WHEATLEY v. WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP et al
Plaintiff: Joann Wheatley
Defendant: WAL-MART ASSOCIATES, INC., Wal-Mart R E Bus Trst - #1869, XYZ PARTNERSHIP 1-10, WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP, JOHN DOE 1-10, RICHARD ROE OWNER 1-10 (fictitiously named Defendants), WALMART INC., JOHN DOE MAINTENANCE COMPANY 1-10, ABC CORPORATION 1-10, WAL-MART STORES EAST I, LP, WAL-MART STORES, INC., WAL-MART REALTY COMPANY, WALMART and RICHARD ROE OWNER 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv20105
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 2/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 12/6/2019. (rss, )
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: The Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/11/2019 is CANCELED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 12/6/2019. (se, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Barkha Patel, Esquire. (PATEL, BARKHA)
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND and Affirmative Defenses by WAL-MART ASSOCIATES, INC., WAL-MART R E BUS TRST - #1869, WAL-MART REALTY COMPANY, WAL-MART STORES EAST I, LP, WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP, WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART, WALMART INC..(PATEL, BARKHA)
November 13, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Jury Demand,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Initial Conference set for 12/11/2019 09:30 AM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 11/13/2019. (cry, )
November 13, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (cry, )
November 13, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK J. MCDONNELL on behalf of WAL-MART ASSOCIATES, INC., WAL-MART REALTY COMPANY, WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC., WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP, WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART INC. (MCDONNELL, PATRICK)
November 12, 2019 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAL-MART STORES, INC. identifying Walmart, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (PATEL, BARKHA)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAL-MART REALTY COMPANY identifying Walmart, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (PATEL, BARKHA)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP identifying Walmart, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (PATEL, BARKHA)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALMART INC. identifying Walmart, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (PATEL, BARKHA)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC. identifying Walmart, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (PATEL, BARKHA)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAL-MART ASSOCIATES, INC.. (PATEL, BARKHA)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart R E Bus Trst - #1869, WAL-MART STORES EAST I, LP, WAL-MART STORES, INC., WAL-MART REALTY COMPANY, WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP, WAL-MART ASSOCIATES, INC., WALMART, WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC., WALMART INC. from Burlington County Superior Court, case number BUR-L-2028-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10104568), filed by Wal-Mart R E Bus Trst - #1869, WAL-MART STORES EAST I, LP, WAL-MART STORES, INC., WAL-MART REALTY COMPANY, WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP, WAL-MART ASSOCIATES, INC., WALMART, WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC., WALMART INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(PATEL, BARKHA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHEATLEY v. WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By: BARKHA PATEL
Represented By: PATRICK J. MCDONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart R E Bus Trst - #1869
Represented By: BARKHA PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ PARTNERSHIP 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST, INC.
Represented By: BARKHA PATEL
Represented By: PATRICK J. MCDONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP
Represented By: BARKHA PATEL
Represented By: PATRICK J. MCDONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD ROE OWNER 1-10 (fictitiously named Defendants)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART INC.
Represented By: BARKHA PATEL
Represented By: PATRICK J. MCDONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE MAINTENANCE COMPANY 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES EAST I, LP
Represented By: BARKHA PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES, INC.
Represented By: BARKHA PATEL
Represented By: PATRICK J. MCDONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART REALTY COMPANY
Represented By: BARKHA PATEL
Represented By: PATRICK J. MCDONNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART
Represented By: BARKHA PATEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD ROE OWNER 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Wheatley
Represented By: KIMBERLY A. HOEHING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?