PAVLYIK v. NOGAN et al
Petitioner: MICHAEL PAVLYIK
Respondent: PATRICK NOGAN and ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Case Number: 1:2019cv17691
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 Duplicate Copy of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by MICHAEL PAVLYIK. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ssp, )
September 30, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (cry, )
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER administratively terminating this case. ORDERED that if Petitioner wishes to reopen this case he shall so notify the Court within 30 days of the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall supply petitioner with a blank habeas petition form etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 9/30/2019. (cry, notice and form mailed)
September 17, 2019 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number CAM010691 (cry, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 Letter from MICHAEL PAVLYIK re filing fee. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cry, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by MICHAEL PAVLYIK. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Brief in Support of Petition, #3 Appendix Vol. 1, #4 Appendix Vol. 2, #5 Appendix Vol. 3, #6 Envelope)(FF to be paid separately per letter from Petitioner)(ssp, ) (Duplicate scans of pages 3 and 12 removed on 9/23/2019) (cry, ). Modified on 9/23/2019 (cry, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAVLYIK v. NOGAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MICHAEL PAVLYIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PATRICK NOGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?