DIMARCO et al v. COATES et al
Plaintiff: JOHN F DIMARCO and JOSEPH SERPENTE
Defendant: COATES INNOVATIONS, LLC and LORI COATES
Case Number: 1:2019cv15597
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER Upon letter application dated September 11, 2019 from William S. Bloom, Esquire, counsel for defendant, and it appearing that all counsel consent to the request to permit defendant to appear by telephone for the in-person Settlement Conference, the Court hereby GRANTS the request. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 9/11/19. (nar)
September 11, 2019 Filing 15 Letter. (BLOOM, WILLIAM)
September 4, 2019 Filing 14 Letter from Defendant re #12 Order,, Set Hearings,. (BLOOM, WILLIAM)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER In light of the August 29, 2019, Order scheduling an in-person settlement conference for October 23, 2019, and administratively terminating this matter (Dkt. No. #12 ), the Initial Conference scheduled for September 5, 2019, is hereby ADJOURNED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 08/30/2019. (Solomon, D)
August 29, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (dmr)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER scheduling an in-person Settlement Conference for 10/23/2019 at 2:00 PM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams, etc.; ORDERED that this matter is ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED, subject to reactivation upon notice from the parties that settlement efforts have been unsuccessful, etc. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/29/2019. (dmr)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Renee Marie Bumb: Telephone Pre-Motion Conference held on 8/28/2019. (Court Reporter Ted Formaroli) (ar1, )
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER The Court has received the parties pre-motion conference letters, regarding Defendants proposed motion to dismiss [Dkt. Nos. 6, 9], and finds that such a conference would be helpful in this instance. The Court will therefore hold a pre-motion telephonic conference on this matter on Wednesday, August 28, at 3:30 PM. The parties should be prepared to discuss their respective valuations of the amount in controversy in this matter. Counsel for Defendants shall kindly initiate the conference call.. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 08/14/2019. (Costigan, Roberta)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 Letter re #6 Letter. (PYRICH, ALISSA)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER This matter comes before the Court upon the pre-motion conference letter filed by Defendants Lori Coates and Coates Innovations, LLC, on July 29, 2019 [Dkt. No. 6]. Plaintiffs John F. DiMarco and Joseph Serpente have failed to address Defendants letter within five (5) business days as required under Paragraph I.A of this Courts Individual Rules and Procedures. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall show cause before this Court within three (3) business, explaining why they have failed to timely respond AND why the relief Defendants seek in their pre-motion letter should not be granted. If no response is filed, the Court will likely dismiss this matter for failure to prosecute, subject to re-opening only upon good cause shown. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 08/08/2019. (Costigan, Roberta)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ALISSA PYRICH on behalf of JOHN F DIMARCO, JOSEPH SERPENTE (PYRICH, ALISSA)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 Letter. (BLOOM, WILLIAM)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER This matter comes before the Court upon a pre-motion letter filed by Defendants Lori Coates and Coates Innovations, LLC, on July 25, 2019 [Dkt. No. 4], regarding a proposed Motion to Dismiss. Although Defendants state that they plan to seek dismissal on personal jurisdiction grounds, the letter is otherwise devoid of any information regarding the nature of the claims set forth in Plaintiff's Complaint, a rebuttal of the stated basis for personal jurisdiction in Plaintiff's Complaint, or an explanation of why Defendants removed the matter to this Court if personal jurisdiction was lacking. Defendant is hereby ORDERED to submit a new pre-motion letter addressing these issues within three (3) business days. Plaintiffs should wait to submit a response until after Defendants' new letter is filed.. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 07/26/2019. (Costigan, Roberta)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Letter. (BLOOM, WILLIAM)
July 19, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ssp, )
July 19, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The State Court Complaint submitted by ALISSA PYRICH appears to have address information that does not match the court's records. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account under the 'Utilities' tab in CM/ECF. (ssp, )
July 19, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ssp, )
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set for 9/5/2019 02:30 PM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 7/19/2019. (ssp, )
July 19, 2019 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LORI COATES, COATES INNOVATIONS. (BLOOM, WILLIAM)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COATES INNOVATIONS, LORI COATES from Burlington Superior Court, case number L-1188-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9828714), filed by COATES INNOVATIONS, LORI COATES. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence, #2 Exhibit)(BLOOM, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIMARCO et al v. COATES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN F DIMARCO
Represented By: ALISSA PYRICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH SERPENTE
Represented By: ALISSA PYRICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COATES INNOVATIONS, LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM S. BLOOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORI COATES
Represented By: WILLIAM S. BLOOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?