NUNEZ v. SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: CRISTIAN NUNEZ
Defendant: TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC., TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA, INC. and SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv18303
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Referring Judge: Robert B Kugler
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JAMES P. MCGRAW, III, DOUGLAS A. MILLEN, WILLIAM H. LONDON, KIMBERLY A. JUSTICE and JONATHAN M. JAGHER, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (tf, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 36 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice James P. McGraw, III to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-10090241.) (CARROLL, KATRINA)
November 6, 2019 Filing 35 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Douglas A. Millen to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-10090228.) (CARROLL, KATRINA)
November 6, 2019 Filing 34 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice William H. London to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-10090200.) (CARROLL, KATRINA)
November 6, 2019 Filing 33 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Kimberly A. Justice to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-10090158.) (CARROLL, KATRINA)
November 6, 2019 Filing 32 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jonathan M. Jagher to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-10090113.) (CARROLL, KATRINA)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James P. McGraw, III; shall pay a fee of $150.00 to the Clerk, United States District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 11/5/2019. (tf, )
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Douglas A. Millen; shall pay a fee of $150.00 to the Clerk, United States District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 11/5/2019. (tf, )
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to William H. London; shall pay a fee of $150.00 to the Clerk, United States District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 11/5/2019. (tf, )
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kimberly A. Justice; shall pay a fee of $150.00 to the Clerk, United States District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 11/5/2019. (tf, )
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jonathan M. Jagher; shall pay a fee of $150.00 to the Clerk, United States District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 11/5/2019. (tf, )
October 30, 2019 Pro Hac Vice counsel, EDWIN J. KILPELA, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (tf, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 26 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Edwin J. Kilpela to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-10069902.) (CARROLL, KATRINA)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Edwin J. Kilpela, Esquire; shall make a payment of $150.00 to the Clerk of the United States District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/29/2019. (tf, )
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER that Defendants Subaru of America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. and Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. shall have until December 13, 2019, in order to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/28/2019. (tf, )
October 25, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James P. McGraw, III. Motion set for 11/18/2019 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION and Consent Order to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Pursuant to L.Civ.R.6.1(a) by TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA, INC., TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC.. (KELLETT, CHARLES)
October 24, 2019 Filing 22 Letter from Casey Watkins, Esq. noting Subaru has no objection to pro hac vice motions. (WATKINS, CASEY)
October 24, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James P. McGraw, III by CRISTIAN NUNEZ. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Katrina Carroll, #2 Certification of James P. McGraw, III, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CARROLL, KATRINA)
October 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William H. London, #20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Douglas A. Millen, #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan M. Jagher, #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kimberly A. Justice. Motion set for 11/18/2019 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Douglas A. Millen by CRISTIAN NUNEZ. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Katrina Carroll, #2 Certification of Douglas A. Millen, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CARROLL, KATRINA)
October 22, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William H. London by CRISTIAN NUNEZ. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Katrina Carroll, #2 Certification of William H. London, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CARROLL, KATRINA)
October 22, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kimberly A. Justice by CRISTIAN NUNEZ. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Katrina Carroll, #2 Certification of Kimberly A. Justice, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CARROLL, KATRINA)
October 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan M. Jagher by CRISTIAN NUNEZ. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Katrina Carroll, #2 Certification of Jonathan M. Jagher, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CARROLL, KATRINA)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER Defense counsel shall advise the Court if there is any opposition to Plaintiff's pro hac vice motion [D.I. 4] by 10/25/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 1021/2019. (slc)
October 21, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (KELLETT, CHARLES)
October 21, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC.. (KELLETT, CHARLES)
October 17, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #12 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA, INC., TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/31/2019. (tf, )
October 17, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Appearance #13 submitted by Peter A. Muhic on 10/16/2019 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (tf, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER A. MUHIC on behalf of CRISTIAN NUNEZ (MUHIC, PETER)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. and Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc... (KELLETT, CHARLES)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by KAROL CORBIN WALKER on behalf of TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA, INC., TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC. (WALKER, KAROL)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES FREDERICK KELLETT on behalf of TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA, INC., TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC. (KELLETT, CHARLES)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER that Defendant Subaru of America, Inc. shall have until December 2, 2019, in order to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/10/2019. (tf, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC. identifying Subaru Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (WATKINS, CASEY)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer by SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC.. (WATKINS, CASEY)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by CASEY GENE WATKINS on behalf of SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC. (WATKINS, CASEY)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by NEAL D. WALTERS on behalf of SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC. (WALTERS, NEAL)
October 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Edwin Kilpela. Motion set for 11/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Edwin Kilpela by CRISTIAN NUNEZ. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Katrina Carroll, #2 Certification of Edwin Kilpela, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CARROLL, KATRINA)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CRISTIAN NUNEZ. SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC. served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA, INC. served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019; TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC. served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service as to Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., #2 Proof of Service as to Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.)(CARROLL, KATRINA)
September 25, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ssp, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC., TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA, INC., TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, )
September 24, 2019 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC., TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA, INC., TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9986169) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CRISTIAN NUNEZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(CARROLL, KATRINA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NUNEZ v. SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRISTIAN NUNEZ
Represented By: KATRINA CARROLL
Represented By: PETER A. MUHIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, U.S.A., INC.
Represented By: KAROL CORBIN WALKER
Represented By: CHARLES FREDERICK KELLETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: KAROL CORBIN WALKER
Represented By: CHARLES FREDERICK KELLETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: CASEY GENE WATKINS
Represented By: NEAL D. WALTERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?