VALSARTAN N-NITROSODIMETHYLAMINE (NDMA) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Plaintiff: DOMINIC STIMMA, JYNONA GAIL LEE, MARGOTH STRAND, ERIC ERWIN, KATH HOLLAND, CHARLES WILLIAMS, DANIEL WINIECKI, SUSAN GUITON, RON MOLINARO, CECIL BYRD, BETTY SELPH, VERONICA LONGWELL, IRA SANDERS, PAULETTE SILBERMAN, LINDA C. BARBOZA, TALSIE NEAL, KAREN POLLOCK, VALERIE RODICH-ANNESE, MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES, LLC, THOMAS WILLIAMS, PRISCILLA KLEINMAN, RICHARD GONTESKI, ALPHONSE BORKOWSKI, ROBIN ROBERTS, ELIZABETH DUFFY, JOSEP CACACCIO, SARMISTHA SEN, DENNIS KAPLAN, ROBERT KRUK, BESSIE R. BAKER, GERALD NELSON, JOHN JUDSON, JERRY HOLLAND, KEVORK AVEDIKIAN, PEGGY WATTS, LOREN LEWIS, LARRY TACK, ELIZABETH E GREMILLION, JAMES JONES, EDWIN CHILDS, RICHARD O'NEILL, RANJIT SEN, MICHAEL PATRICK SLAVICH, ROBERT P. BARBOZA, GLORIA BARBER, MAINE AUTOMOBILE DEALERS ASSOCIATION, INC. INSURANCE TRUST, APRIL HARPER, JO ANN HAMEL, EMMANUEL MARTEY, JEANNE TACK, JOSEPH CACACCIO, KATHRYN HOLLAND, Walter Hurens, MARGARET RIDLEY, MAXINE GUILLORY, STEVEN BRADSHAW, RAYMOND ROLLINS, KAREN BRACKMAN, PATRICIA SHEPHERD, Anthony Martinez, Bill Vanhoose, Jeff Somer, Deitrich Broadnax, Robert Fields, Mike Rives, Connie Howard, Deborah Anderson, Celestine Daring, Tanya Dodson, Eva Cornell, Frances Bryant, CURTIS LEBOEUF, YVONNE KELLY, WEDAD ABDOU, SARAH ZEHR, LAWRENCE HERMANN, JEROLD LAMHUT, Roger Tasker, Judy Tasker, JAMES MOSS, RICHARD HEBERT, BETTY F. HEBERT, NOVA ADAMS, AMANDA LOU BABIN, CLINTON HERRRIN, CHARLES BABIN, CHERYL CAUDILL, GLENN BAYS, ELIZABETH CORNETT, CHESTER DAVIDSON, LUCY HOLCOMB, TONY JUSTICE, SUSAN MEFFORD, ALAN ERNEST, BOBBY COLE, SHERRI CLOYD, VIRGIE BUCKLEY, WILLIAM LOVE, LISA DEBORD, CAROL DUVALL, ANTHONY SCOTT BROWNING, ALBERT LEE, STEVEN BUTCHER, PAUL HOWARD, ALBERTA BURNS, DANIEL L. BAUER, TALMADGE HALSEY, MARCIA CANTRELL, DARREN WILKERSON, DENNIS REBER, ROBYN O'DANIEL, WILLIAM REYNOLDS, Barney Miller, CLAYBORNE HAYES, JUDY GRIFFITT, JOE DURBIN, JAMES BETTINGER, JAMES MULLINS, ROGER GIBSON, LENNY NEEDY, KIM THOMPSON, RACHAEL HOLLINGSHEAD, KAREN MEADE, CONSTANCE GRAHAM GARNES, DAVID KELLEY, JON KING, RONALD DILBECK, JAMES HUEY, BUDDY LONG, BENJAMIN COX, CHITIQUA HOCKER, THOMAS AUSTIN, JAMES MAGEE, SR., LANA DUFRENE, CLYDE ROLLINS, JOSEPH A. LUCIANO, CHARLES PITTMAN, DAVID C NUNNALLY, AMY W LUCIANO, CONNIE SMITH, JOYCELYN STEVENS, JEFFREY A BERRYMAN, KEN WISEMAN, JAMES C. SMITH, BRYANT J BROOKS, EVELYN MIMS, SANDRA MEEKS, ELIZABETH AXINN, CHARLOTTE DOYLE, REBIA JACKSON, SANDRA JOHNSON, PATRICIA ANN WITTE, JANICE BROWN, TREY WITTE, KERRIE KATHLEEN STEGER, NATALIE CORTEZ, BEVERLY PATTON, GEORGE DOSS, JANET CHESTER, THERESE FOUGERE, FELICIA C. BLAKE, JEFFREY S. PATTON and KEITH M. BLAKE
