SMITH v. JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC et al
Plaintiff: MYEKA SMITH
Defendant: CONSOLIDATED ASSET RECOVERY SYSTEMS INC, JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC and ASSET SOLUTIONS RECOVERY LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv17156
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Robert B Kugler
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against ASSET SOLUTIONS RECOVERY LLC, JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC by CONSOLIDATED ASSET RECOVERY SYSTEMS INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ROHR, DANTE)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL T. SWEENEY on behalf of JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC (SWEENEY, MICHAEL)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: The initial conference currently scheduled for October 16, 2019 is hereby rescheduled to October 24, 2019 at 3:30 p.m.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 10/9/2019. (rtm, )
October 10, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CONSOLIDATED ASSET RECOVERY SYSTEMS INC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/29/2019. (rtm, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Consolidated Asset Recovery Systems, Inc... (ROHR, DANTE)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by DANTE C. ROHR on behalf of CONSOLIDATED ASSET RECOVERY SYSTEMS INC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ROHR, DANTE)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 Joint Discovery Plan by MYEKA SMITH.(NIZNIK, MICHAEL)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying request to postpone the 10/16/2019 conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 10/2/2019. (rtm, )
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Initial Conference set for 10/16/2019 10:30 AM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/18/2019. (rtm, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC identifying CL Holdings, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (EASLEY, AARON)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC.(EASLEY, AARON)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ASSET SOLUTIONS RECOVERY LLC, CONSOLIDATED ASSET RECOVERY SYSTEMS INC, JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, )
August 23, 2019 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ASSET SOLUTIONS RECOVERY LLC, CONSOLIDATED ASSET RECOVERY SYSTEMS INC, JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9916506) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MYEKA SMITH.(NIZNIK, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSOLIDATED ASSET RECOVERY SYSTEMS INC
Represented By: DANTE C. ROHR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC
Represented By: AARON RAPHAEL EASLEY
Represented By: MICHAEL T. SWEENEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASSET SOLUTIONS RECOVERY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MYEKA SMITH
Represented By: MICHAEL F NIZNIK, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?