EASTERN REAL ESTATE, LLC v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT et al
Plaintiff: EASTERN REAL ESTATE, LLC
Defendant: CROSS COUNTRY PROPERTIES, LLC, FOX ROACH TRIDENT LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, WILLIAM LUBLIN, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, BLB RESOURCES, INC., CENTURY 21 ADVANTAGE GOLD - CHERRY HILL and RON RUDOLPH
Case Number: 1:2019cv21478
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph H Rodriguez
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice as to HUD and Without Prejudice as to Remaining Defendants. Signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez on 1/22/2020. (dmr)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER In light of the filing of a Stipulation of Dismissal, the Court hereby adjourns the in-person Initial Conference set for January 23, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 1/22/20. (nar)
January 22, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (dmr)
January 15, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal of HUD with Prejudice and Remaining Defendants Without Prejudice by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (BASIAK, JOHN)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. Responses due by 1/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(1) for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction, #2 Declaration of Miniard Culpepper, #3 Declaration of Michael Curry, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(BASIAK, JOHN)
January 7, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 2/3/2020 before Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
December 23, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/7/2020. (rss, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BASIAK, JOHN)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney ELIZABETH ANN PASCAL terminated. Attorney JOHN FRANCIS BASIAK for UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT added.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BASIAK, JOHN)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Initial Conference set for 1/23/2020 11:30 AM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 12/18/2019. (cry, )
December 18, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, )
December 18, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action,Nature of Suit,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
December 17, 2019 Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT from New Jersey Superior Court, case number BUR-L-1903-19., filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Notice of Removal - Ex. 1 (State Court Compl.), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(PASCAL, ELIZABETH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EASTERN REAL ESTATE, LLC v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROSS COUNTRY PROPERTIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOX ROACH TRIDENT LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM LUBLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Represented By: ELIZABETH ANN PASCAL
Represented By: JOHN FRANCIS BASIAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLB RESOURCES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTURY 21 ADVANTAGE GOLD - CHERRY HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RON RUDOLPH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EASTERN REAL ESTATE, LLC
Represented By: ARI DAVID LINDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?