DERRY v. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Petitioner: MYKAL DERRY
Respondent: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv13906
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF HIS PETITION UNDER 28 U.S.C., 2255 by MYKAL DERRY (rss, )
July 23, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (rtm, )
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER administratively terminating this case. ORDERED that if wishes to re-open this action, he shall so notify the Court within 30 days of the date of entry of this Order, etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 7/22/2019. (rtm, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney FABIANA PIERRE-LOUIS terminated. Attorney PATRICK C. ASKIN for THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA added.. (ASKIN, PATRICK)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) In Re to Criminal Case file 14-0050(NLH), filed by MYKAL DERRY. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Envelope)(cry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DERRY v. THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MYKAL DERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: FABIANA PIERRE-LOUIS
Represented By: PATRICK C. ASKIN
Represented By: FABIANA PIERRE-LOUIS(do not use)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?