SELBY et al v. FOCKLER et al
Plaintiff: AMANDA SELBY and JASON SELBY
Defendant: NEMOURS CHILDREN'S HEALTH SYSTEM, NURSES JOHN DOE 1-10 AND JANE DOE 1-10, NEMOURS/ALFRED I. DUPONT CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, PHYSICIAN ASSISTANTS JOHN DOE 1-10 AND JANE DOE 1-10, M.D. SUSSANNAH S. WALSH, NURSE PRACTITIONERS JOHN DOE 1-10 AND JANE DOE 1-10, NEMOURS DUPONT PEDIATRICS AT INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTER VINELAND, INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK, INC., INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTERS, INC., RAECHEL A. FOCKLER, DO, PHYSICIANS JOHN DOE 1-10 AND JANE DOE 1-10, INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTER VINELAND, OB HOSPITALIST GROUP, JOHN DOE PROFESSIONAL COPRORATIONS 1-10, NEMOURS PEDIATRIC PARTNERS AT INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK, KRISTIN CAPASSO, RN, NEMOURS, SUSSANNAH S. WALSH, M.D., KRISTIN CAPASSO, R.N. and RAECHEL A. FOCKLER, D.O.
3Rd Party Defendant: ALAFIA OB/GYN, INC., GBOLAGADE BABALOLA, D.O., MICHAEL J. GERIA, D.O., COMPLETECARE HEALTH NETWORK and ALAFIA OB/GYN
3Rd Party Plaintiff: MUHAMMAD U. ANWAR, MD, NEMOURS FOUNDATION and MUHAMMAD U. ANWAR, M.D.
Case Number: 1:2019cv21319
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Robert B Kugler
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 18 Letter from Elizabeth Pascal - Joint Letter re: Digital Information re #16 Scheduling Order,. (PASCAL, ELIZABETH)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MAGISTRATE JUDGE SCHNEIDER'S STANDING ORDER IN ALL CIVIL CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/27/2020. (rtm, )
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: In-person Status Conference set for 6/9/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 6/30/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 10/30/2020, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/27/2020. (rtm, )
January 22, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Initial Conference held on 1/22/2020. (se, )
January 21, 2020 Filing 15 United States' ANSWER to Complaint (Third-Party), CROSSCLAIM against KRISTIN CAPASSO, RN, RAECHEL A. FOCKLER, DO, INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK, INC., INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTER VINELAND, INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTERS, INC., NEMOURS, NEMOURS CHILDREN'S HEALTH SYSTEM, NEMOURS DUPONT PEDIATRICS AT INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTER VINELAND, NEMOURS PEDIATRIC PARTNERS AT INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK, NEMOURS/ALFRED I. DUPONT CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, SUSSANNAH S. WALSH, MD by GBOLAGADE BABALOLA, DO, MICHAEL J. GERIA, DO, COMPLETECARE HEALTH NETWORK. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(PASCAL, ELIZABETH)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER ORDER Granting the request for Ms. Petrosky to participate in the scheduling conference on 1/22/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 1/21/2020. (rtm, ) Modified on 1/23/2020 (dd).
January 17, 2020 Filing 13 Letter from M. Sean Maravich, Esquire. (MARAVICH, MICHAEL)
January 13, 2020 Filing 12 Joint Discovery Plan by All Plaintiffs.(BERGER, SCOTT)
January 8, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #11 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by GBOLAGADE BABALOLA, DO, MICHAEL J. GERIA, DO, COMPLETECARE HEALTH NETWORK has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/20/2019. (rtm, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Third-Party Defendants Gbolagade Babalola, D.O., Michael J. Geria, D.O., and Completecare Health Network.. (PASCAL, ELIZABETH)
December 30, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 2/3/2020 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 Certification of Counsel on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (HOFFMAN, MARK)
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MUHAMMAD U. ANWAR, MD, NEMOURS FOUNDATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MARAVICH, MICHAEL)
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT S BERGER, JR on behalf of All Plaintiffs (BERGER, SCOTT)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Initial Conference RESET for 1/22/2020 03:30 PM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 12/18/19. (dd, )
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider for all further proceedings. Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez, Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/18/19. (dd, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, REDACTED Notice of Removal, Removal Exhibits, and State Court Pleadings by GBOLAGADE BABALOLA, DO, COMPLETECARE HEALTH NETWORK, MICHAEL J. GERIA, DO. (Attachments: #1 REDACTED - Notice of Removal, #2 REDACTED - Exhibits to Notice of Removal, #3 REDACTED - State Court Pleadings - Part 1 (See Main Document for Specific Descriptions), #4 REDACTED - State Court Pleadings - Part 2 (See Main Document for Specific Descriptions))(PASCAL, ELIZABETH)
