CRUZ v. RODRIGUEZ et al
Plaintiff: JAVIAR ROJAS CRUZ
Defendant: DET. DANIEL CHOE, PROSECUTORS OFFICE, DET. JOSE RODRIGUEZ, PUBLIC DEFENDERS OFFICE and INTERNAL AFFAIRS OFFICE
Case Number: 1:2019cv20906
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (cry, )
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying without prejudice #4 Plaintiff's IFP Application; Directing the Clerk to administratively terminate this case and supply Plaintiff with a blank IFP application; If Plaintiff wishes to reopen this case, he shall notify the court in writing within 30 days after the date of entry of this Order etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 1/13/2020. (cry, notice and form mailed)
January 13, 2020 Filing 5 OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 1/13/2020. (cry, )
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by JAVIAR ROJAS CRUZ. (cry, )
December 5, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (cry, )
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER administratively terminating this case. ORDERED that if Plaintiff wishes to reopen this case he shall so notify the Court within 30 days of the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall supply Plaintiff with a blank IFP Application. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 12/5/2019. (cry, notice and form mailed)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 12/5/2019. (cry, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(cry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CRUZ v. RODRIGUEZ et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DET. DANIEL CHOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROSECUTORS OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DET. JOSE RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUBLIC DEFENDERS OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNAL AFFAIRS OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAVIAR ROJAS CRUZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?