OWENXPRESS, LLC v. XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC. et al
Plaintiff: OWENXPRESS, LLC
Defendant: DUSTIN SMITH and XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv20754
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Case transferred from New Jersey has been opened in District of Delaware as case 1:19-cv-02280, filed 12/16/2019. (dm )
December 16, 2019 Case extracted via ECF to District of Delaware. (dd, )
December 16, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (rss, )
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting request to transfer this action to the District of Deleware. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 12/16/2019. (rss, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Mary Reeves, Esquire addressed to the Honorable Judge Renee M. Bumb Requesting Case be Moved to the Unites States District Court of Delaware dated December 13 2019. (REEVES, MARY)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Plaintiff shall show cause, by written submission within 14 days of the date of this Order, why this case should not be dismissed for lack of venue, etc. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 12/2/2019. (rss, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OWENXPRESS, LLC. (REEVES, MARY)
November 26, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (cry, )
November 26, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Cause of Action,Nature of Suit,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DUSTIN SMITH, XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
November 26, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (cry, )
November 26, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, )
November 26, 2019 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DUSTIN SMITH, XPO Logistics Freight, Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-10140040), filed by OWENXPRESS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REEVES, MARY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OWENXPRESS, LLC v. XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUSTIN SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XPO LOGISTICS FREIGHT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OWENXPRESS, LLC
Represented By: MARY ELISA REEVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?