DIEBLER v. SANMEDICA INTERNATIONAL, LLC et al
Plaintiff: HOLLY DIEBLER
Defendant: SANMEDICA INTERNATIONAL, LLC, DOES 1 through 10, inclusive and DOES 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv20155
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Utah (Central Division) , #7 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 2/18/2020 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
January 8, 2020 Filing 10 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss . (SHAH, JAMES)
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #6 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Utah (Central Division) . (SHAH, JAMES)
January 3, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Celine Cohan, Ryan J. Clarkson and Shireen M. Clarkson. Motion set for 2/3/2020 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Celine Cohan, Ryan J. Clarkson and Shireen M. Clarkson by HOLLY DIEBLER. (Attachments: #1 Certification of James C. Shah, #2 Certification of Celine Cohan, #3 Certification of Ryan J. Clarkson, #4 Certification of Shireen M. Clarkson, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(SHAH, JAMES)
January 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 2/3/2020 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
December 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by SANMEDICA INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel J. Cohen, Esq., #2 Exhibit 1-5, #3 Brief, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(COHEN, DANIEL)
December 31, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Utah (Central Division) . Motion set for 2/3/2020 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
December 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Utah (Central Division) by SANMEDICA INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bodee Gay, #2 Declaration Daniel J. Cohen, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Brief, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(COHEN, DANIEL)
December 16, 2019 Clerk's Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SANMEDICA INTERNATIONAL, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/31/2019. (dmr)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to SanMedica International, LLC.. (COHEN, DANIEL)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SANMEDICA INTERNATIONAL, LLC identifying Basic Research Intermediate, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (COHEN, DANIEL)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J. COHEN on behalf of SANMEDICA INTERNATIONAL, LLC (COHEN, DANIEL)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to SANMEDICA INTERNATIONAL, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, )
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, no later than the first Rule 16 conference.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 11/14/2019. (ssp, )
November 13, 2019 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOES 1 through 10, inclusive, SANMEDICA INTERNATIONAL, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10108641) with JURY DEMAND, filed by HOLLY DIEBLER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Summons)(SHAH, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIEBLER v. SANMEDICA INTERNATIONAL, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANMEDICA INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Represented By: DANIEL J. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOLLY DIEBLER
Represented By: JAMES C. SHAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?