Defendant: TEVA INDUSTRIES LTD., HETERO USA INC., CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SOLCO HEALTHCARE U.S. LLC, HUAHAI U.S. INC., TEVA BIOPHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICALS INC., TORRENT PHARMA INC., WALGREEN CO.,, MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., ACTIVIS PHARMA, INC., AVKARE, INC., A-S MEDICATION SOLUTIONS LLC, NUCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., QUALITY FOOD CENTERS INC., HETERO LABS LTD, AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC., MYLAN N.V., SANDOZ INC., MYLAN INC., BRYANT RANCH PREPACK, INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., HARVARD DRUG GROUP, LLC, SCIEGEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., HARRIS TEETER, LLC, NORTHWIND PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, THROGGS NECK PHARMACY, WAL-MART STORES, INC, TORRENT PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., H J HARKINS CO., INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTCAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., PREFERRED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., HARRIS TEETER SUPERMARKETS, INC., WALGREENS, ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD, KROGER CO., THE, RITE AID CORPORATION, MAJOR PHARMACEUTICALS, AUROBINDO PHARMA LTD., REMEDYREPACK INC., ZHEJIANG TIANYU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD., CVS HEALTH CO., ACTAVIS LLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., JOHN DOE, AUROLIFE PHARMA, LLC, HUMANA INC., HUMANA PHARMACY, INC., EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY, EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., Red Oak Sourcing, ALBERTSONS COMPANIES LLC, OPTUM, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH INC., AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORPORATION, MCKESSON CORPORATION, Acteris, LLC, OptumRx, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., ARROW PHARM (MALTA) LTD. and CIGNA CORPORATION
In Re: VALSARTAN N-NITROSODIMETHYLAMINE (NDMA) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Case Number: 1:2019md02875
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Robert B Kugler
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 217 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Status Conference/Discovery Conference held on 9/12/2019. Status Conference and Discovery Conference held on the record. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (dmr)
