FAIRHURST v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN M. FAIRHURST
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2019cv17787
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, )
September 12, 2019 COMPLAINT #1 against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by KATHLEEN M. FAIRHURST.(ssp, )
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's IFP. ORDERED that the Clerk shall file the Complaint. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 9/11/2019. (ssp, ).
September 9, 2019 Judge Noel L. Hillman added. (bf, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application IFP)(MAZUR, SHERYL) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2019: #3 Text of Proposed Order) (cry, ).
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by KATHLEEN M. FAIRHURST. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application IFP)(MAZUR, SHERYL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FAIRHURST v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN M. FAIRHURST
Represented By: SHERYL GANDEL MAZUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?