UPS FREIGHT, INC. v. COMPLETE FAMILY DENTAL, LLC et al
Plaintiff: UPS FREIGHT, INC.
Defendant: AMERICAN ARBITRATION ASSOCIATION and COMPLETE FAMILY DENTAL, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv20524
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UPS FREIGHT, INC.. AMERICAN ARBITRATION ASSOCIATION served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
December 3, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Return of Service #6 filed by THOMAS C. MARTIN on 12/3/2019 was submitted incorrectly as an affidavit of service. In the future please use event SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED found under SERVICE OF PROCESS. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (rss, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet served on Complete Family Dental, LLC served on Billie Mikesic, Office Manager on November 27, 2019, filed by UPS FREIGHT, INC.. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMERICAN ARBITRATION ASSOCIATION, COMPLETE FAMILY DENTAL, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
November 20, 2019 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM D. BIERMAN on behalf of UPS FREIGHT, INC. (BIERMAN, WILLIAM)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS C. MARTIN on behalf of UPS FREIGHT, INC. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UPS FREIGHT, INC. identifying UPS Air Cargo, UPS Capital Corporation, UPS Mail Innovations, Mail Boxes etc, Inc., UPS Freight, UPS Professional Services, UPS Supply Chain Solutions, Overnite Transportation Company as Corporate Parent.. (MARTIN, THOMAS)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMERICAN ARBITRATION ASSOCIATION, COMPLETE FAMILY DENTAL, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10124671), filed by UPS FREIGHT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MARTIN, THOMAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UPS FREIGHT, INC. v. COMPLETE FAMILY DENTAL, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN ARBITRATION ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMPLETE FAMILY DENTAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UPS FREIGHT, INC.
Represented By: THOMAS C. MARTIN
Represented By: WILLIAM D. BIERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?