September 11, 2019 Filing 216 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBERT FIELDS, ELIZABETH DUFFY (Plaintiff in 19-8591), KEN WISEMAN, KIM THOMPSON, SUSAN MEFFORD, JANICE BROWN, THOMAS AUSTIN, DARREN WILKERSON, CECIL BYRD, WEDAD ABDOU, KERRIE KATHLEEN STEGER, MICHAEL PATRICK SLAVICH, ALBERT LEE, DANIEL WINIECKI, ELIZABETH DUFFY(Plaintiff in 18-15076), VERONICA LONGWELL, WALTER HURENS, DOMINIC STIMMA, ROBERT P. BARBOZA, TREY WITTE, EVA CORNELL, KAREN BRACKMAN, THOMAS WILLIAMS, DENNIS KAPLAN, STEVEN BUTCHER, RAYMOND ROLLINS, SANDRA JOHNSON, JEFFREY A BERRYMAN, SHERRI CLOYD, IRA SANDERS, PEGGY WATTS, JOHN JUDSON, BUDDY LONG, FRANCES BRYANT, ELIZABETH E GREMILLION, KATHRYN HOLLAND, ALBERTA BURNS, PATRICIA SHEPHERD, DENNIS REBER, LAWRENCE HERMANN, LINDA C. BARBOZA, FELICIA C. BLAKE, WILLIAM REYNOLDS, YVONNE KELLY, JOSEPH CACACCIO, JAMES MAGEE, SR, WILLIAM LOVE, JOYCELYN STEVENS, DAVID C NUNNALLY, KAREN MEADE, ELIZABETH AXINN, EDWIN CHILDS, DANIEL L. BAUER, VIRGIE BUCKLEY, JEANNE TACK, JON KING, BESSIE R. BAKER, REBIA JACKSON, DEITRICH BROADNAX, ALAN ERNEST, JYNONA GAIL LEE, CHARLES PITTMAN, MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES, LLC, SUSAN GUITON, CHARLES BABIN, LISA DEBORD, MAINE AUTOMOBILE DEALERS ASSOCIATION, INC. INSURANCE TRUST, RICHARD HEBERT, CHARLOTTE DOYLE, STEVEN BRADSHAW, LOREN LEWIS, LUCY HOLCOMB, DEBORAH ANDERSON, NATALIE CORTEZ, BENJAMIN COX, THERESE FOUGERE, LARRY TACK, JEFFREY S. PATTON, ROGER GIBSON, TONY JUSTICE, ERIC ERWIN, JAMES JONES, NOVA ADAMS, ROBERT KRUK, JUDY GRIFFITT, BETTY F. HEBERT, ROBYN O'DANIEL, CELESTINE DARING, BRYANT J BROOKS, JAMES MULLINS, CLYDE ROLLINS, CLINTON HERRRIN, CHITIQUA HOCKER, BEVERLY PATTON, DAVID KELLEY, AMANDA LOU BABIN, AMY W LUCIANO, JAMES MOSS, KAREN POLLOCK, RON MOLINARO, JAMES HUEY, EVELYN MIMS, RICHARD O'NEILL, MIKE RIVES, VALERIE RODICH-ANNESE, JEFF SOMER, CURTIS LEBOEUF, JAMES C. SMITH, BILL VANHOOSE, BARNEY MILLER, GERALD NELSON, MAXINE GUILLORY, BOBBY COLE, CLAYBORNE HAYES, JOSEPH A. LUCIANO, CAROL DUVALL, ELIZABETH CORNETT, GLORIA BARBER, TANYA DODSON, CHESTER DAVIDSON, ANTHONY SCOTT BROWNING, JO ANN HAMEL, VALSARTAN N-NITROSODIMETHYLAMINE (NDMA) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION, JANET CHESTER, KEVORK AVEDIKIAN, PATRICIA ANN WITTE, Roger Tasker, CONNIE SMITH, CHARLES WILLIAMS, LENNY NEEDY, APRIL HARPER, MARCIA CANTRELL, PRISCILLA KLEINMAN, KEITH M. BLAKE, JAMES BETTINGER, BETTY SELPH, MARGARET RIDLEY, TALSIE NEAL, PAULETTE SILBERMAN(Plaintiff in 19-1612), GLENN BAYS, CONNIE HOWARD, RACHAEL HOLLINGSHEAD, MARGOTH STRAND, JEROLD LAMHUT, EMMANUEL MARTEY, LANA DUFRENE, RONALD DILBECK, CHERYL CAUDILL, TALMADGE HALSEY, ALPHONSE BORKOWSKI, SARMISTHA SEN, SARAH ZEHR, RANJIT SEN, ROBIN ROBERTS, RICHARD GONTESKI, PAULETTE SILBERMAN(Plaintiff in 19-9348), JOE DURBIN, Judy Tasker, GEORGE DOSS, PAUL HOWARD, BROWN GREER PLC, SANDRA MEEKS, JERRY HOLLAND, ANTHONY MARTINEZ, JOSEP CACACCIO. AVKARE, INC. waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (GOLDENBERG, MARLENE)
