TROCKI v. PENN NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: IRA TROCKI
Defendant: PENN NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv13638
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by SAMUEL EDWARD PAUL on behalf of PENN NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (PAUL, SAMUEL)
August 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). Motion set for 9/3/2019 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by PENN NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. Responses due by 8/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(MANDIA, WILLIAM)
July 9, 2019 CLERK'S TEXT ORDER - The Application for a Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer - Document #8 submitted by PENN NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY on 7/8//2019 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/2/2019).. (dmr)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Amended Complaint by PENN NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (MANDIA, WILLIAM)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM THOMAS MANDIA on behalf of PENN NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (MANDIA, WILLIAM)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PENN NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by IRA TROCKI.(BARBONE, LOUIS)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Plaintiff shall have fifteen (15) days to amend its complaint, etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 6/21/2019. (rss, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PENN NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by IRA TROCKI.(BARBONE, LOUIS)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have fifteen (15) days to amend its complaint to properly comply with 28 U.S.C. 1332, etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 6/18/2019. (dmr)
June 12, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PENN NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, no later than the first Rule 16 conference.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 6/12/2019. (cry, )
June 11, 2019 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PENN NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9734819) with JURY DEMAND, filed by IRA TROCKI.(BARBONE, LOUIS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TROCKI v. PENN NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENN NATIONAL MUTUAL CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: SAMUEL EDWARD PAUL
Represented By: WILLIAM THOMAS MANDIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRA TROCKI
Represented By: LOUIS M. BARBONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?