December 17, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - For the purpose of protecting the name of a minor and personal identifiers the Clerk's office has placed both Doc. #1 and #2 under seal. The clerk's office has advised The AUSA to file redacted versions of both entries. These documents will remain on the docket. This message is for informational purposes only. (dmw)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Dominic A. DeLaurentis, Jr., Esq.. (DELAURENTIS, DOMINIC)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set for 1/23/2020 09:30 AM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 12/16/2019. (cry, )
December 16, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ssp, )
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, by GBOLAGADE BABALOLA, DO, COMPLETECARE HEALTH NETWORK, MICHAEL J. GERIA, DO. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, Part 1: 2019.03.21 Original Complaint; 2019.04.16 Answer w Cross-Claim by OB Hospitalist Group; 2019.05.01 Answer w Cross-Claim by Nemours and Muhammad; 2019.05.21 Consent Order Granted by Judge; 2019.05.29 Order to Extend Time to Answer granted; 2019.06.10 Third-Party Complaint; 2019.06.14 Answer w Cross-Claims by Inspira and Raechel Fockler; 2019.06.17 Consent Order; 2019.06.18 Answer w Cross-Claim by Kristin Capasso; 2019.07.02 Consent Order Granted Adjourning Ferreira Conference, #2 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, Part 2: 2019.07.12 Order for Dismissal for Defendant, OB Hospitalist Group; 2019.08.22 Consent Order Vacating Default Entered Against Sussannah S. Walsh, M.D.; 2019.08.23 Answer w/Cross-Claims by Sussannah S. Walsh; 2019.09.25 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Nemours; 2019.10.11 Order granting Pro Hac Vice admission; 2019.10.17 Federal Defendants Motion to Dismiss the Third-Party Complaint; 2019.10.24 Opposition to Federal Defendants Motion by co-Defendants Inspira and Fockler; 2019.10.28 Plaintiffs Response to Inspira and Focklers Brief; 2019.11.14 - Opposition to Motion by Third-Party Plaintiffs Nemours and Muhammad Anwar, M.D.; 2019.11.15 Order for Case Management Conference)(PASCAL, ELIZABETH)
December 12, 2019 Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GBOLAGADE BABALOLA, DO, MICHAEL J. GERIA, DO, COMPLETECARE HEALTH NETWORK from New Jersey Superior Court, case number CUM-185-19., filed by GBOLAGADE BABALOLA, DO, MICHAEL J. GERIA, DO, COMPLETECARE HEALTH NETWORK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(PASCAL, ELIZABETH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SELBY et al v. FOCKLER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEMOURS CHILDREN'S HEALTH SYSTEM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSES JOHN DOE 1-10 AND JANE DOE 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEMOURS/ALFRED I. DUPONT CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHYSICIAN ASSISTANTS JOHN DOE 1-10 AND JANE DOE 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. SUSSANNAH S. WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE PRACTITIONERS JOHN DOE 1-10 AND JANE DOE 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEMOURS DUPONT PEDIATRICS AT INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTER VINELAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL G. HALPIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTERS, INC.
Represented By: MICHAEL G. HALPIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAECHEL A. FOCKLER, DO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHYSICIANS JOHN DOE 1-10 AND JANE DOE 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSPIRA MEDICAL CENTER VINELAND
Represented By: MICHAEL G. HALPIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OB HOSPITALIST GROUP
Represented By: DOMINIC A. DELAURENTIS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE PROFESSIONAL COPRORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEMOURS PEDIATRIC PARTNERS AT INSPIRA HEALTH NETWORK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRISTIN CAPASSO, RN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEMOURS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSSANNAH S. WALSH, M.D.
Represented By: JAY A. GEBAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRISTIN CAPASSO, R.N.
Represented By: MICHAEL G. HALPIN
Represented By: THOMAS M. WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAECHEL A. FOCKLER, D.O.
Represented By: MICHAEL G. HALPIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: ALAFIA OB/GYN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: GBOLAGADE BABALOLA, D.O.
Represented By: ELIZABETH ANN PASCAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: MICHAEL J. GERIA, D.O.
Represented By: ELIZABETH ANN PASCAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: COMPLETECARE HEALTH NETWORK
Represented By: ELIZABETH ANN PASCAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: ALAFIA OB/GYN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANDA SELBY
Represented By: SCOTT S BERGER, JR
Represented By: ROBERT ROSS
Represented By: MARK ALAN HOFFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON SELBY
Represented By: SCOTT S BERGER, JR
Represented By: ROBERT ROSS
Represented By: MARK ALAN HOFFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: MUHAMMAD U. ANWAR, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: NEMOURS FOUNDATION
Represented By: MICHAEL SEAN MARAVICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: MUHAMMAD U. ANWAR, M.D.
Represented By: MICHAEL SEAN MARAVICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?