MAURER v. DELTONA DISCOUNT TIRES INC. et al
Plaintiff: DENNIS MAURER
Defendant: DELTONA%20DISCOUNT%20TIRES%2C%20INC., LEROY S. CARDILE and DELTONA DISCOUNT TIRES INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv20445
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph H Rodriguez
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting letter request to reschedule the Initial Conference to 3/18/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/14/2020. (dmr)
January 14, 2020 Filing 11 Letter from Jon G. Shadinger Jr., Esq.. (SHADINGER, JON)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Answer by 2/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/8/2020. (dmr)
January 7, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer by LEROY S. CARDILE. (LICHTENSTEIN, RUSSELL)
December 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by RUSSELL L. LICHTENSTEIN on behalf of LEROY S. CARDILE (LICHTENSTEIN, RUSSELL)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Initial Conference set for 1/15/2020 at 2:30 PM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 12/9/2019. (dmr)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DELTONA DISCOUNT TIRES INC.. (LOEFFLAD, ROBERT)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by DELTONA DISCOUNT TIRES INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LOEFFLAD, ROBERT)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DENNIS MAURER. LEROY S. CARDILE served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (SHADINGER, JON)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DENNIS MAURER. DELTONA DISCOUNT TIRES INC. served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (SHADINGER, JON)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to LEROY S. CARDILE, DELTONA DISCOUNT TIRES INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dd, )
November 18, 2019 Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LEROY S. CARDILE, DELTONA DISCOUNT TIRES, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10119494), filed by DENNIS MAURER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SHADINGER, JON)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAURER v. DELTONA DISCOUNT TIRES INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS MAURER
Represented By: JON G. SHADINGER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELTONA%20DISCOUNT%20TIRES%2C%20INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEROY S. CARDILE
Represented By: RUSSELL L. LICHTENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELTONA DISCOUNT TIRES INC.
Represented By: ROBERT LOEFFLAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?