DRAUGHN v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: KANISHA DRAUGHN
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE REGIONAL CHIEF COUNSEL and UNITED STATES ATTORNEY - DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY
Case Number: 1:2019cv14779
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 Administrative Record Filed - Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9, #9 Part 10, #10 Part 11, #11 Part 12, #12 Part 13)(LEACH, DAVID)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID LANCE LEACH on behalf of COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (LEACH, DAVID)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KANISHA DRAUGHN. ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 7/22/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (JARVIS, ADRIENNE)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KANISHA DRAUGHN. OFFICE OF THE REGIONAL CHIEF COUNSEL served on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (JARVIS, ADRIENNE)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KANISHA DRAUGHN. (JARVIS, ADRIENNE)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from ADRIENNE F. JARVIS. (JARVIS, ADRIENNE)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KANISHA DRAUGHN. UNITED STATES ATTORNEY - DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY served on 7/22/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (JARVIS, ADRIENNE)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
July 10, 2019 COMPLAINT #1 against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by KANISHA DRAUGHN.(cry, )
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Granting plaintiff's IFP application. ORDERED that the Clerk shall file the complaint. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 7/9/2019. (cry, )
July 8, 2019 Judge Noel L. Hillman added. (dd, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application IFP)(JARVIS, ADRIENNE) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2019: #3 Text of Proposed Order) (ssp, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DRAUGHN v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: DAVID LANCE LEACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF THE REGIONAL CHIEF COUNSEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES ATTORNEY - DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KANISHA DRAUGHN
Represented By: ADRIENNE FREYA JARVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?