LABORERS' LOCAL UNION NOS. 472 & 172 AND LABORERS' LOCAL UNION NOS. 472 AND 172 WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS AND SAFETY, EDUCATION AND TRAINING FUNDS et al v. RTW CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Petitioner: ZAZZALI, FAGELLA, NOWAK, KLEINBAUM & FRIEDMAN PC and LABORERS' LOCAL UNION NOS. 472 & 172 AND LABORERS' LOCAL UNION NOS. 472 AND 172 WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS AND SAFETY, EDUCATION AND TRAINING FUNDS
Respondent: RTW CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv13890
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (rss, )
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #2 Motion to Confirm Arbitration. Judgment entered in favor of Petitioner against Respondent RTW CONSTRUCTION, INC. in the amount of $6,487.87. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 7/16/2019. (rss, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LABORERS' LOCAL UNION NOS. 472 & 172 AND LABORERS' LOCAL UNION NOS. 472 AND 172 WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS AND SAFETY, EDUCATION AND TRAINING FUNDS. (O'HARE, EDWARD)
June 18, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award Motion to Confirm. Motion set for 7/15/2019 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (cry, )
June 18, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, )
June 17, 2019 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration award Motion to Confirm by LABORERS' LOCAL UNION NOS. 472 & 172 AND LABORERS' LOCAL UNION NOS. 472 AND 172 WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS AND SAFETY, EDUCATION AND TRAINING FUNDS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(O'HARE, EDWARD)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award Motion to Confirm ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9747538.), filed by LABORERS' LOCAL UNION NOS. 472 & 172 AND LABORERS' LOCAL UNION NOS. 472 AND 172 WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS AND SAFETY, EDUCATION AND TRAINING FUNDS. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Edward H. O'Hare, Esq., #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'HARE, EDWARD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LABORERS' LOCAL UNION NOS. 472 & 172 AND LABORERS' LOCAL UNION NOS. 472 AND 172 WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS AND SAFETY, EDUCATION AND TRAINING FUNDS et al v. RTW CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ZAZZALI, FAGELLA, NOWAK, KLEINBAUM & FRIEDMAN PC
Represented By: EDWARD H. O'HARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LABORERS' LOCAL UNION NOS. 472 & 172 AND LABORERS' LOCAL UNION NOS. 472 AND 172 WELFARE AND PENSION FUNDS AND SAFETY, EDUCATION AND TRAINING FUNDS
Represented By: EDWARD H. O'HARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RTW CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?