September 11, 2019 Filing 215 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBERT FIELDS, ELIZABETH DUFFY (Plaintiff in 19-8591), KEN WISEMAN, KIM THOMPSON, SUSAN MEFFORD, JANICE BROWN, THOMAS AUSTIN, DARREN WILKERSON, CECIL BYRD, WEDAD ABDOU, KERRIE KATHLEEN STEGER, MICHAEL PATRICK SLAVICH, ALBERT LEE, DANIEL WINIECKI, ELIZABETH DUFFY(Plaintiff in 18-15076), VERONICA LONGWELL, WALTER HURENS, DOMINIC STIMMA, ROBERT P. BARBOZA, TREY WITTE, EVA CORNELL, KAREN BRACKMAN, THOMAS WILLIAMS, DENNIS KAPLAN, STEVEN BUTCHER, RAYMOND ROLLINS, SANDRA JOHNSON, JEFFREY A BERRYMAN, SHERRI CLOYD, IRA SANDERS, PEGGY WATTS, JOHN JUDSON, BUDDY LONG, FRANCES BRYANT, ELIZABETH E GREMILLION, KATHRYN HOLLAND, ALBERTA BURNS, PATRICIA SHEPHERD, DENNIS REBER, LAWRENCE HERMANN, LINDA C. BARBOZA, FELICIA C. BLAKE, WILLIAM REYNOLDS, YVONNE KELLY, JOSEPH CACACCIO, JAMES MAGEE, SR, WILLIAM LOVE, JOYCELYN STEVENS, DAVID C NUNNALLY, KAREN MEADE, ELIZABETH AXINN, EDWIN CHILDS, DANIEL L. BAUER, VIRGIE BUCKLEY, JEANNE TACK, JON KING, BESSIE R. BAKER, REBIA JACKSON, DEITRICH BROADNAX, ALAN ERNEST, JYNONA GAIL LEE, CHARLES PITTMAN, MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES, LLC, SUSAN GUITON, CHARLES BABIN, LISA DEBORD, MAINE AUTOMOBILE DEALERS ASSOCIATION, INC. INSURANCE TRUST, RICHARD HEBERT, CHARLOTTE DOYLE, STEVEN BRADSHAW, LOREN LEWIS, LUCY HOLCOMB, DEBORAH ANDERSON, NATALIE CORTEZ, BENJAMIN COX, THERESE FOUGERE, LARRY TACK, JEFFREY S. PATTON, ROGER GIBSON, TONY JUSTICE, ERIC ERWIN, JAMES JONES, NOVA ADAMS, ROBERT KRUK, JUDY GRIFFITT, BETTY F. HEBERT, ROBYN O'DANIEL, CELESTINE DARING, BRYANT J BROOKS, JAMES MULLINS, CLYDE ROLLINS, CLINTON HERRRIN, CHITIQUA HOCKER, BEVERLY PATTON, DAVID KELLEY, AMANDA LOU BABIN, AMY W LUCIANO, JAMES MOSS, KAREN POLLOCK, RON MOLINARO, JAMES HUEY, EVELYN MIMS, RICHARD O'NEILL, MIKE RIVES, VALERIE RODICH-ANNESE, JEFF SOMER, CURTIS LEBOEUF, JAMES C. SMITH, BILL VANHOOSE, BARNEY MILLER, GERALD NELSON, MAXINE GUILLORY, BOBBY COLE, CLAYBORNE HAYES, JOSEPH A. LUCIANO, CAROL DUVALL, ELIZABETH CORNETT, GLORIA BARBER, TANYA DODSON, CHESTER DAVIDSON, ANTHONY SCOTT BROWNING, JO ANN HAMEL, VALSARTAN N-NITROSODIMETHYLAMINE (NDMA) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION, JANET CHESTER, KEVORK AVEDIKIAN, PATRICIA ANN WITTE, Roger Tasker, CONNIE SMITH, CHARLES WILLIAMS, LENNY NEEDY, APRIL HARPER, MARCIA CANTRELL, PRISCILLA KLEINMAN, KEITH M. BLAKE, JAMES BETTINGER, BETTY SELPH, MARGARET RIDLEY, TALSIE NEAL, PAULETTE SILBERMAN(Plaintiff in 19-1612), GLENN BAYS, CONNIE HOWARD, RACHAEL HOLLINGSHEAD, MARGOTH STRAND, JEROLD LAMHUT, EMMANUEL MARTEY, LANA DUFRENE, RONALD DILBECK, CHERYL CAUDILL, TALMADGE HALSEY, ALPHONSE BORKOWSKI, SARMISTHA SEN, SARAH ZEHR, RANJIT SEN, ROBIN ROBERTS, RICHARD GONTESKI, PAULETTE SILBERMAN(Plaintiff in 19-9348), JOE DURBIN, Judy Tasker, GEORGE DOSS, PAUL HOWARD, BROWN GREER PLC, SANDRA MEEKS, JERRY HOLLAND, ANTHONY MARTINEZ, JOSEP CACACCIO. CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS INC. waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (GOLDENBERG, MARLENE)
