PROCACCINI v. HARRAH'S ATLANTIC CITY OPERATING CO., LLC et al
Plaintiff: GINA PROCACCINI
Defendant: HARRAH'S ATLANTIC CITY OPERATING CO., LLC and ROBERT PATTILLO
Case Number: 1:2019cv16477
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph H Rodriguez
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Defendants' Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by 10/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 9/12/2019. (dmr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON ALEXANDER CABRERA on behalf of ROBERT PATTILLO (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CABRERA, JASON)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON ALEXANDER CABRERA on behalf of HARRAH'S ATLANTIC CITY OPERATING CO., LLC (CABRERA, JASON)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Extend Defendants' Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by HARRAH'S ATLANTIC CITY OPERATING CO., LLC, ROBERT PATTILLO. (KRESGE, RAYMOND)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GINA PROCACCINI. HARRAH'S ATLANTIC CITY OPERATING CO., LLC served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (HOLLAND, THOMAS)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GINA PROCACCINI. ROBERT PATTILLO served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (HOLLAND, THOMAS)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HARRAH'S ATLANTIC CITY OPERATING CO., LLC, ROBERT PATTILLO. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HARRAH'S ATLANTIC CITY OPERATING CO., LLC, ROBERT PATTILLO ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number CAM010624), filed by GINA PROCACCINI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Envelope)(ssp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PROCACCINI v. HARRAH'S ATLANTIC CITY OPERATING CO., LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GINA PROCACCINI
Represented By: THOMAS MORE HOLLAND
Represented By: KELLY ANN TREWELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRAH'S ATLANTIC CITY OPERATING CO., LLC
Represented By: JASON ALEXANDER CABRERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT PATTILLO
Represented By: JASON ALEXANDER CABRERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?