DUFF SUPPLY COMPANY v. AQUA INDUSTRIES LLC et al
Plaintiff: DUFF SUPPLY COMPANY
Defendant: AQUA INDUSTRIES LLC and JOSEPH RYDER
Case Number: 1:2019cv18367
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number CAM010735 (cry, )
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER administratively terminating this case. ORDERED that if Plaintiff wishes to reopen this case they shall pre-pay the $400.00 filing fee and obtain licensed counsel to represent them within 30 days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 9/27/2019. (ssp, n.m. )
September 27, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (ssp, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 2 Clerk's Letter: Complaint not accompanied by the filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis. (cry, )
September 26, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that although an individual is entitled to proceed pro se, a corporation must be represented by counsel. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (cry, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Received. NO FF/IFP (Attachments: #1 Consent to receive documents electronically)(cry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DUFF SUPPLY COMPANY v. AQUA INDUSTRIES LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AQUA INDUSTRIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH RYDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUFF SUPPLY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?