KILLINGSWORTH v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: NAOMI KILLINGSWORTH
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL, COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY and COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2019cv19562
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 Administrative Record Filed - Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9)(LYNCH, ANDREW)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW CHARLES LYNCH on behalf of COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (LYNCH, ANDREW)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #3 Application to Proceed IFP. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall file the complaint. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 11/5/2019. (cry, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by NAOMI KILLINGSWORTH. (GIORDANO, THOMAS)
October 31, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
October 30, 2019 Judge Noel L. Hillman added. (dd, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL, COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by NAOMI KILLINGSWORTH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit IFP Application)(GIORDANO, THOMAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KILLINGSWORTH v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAOMI KILLINGSWORTH
Represented By: THOMAS J. GIORDANO, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL, COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: ANDREW CHARLES LYNCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?