MENCER v. COMMUNITY REALTY MANAGEMENT et al
Plaintiff: Gary Mencer
Defendant: COMMUNITY REALTY MANAGEMENT and JOHN DOES 1-50
Case Number: 1:2019cv16588
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph H Rodriguez
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER Upon letter application dated September 24, 2019 from Jacqueline Murphy, Esquire, counsel for defendant, the Court hereby GRANTS the request to reschedule the in-person Initial Conference previously set for September 26, 2019. The new date and time of the in-person Initial Conference is October 22, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. in Room 2040 - Camden. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 9/25/19. (nar)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER The parties shall submit a Joint Discovery Plan to the Court no later than the time period provided for in L.Civ.R. 26.1(b)(2). The form to be used for the Joint Discovery Plan can be retrieved from: http://www.njd.uscourts.gov/sites/njd/files/R16DiscoveryPlanCamONLY.pdf. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 9/24/19. (nar)
September 20, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by COMMUNITY REALTY MANAGEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(WATERS, KELLY)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by COMMUNITY REALTY MANAGEMENT re #5 Answer to Complaint (MURPHY, JACQUELINE)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by COMMUNITY REALTY MANAGEMENT.(MURPHY, JACQUELINE)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by COMMUNITY REALTY MANAGEMENT re #3 Answer to Complaint (MURPHY, JACQUELINE)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by COMMUNITY REALTY MANAGEMENT.(MURPHY, JACQUELINE)
August 13, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Cause of Action,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Initial Conference set for 9/26/2019 11:30 AM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 8/13/2019. (cry, )
August 13, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, )
August 12, 2019 Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COMMUNITY REALTY MANAGEMENT from Superior Court of New Jersey, Camden County, case number L-002615-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9887463), filed by COMMUNITY REALTY MANAGEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint with Affidavit of Service)(WATERS, KELLY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MENCER v. COMMUNITY REALTY MANAGEMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Mencer
Represented By: CRAIG R. MITNICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMUNITY REALTY MANAGEMENT
Represented By: KELLY A. WATERS
Represented By: JACQUELINE MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?