GUMBS v. ORTIZ et al
Plaintiff: JUSTIN J. GUMBS
Defendant: DAVID E. ORTIZ, MS. BLACKWELL and D.K. WHITE
Case Number: 1:2019cv18864
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from JUSTIN J. GUMBS requesting case to be reopened. (cry, )
November 6, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number CAM010810 (cry, )
October 17, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (cry, )
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER administratively terminating this case. ORDERED that if Petitioner wishes to reopen this case he shall so notify the Court within 30 days of the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall supply petitioner with a blank IFP Application.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 10/17/2019. (cry, notice and IFP mailed)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 10/17/2019. (cry, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)NO FF/IFP(ssp, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/11/2019) (ssp, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GUMBS v. ORTIZ et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID E. ORTIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS. BLACKWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.K. WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN J. GUMBS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?