SHORE MEMORIAL PHYSICIANS GROUP, P.C. v. HEALTHGRID CORP. et al
Plaintiff: SHORE MEMORIAL PHYSICIANS GROUP, P.C.
Defendant: HEALTH GRID CORP., Allscripts Healthcare, LLC, HEALTHGRID CORP. and ALLSCRIPTS HEALTHCARE, LLC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv18925
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: In-Person Settlement Conference set for 1/14/2020 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 11/21/2019. (dmr)
November 12, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Initial Conference held on 11/12/2019. (se, )
November 11, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ALLSCRIPTS HEALTHCARE, LLC. re #9 MOTION to Dismiss (LAGEMANN, NICHOLAS)
November 11, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by SHORE MEMORIAL PHYSICIANS GROUP, P.C. re #11 MOTION to Remand (BUSLER, ADAM)
November 7, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE re #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. (WOOD, ERIC)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER -- Due to a scheduling conflict, it is hereby ORDERED the initial conference set on November 12, 2019, will start at 4:00 p.m. rather than 10:00 a.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 11/7/19. (Schneider, Joel)
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #9 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Exhibit s, #3 Certificate of Service)(BUSLER, ADAM)
November 4, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #11 MOTION to Remand (LAGEMANN, NICHOLAS)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting letter request to reschedule the Initial Conference for 11/12/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 10/31/2019. (dmr)
October 24, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Remand. Motion set for 11/18/2019 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand by SHORE MEMORIAL PHYSICIANS GROUP, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit, #5 Certificate of Service)(BUSLER, ADAM)
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 Certification of Plaintiff and Defendants on behalf of All Defendants. (BLAKESLEE, YVETTE)
October 18, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 11/18/2019 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by ALLSCRIPTS HEALTHCARE, LLC.. Responses due by 11/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Brief Defendant Allscripts Healthcare, LLC's Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(LAGEMANN, NICHOLAS)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 Health Grid LLC's ANSWER to Complaint , First COUNTERCLAIM against SHORE MEMORIAL PHYSICIANS GROUP, P.C. by HEALTHGRID CORP..(LAGEMANN, NICHOLAS)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HEALTHGRID CORP. identifying Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (BLAKESLEE, YVETTE)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALLSCRIPTS HEALTHCARE, LLC. identifying Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (BLAKESLEE, YVETTE)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by YVETTE N. BLAKESLEE on behalf of ALLSCRIPTS HEALTHCARE, LLC., HEALTHGRID CORP. (BLAKESLEE, YVETTE)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HEALTHGRID CORP.. (LAGEMANN, NICHOLAS)
October 15, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by ALLSCRIPTS HEALTHCARE, LLC a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (cry, )
October 15, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 filed by HEALTHGRID CORP. on 10/11/2019 was submitted with a Corporate Disclosure Statement as an attachment. PLEASE RESUBMIT the Corporate Disclosure Statement USING the event CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT found under Other Filings -> Other Documents. (cry, )
October 15, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Attorney Information,Caption,Jury Demand,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set for 11/6/2019 11:00 AM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 10/15/2019. (cry, )
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, no later than the first Rule 16 conference.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 10/15/2019. (cry, )
October 11, 2019 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (LAGEMANN, NICHOLAS)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC from SUPERIOR COURT, CAPE MAY, case number CPM-L-000312-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10031880), filed by Allscripts Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Statement DISCLOSURE)(LAGEMANN, NICHOLAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHORE MEMORIAL PHYSICIANS GROUP, P.C. v. HEALTHGRID CORP. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHORE MEMORIAL PHYSICIANS GROUP, P.C.
Represented By: ADAM BUSLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEALTH GRID CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allscripts Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: NICHOLAS KORD LAGEMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEALTHGRID CORP.
Represented By: NICHOLAS KORD LAGEMANN
Represented By: YVETTE N. BLAKESLEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLSCRIPTS HEALTHCARE, LLC.
Represented By: NICHOLAS KORD LAGEMANN
Represented By: YVETTE N. BLAKESLEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?