September 11, 2019 Filing 214 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBERT FIELDS, ELIZABETH DUFFY (Plaintiff in 19-8591), KEN WISEMAN, KIM THOMPSON, SUSAN MEFFORD, JANICE BROWN, THOMAS AUSTIN, DARREN WILKERSON, CECIL BYRD, WEDAD ABDOU, KERRIE KATHLEEN STEGER, MICHAEL PATRICK SLAVICH, ALBERT LEE, DANIEL WINIECKI, ELIZABETH DUFFY(Plaintiff in 18-15076), VERONICA LONGWELL, WALTER HURENS, DOMINIC STIMMA, ROBERT P. BARBOZA, TREY WITTE, EVA CORNELL, KAREN BRACKMAN, THOMAS WILLIAMS, DENNIS KAPLAN, STEVEN BUTCHER, RAYMOND ROLLINS, SANDRA JOHNSON, JEFFREY A BERRYMAN, SHERRI CLOYD, IRA SANDERS, PEGGY WATTS, JOHN JUDSON, BUDDY LONG, FRANCES BRYANT, ELIZABETH E GREMILLION, KATHRYN HOLLAND, ALBERTA BURNS, PATRICIA SHEPHERD, DENNIS REBER, LAWRENCE HERMANN, LINDA C. BARBOZA, FELICIA C. BLAKE, WILLIAM REYNOLDS, YVONNE KELLY, JOSEPH CACACCIO, JAMES MAGEE, SR, WILLIAM LOVE, JOYCELYN STEVENS, DAVID C NUNNALLY, KAREN MEADE, ELIZABETH AXINN, EDWIN CHILDS, DANIEL L. BAUER, VIRGIE BUCKLEY, JEANNE TACK, JON KING, BESSIE R. BAKER, REBIA JACKSON, DEITRICH BROADNAX, ALAN ERNEST, JYNONA GAIL LEE, CHARLES PITTMAN, MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES, LLC, SUSAN GUITON, CHARLES BABIN, LISA DEBORD, MAINE AUTOMOBILE DEALERS ASSOCIATION, INC. INSURANCE TRUST, RICHARD HEBERT, CHARLOTTE DOYLE, STEVEN BRADSHAW, LOREN LEWIS, LUCY HOLCOMB, DEBORAH ANDERSON, NATALIE CORTEZ, BENJAMIN COX, THERESE FOUGERE, LARRY TACK, JEFFREY S. PATTON, ROGER GIBSON, TONY JUSTICE, ERIC ERWIN, JAMES JONES, NOVA ADAMS, ROBERT KRUK, JUDY GRIFFITT, BETTY F. HEBERT, ROBYN O'DANIEL, CELESTINE DARING, BRYANT J BROOKS, JAMES MULLINS, CLYDE ROLLINS, CLINTON HERRRIN, CHITIQUA HOCKER, BEVERLY PATTON, DAVID KELLEY, AMANDA LOU BABIN, AMY W LUCIANO, JAMES MOSS, KAREN POLLOCK, RON MOLINARO, JAMES HUEY, EVELYN MIMS, RICHARD O'NEILL, MIKE RIVES, VALERIE RODICH-ANNESE, JEFF SOMER, CURTIS LEBOEUF, JAMES C. SMITH, BILL VANHOOSE, BARNEY MILLER, GERALD NELSON, MAXINE GUILLORY, BOBBY COLE, CLAYBORNE HAYES, JOSEPH A. LUCIANO, CAROL DUVALL, ELIZABETH CORNETT, GLORIA BARBER, TANYA DODSON, CHESTER DAVIDSON, ANTHONY SCOTT BROWNING, JO ANN HAMEL, VALSARTAN N-NITROSODIMETHYLAMINE (NDMA) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION, JANET CHESTER, KEVORK AVEDIKIAN, PATRICIA ANN WITTE, Roger Tasker, CONNIE SMITH, CHARLES WILLIAMS, LENNY NEEDY, APRIL HARPER, MARCIA CANTRELL, PRISCILLA KLEINMAN, KEITH M. BLAKE, JAMES BETTINGER, BETTY SELPH, MARGARET RIDLEY, TALSIE NEAL, PAULETTE SILBERMAN(Plaintiff