HILL v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: JOSEPH M. HILL
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2019cv20115
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 Administrative Record Filed - Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6, #6 Part 7, #7 Part 8, #8 Part 9, #9 Part 10, #10 Part 11, #11 Part 12, #12 Part 13, #13 Part 14, #14 Part 15)(MATONI, ELIZABETH)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH S. MATONI on behalf of COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY (MATONI, ELIZABETH)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOSEPH M. HILL. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY served on 11/18/2019, answer due 1/17/2020. (POPE, KATHRYNE) Modified on 12/17/2019 (dmr, ).
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region III; Attorney General of the United States; U.S. Attorneys Office on November 13, 2019, filed by JOSEPH M. HILL. (POPE, KATHRYNE)
November 13, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
November 13, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, )
November 13, 2019 Judge Renee Marie Bumb added. (dd, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10105582), filed by Joseph M Hill.(POPE, KATHRYNE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HILL v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Represented By: ELIZABETH S. MATONI
Represented By: EMILY BRESLIN MARKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH M. HILL
Represented By: KATHRYNE HEMMINGS POPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?