DIPIETRO v. STATE OF NEW JERSEY et al
Plaintiff: PETER DIPIETRO
Defendant: CAMDEN COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, BURLINGTON COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CHRISTEN MANDELA, HAMILTON TWP POLICE DEPARTMENT, MARY EVA COLALILLO, CAPTAIN MATTHEW LEITH, MICHELE VERNO, CAMDEN COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, LT. KAREN TAYLOR, JAMES HOGAN, UNKNOWN POLICE OFFICER, EVESHAM TWP. MUNICIPAL COURT, GLOUCESTER COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE, KAREN CAPLAN, STATE OF NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES, WASHINGTON TWP. POLICE DEPARTMENT, EVESHAM TWP. POLICE DEPARTMENT, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, SALEM COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, MARY BETH KRAMER, HAMILTON TWP. MUNICIPAL COURT, RANDY MOLINA, JOHN S. CUZZUPE, GLOUCESTER COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT and CAMDEN COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY
Case Number: 1:2019cv17014
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-02167. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 21, 2019 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
August 5, 2019 AMENDED CLAIMS FOR ADDITIONAL CLAIMS AND ADD ADDITIONAL RESPONDENTS by PETER DIPIETRO (zrdj)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the District of New Jersey. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 8/21/2019. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/30/2019. (zsb)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to the Court from Peter DiPietro (zrdj)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by PETER DIPIETRO (zmc)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BURLINGTON COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, CAMDEN COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, CAMDEN COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, CAMDEN COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, KAREN CAPLAN, MARY EVA COLALILLO, JOHN S. CUZZUPE, EVESHAM TWP. MUNICIPAL COURT, EVESHAM TWP. POLICE DEPARTMENT, GLOUCESTER COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE, GLOUCESTER COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, HAMILTON TWP POLICE DEPARTMENT, HAMILTON TWP. MUNICIPAL COURT, JAMES HOGAN, MARY BETH KRAMER, MATTHEW LEITH, CHRISTEN MANDELA, RANDY MOLINA, SALEM COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES, KAREN TAYLOR, UNKNOWN POLICE OFFICER, MICHELE VERNO, WASHINGTON TWP. POLICE DEPARTMENT with Jury Demand filed by PETER DIPIETRO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(zmc)
July 17, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 07/17/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIPIETRO v. STATE OF NEW JERSEY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMDEN COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BURLINGTON COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTEN MANDELA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAMILTON TWP POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY EVA COLALILLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPTAIN MATTHEW LEITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELE VERNO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMDEN COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. KAREN TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES HOGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN POLICE OFFICER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVESHAM TWP. MUNICIPAL COURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLOUCESTER COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAREN CAPLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASHINGTON TWP. POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVESHAM TWP. POLICE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALEM COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY BETH KRAMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAMILTON TWP. MUNICIPAL COURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDY MOLINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN S. CUZZUPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLOUCESTER COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMDEN COUNTY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETER DIPIETRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?