ECKSTEIN et al v. SARKISSIAN
Plaintiff: CRAIG M. ECKSTEIN and MURRAY S. ECKSTEIN
Defendant: KAREN H. SARKISSIAN
Case Number: 1:2019cv13392
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 7/30/2019 on the record. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder Electronic Court Recorder.) (rss, )
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 3:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the telephone call. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 7/30/2019. (slc, n.m.)
July 30, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). Motion set for 9/3/2019 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 8/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(RUBINO, LOUIS)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: Upon the letter application of Defendant, and there being no objection by counsel for Plaintiff, the initial scheduling conference on 7/16/2019 shall be, and is hereby, ADJOURNED. The Court has RESCHEDULED the initial scheduling conference for 7/30/2019 at 12:00 Noon in Courtroom 3B. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 7/15/2019. (slc, n.m.)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED Notice of Removal with counterclaim by KAREN H. SARKISSIAN. Amendment to #4 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(rss, )
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Defendant shall have fifteen (15) days to amend her notice of removal, etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 7/8/2019. (rss, n.m.)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 CLAIM Answer to Counterclaim by CRAIG M. ECKSTEIN, MURRAY S. ECKSTEIN. (JANKA, DARIA)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against MURRAY S. ECKSTEIN, CRAIG M. ECKSTEIN by KAREN H. SARKISSIAN.(rss, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by DARIA BOJIDAROVA JANKA on behalf of CRAIG M. ECKSTEIN, MURRAY S. ECKSTEIN (JANKA, DARIA)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Initial Conference set for 7/16/2019 10:30 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 6/5/2019. (cry, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by KAREN H. SARKISSIAN from SUPERIOR COURT OF NJ, CAPE MAY COUNTY, case number C 23 19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number CAM010485), filed by KAREN H. SARKISSIAN. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(cry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ECKSTEIN et al v. SARKISSIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRAIG M. ECKSTEIN
Represented By: LOUIS G. RUBINO
Represented By: DARIA BOJIDAROVA JANKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MURRAY S. ECKSTEIN
Represented By: LOUIS G. RUBINO
Represented By: DARIA BOJIDAROVA JANKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAREN H. SARKISSIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?