ROTHMAN v. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Appellant: BERNARD ANDREW ROTHMAN
Appellee: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv16309
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Robert B Kugler
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF of Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Third Brief, #2 Fourth Brief)(rtm, )(nm)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MARTHA B. CHOVANES on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (CHOVANES, MARTHA)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF of Plaintiff (rtm, )(nm)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Counter DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Parties wishing to review the actual documents listed on the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s docket sheet should refer to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s records. At the direction of this Court, counsel for the appellant must furnish paper copies of these documents directly to the Chambers of the Honorable Kugler, U.S. District Judge. These courtesy copies should be clearly marked as `Courtesy Copies` and should contain the U.S. District Court civil docket number. Pursuant to Federal Bankruptcy Rule 8018 (a), unless otherwise ordered, the appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days after the docketing of the notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically;the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days of service of the appellant`s brief;the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellee`s brief. Appellant Brief due by 9/23/2019. (dd, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by BERNARD ANDREW ROTHMAN re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Parties wishing to review the actual documents listed on the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s docket sheet should refer to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s records. At the direction of this Court, counsel for the appellant must furnish paper copies of these documents directly to the Chambers of the Honorable Kugler, U.S. District Judge. These courtesy copies should be clearly marked as `Courtesy Copies` and should contain the U.S. District Court civil docket number. Pursuant to Federal Bankruptcy Rule 8018 (a), unless otherwise ordered, the appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days after the docketing of the notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically;the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days of service of the appellant`s brief;the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellee`s brief. Appellant Brief due by 9/23/2019. (dd, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by BERNARD ANDREW ROTHMAN re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Parties wishing to review the actual documents listed on the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s docket sheet should refer to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s records. At the direction of this Court, counsel for the appellant must furnish paper copies of these documents directly to the Chambers of the Honorable Kugler, U.S. District Judge. These courtesy copies should be clearly marked as `Courtesy Copies` and should contain the U.S. District Court civil docket number. Pursuant to Federal Bankruptcy Rule 8018 (a), unless otherwise ordered, the appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days after the docketing of the notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically;the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days of service of the appellant`s brief;the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellee`s brief. Appellant Brief due by 9/20/2019. (dd, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by BERNARD ANDREW ROTHMAN re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. Parties wishing to review the actual documents listed on the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s docket sheet should refer to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s records. At the direction of this Court, counsel for the appellant must furnish paper copies of these documents directly to the Chambers of the Honorable Kugler, U.S. District Judge. These courtesy copies should be clearly marked as `Courtesy Copies` and should contain the U.S. District Court civil docket number. Pursuant to Federal Bankruptcy Rule 8018 (a), unless otherwise ordered, the appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days after the docketing of the notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically;the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days of service of the appellant`s brief;the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellee`s brief. Appellant Brief due by 9/6/2019. (dd, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-15963, filed by BERNARD ANDREW ROTHMAN. (Attachments: #1 Order Vacating Stay, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Statement of Issue, #4 Certificate of Service)(ssp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROTHMAN v. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BERNARD ANDREW ROTHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Represented By: MARTHA B. CHOVANES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?