DAVIS v. MARQUIS HEALTH SERVICES LLC et al
Plaintiff: KESHIA DAVIS
Defendant: MARQUIS HEALTH SERVICES LLC, LAURA JOHNSON, LAUREL BROOK REHABILITATION AND HEALTHCARE CENTER, ASHLEY WILSON, ANID SELIN, LAUREL BROOK OPERATOR, LLC D/B/A LAUREL BROOK REHABILITATION AND HEALTHCARE CENTER and LAUREL BROOK OPERATOR, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv20049
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph H Rodriguez
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 3/10/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 5/8/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 8/28/2020, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 12/20/2019. (rtm, )
December 19, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: In-Person Initial Conference held on 12/19/2019. (nar)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by LAURA JOHNSON, LAUREL BROOK OPERATOR, LLC, LAUREL BROOK REHABILITATION AND HEALTHCARE CENTER, MARQUIS HEALTH SERVICES LLC, ANID SELIN, ASHLEY WILSON.(ARON, MARTIN)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER Due to a scheduling conflict, the Court hereby reschedules the in-person Initial Conference previously set for December 5, 2019. The new date and time of the in-person Initial Conference is December 19, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. in Room 2040 - Camden. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/21/19. (nar)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by BIANCA MARIE OLIVADOTI on behalf of All Defendants (OLIVADOTI, BIANCA)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Initial Conference set for 12/5/2019 10:30 AM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/12/2019. (cry, )
November 12, 2019 Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
November 12, 2019 CLERKS TEXT ORDER - The Application for a Clerks Order Extending Time toAnswer - Document #2 submitted by ANID SELIN, MARQUIS HEALTH SERVICES LLC, LAURA JOHNSON, LAUREL BROOK REHABILITATION AND HEALTHCARE CENTER, LAUREL BROOK OPERATOR, LLC, ASHLEY WILSON on 11/11/2019 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/2/2019. (cry, )
November 12, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, )
November 12, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
November 11, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LAURA JOHNSON, LAUREL BROOK OPERATOR, LLC D/B/A LAUREL BROOK REHABILITATION AND HEALTHCARE CENTER, LAUREL BROOK REHABILITATION AND HEALTHCARE CENTER, MARQUIS HEALTH SERVICES LLC, ANID SELIN, ASHLEY WILSON. (ARON, MARTIN)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (ARON, MARTIN)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ANID SELIN, MARQUIS HEALTH SERVICES LLC, LAURA JOHNSON, LAUREL BROOK REHABILITATION AND HEALTHCARE CENTER, LAUREL BROOK OPERATOR, LLC D/B/A LAUREL BROOK REHABILITATION AND HEALTHCARE CENTER, ASHLEY WILSON from Superior Court of NJ, Camden County, case number CAM-L-003273-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10100776), filed by ANID SELIN, MARQUIS HEALTH SERVICES LLC, LAURA JOHNSON, LAUREL BROOK REHABILITATION AND HEALTHCARE CENTER, LAUREL BROOK OPERATOR, LLC D/B/A LAUREL BROOK REHABILITATION AND HEALTHCARE CENTER, ASHLEY WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Compliance, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(ARON, MARTIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVIS v. MARQUIS HEALTH SERVICES LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARQUIS HEALTH SERVICES LLC
Represented By: MARTIN W. ARON
Represented By: BIANCA MARIE OLIVADOTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURA JOHNSON
Represented By: MARTIN W. ARON
Represented By: BIANCA MARIE OLIVADOTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAUREL BROOK REHABILITATION AND HEALTHCARE CENTER
Represented By: MARTIN W. ARON
Represented By: BIANCA MARIE OLIVADOTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHLEY WILSON
Represented By: MARTIN W. ARON
Represented By: BIANCA MARIE OLIVADOTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANID SELIN
Represented By: MARTIN W. ARON
Represented By: BIANCA MARIE OLIVADOTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAUREL BROOK OPERATOR, LLC D/B/A LAUREL BROOK REHABILITATION AND HEALTHCARE CENTER
Represented By: MARTIN W. ARON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAUREL BROOK OPERATOR, LLC
Represented By: MARTIN W. ARON
Represented By: BIANCA MARIE OLIVADOTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KESHIA DAVIS
Represented By: CATHERINE WELLINGTON SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?