SPRUILL v. WARDEN, FPCC
Petitioner: ANTHONY SPRUILL
Respondent: WARDEN, FPCC
Case Number: 1:2019cv19331
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by ANTHONY SPRUILL. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) Forwarded to Middle District of Pennsylvania in regard to case 1:19-cv-01845 on 11/25/2015(ssp, )
October 28, 2019 Case transferred from New Jersey has been opened in Middle District of Pennsylvania as case 1:19-cv-01845, filed 10/25/2019. (dm )
October 25, 2019 Case extracted via ECF to District of Pennsylvania Middle. (dd, )
October 24, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (dd, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by ANTHONY SPRUILL. NO FF/IFP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 April 4th, #3 Letter May 17th, #4 Letter October 3rd, #5 Response in opposition by USA, #6 Memorandum & Order)(cry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPRUILL v. WARDEN, FPCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN, FPCC
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ANTHONY SPRUILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?