BORCHERS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL BORCHERS
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2019cv13670
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dd, )
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Granting Application to Proceed Without the Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 6/20/19. (dd, )
June 13, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the SUMMONS attached to docket entry #2 filed by the Clerk's office on 6/13/2019 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (cry, )
June 13, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Complaint entered by CRYSTAL BORCHERS on 6/12/2019 was submitted with an Application for In forma pauperis (IFP). For future filings of complaints with an IFP application please use the event COMPLAINT RECEIVED, which can be found under Service of Process. This message is for informational purposes only. (cry, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
June 12, 2019 Judge Noel L. Hillman added. (dd, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CRYSTAL BORCHERS, filed by CRYSTAL BORCHERS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 COVER LETTER, #3 Application IFP IFP APPLICATION, #4 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER, #5 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #6 Summons SUMMONS)(MOWDAY, GRAHAM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2019: #7 Text of Proposed Order) (cry, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BORCHERS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL BORCHERS
Represented By: GRAHAM THOMAS MOWDAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?