WILLIAM C. MEAD, JR.
Represented By: WILLIAM WENDELL CHENEY, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD MARKS ASSOCIATES, INC. D/B/A RMA TECHNOLOGIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD MARKS ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By: TIMOTHY PAUL MALACRIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?