in 19-1612), GLENN BAYS, CONNIE HOWARD, RACHAEL HOLLINGSHEAD, MARGOTH STRAND, JEROLD LAMHUT, EMMANUEL MARTEY, LANA DUFRENE, RONALD DILBECK, CHERYL CAUDILL, TALMADGE HALSEY, ALPHONSE BORKOWSKI, SARMISTHA SEN, SARAH ZEHR, RANJIT SEN, ROBIN ROBERTS, RICHARD GONTESKI, PAULETTE SILBERMAN(Plaintiff in 19-9348), JOE DURBIN, Judy Tasker, GEORGE DOSS, PAUL HOWARD, BROWN GREER PLC, SANDRA MEEKS, JERRY HOLLAND, ANTHONY MARTINEZ, JOSEP CACACCIO. KROGER CO., THE waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (GOLDENBERG, MARLENE)
September 11, 2019 Filing 213 Letter from Seth A. Goldberg Providing Defendants' Positions for Sept. 12, 2019 Status Conference. (GOLDBERG, SETH)
September 11, 2019 Filing 212 Letter from Adam M. Slater Regarding September 12, 2019 Status Conference. (SLATER, ADAM)
September 10, 2019 Filing 211 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) (SLATER, ADAM)
September 10, 2019 Filing 210 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 30(b)(6) (SLATER, ADAM)
September 10, 2019 Filing 209 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBERT FIELDS, ELIZABETH DUFFY (Plaintiff in 19-8591), KEN WISEMAN, KIM THOMPSON, SUSAN MEFFORD, JANICE BROWN, THOMAS AUSTIN, DARREN WILKERSON, CECIL BYRD, WEDAD ABDOU, KERRIE KATHLEEN STEGER, MICHAEL PATRICK SLAVICH, ALBERT LEE, DANIEL WINIECKI, ELIZABETH DUFFY(Plaintiff in 18-15076), VERONICA LONGWELL, WALTER HURENS, DOMINIC STIMMA, ROBERT P. BARBOZA, TREY WITTE, EVA CORNELL, KAREN BRACKMAN, THOMAS WILLIAMS, DENNIS KAPLAN, STEVEN BUTCHER, RAYMOND ROLLINS, SANDRA JOHNSON, JEFFREY A BERRYMAN, SHERRI CLOYD, IRA SANDERS, PEGGY WATTS, JOHN JUDSON, BUDDY LONG, FRANCES BRYANT, ELIZABETH E GREMILLION, KATHRYN HOLLAND, ALBERTA BURNS, PATRICIA SHEPHERD, DENNIS REBER, LAWRENCE HERMANN, LINDA C. BARBOZA, FELICIA C. BLAKE, WILLIAM REYNOLDS, YVONNE KELLY, JOSEPH CACACCIO, JAMES MAGEE, SR, WILLIAM LOVE, JOYCELYN STEVENS, DAVID C NUNNALLY, KAREN MEADE, ELIZABETH AXINN, EDWIN CHILDS, DANIEL L. BAUER, VIRGIE BUCKLEY, JEANNE TACK, JON KING, BESSIE R. BAKER, REBIA JACKSON, DEITRICH BROADNAX, ALAN ERNEST, JYNONA GAIL LEE, CHARLES PITTMAN, MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES, LLC, SUSAN GUITON, CHARLES BABIN, LISA DEBORD, MAINE AUTOMOBILE DEALERS ASSOCIATION, INC. INSURANCE TRUST, RICHARD HEBERT, CHARLOTTE DOYLE, STEVEN BRADSHAW, LOREN LEWIS, LUCY HOLCOMB, DEBORAH ANDERSON, NATALIE CORTEZ, BENJAMIN COX, THERESE FOUGERE, LARRY TACK, JEFFREY S. PATTON, ROGER GIBSON, TONY JUSTICE, ERIC ERWIN, JAMES JONES, NOVA ADAMS, ROBERT KRUK, JUDY GRIFFITT, BETTY F. HEBERT, ROBYN O'DANIEL, CELESTINE DARING, BRYANT J BROOKS, JAMES MULLINS, CLYDE ROLLINS, CLINTON HERRRIN, CHITIQUA HOCKER, BEVERLY PATTON, DAVID KELLEY, AMANDA LOU BABIN, AMY W LUCIANO, JAMES MOSS, KAREN POLLOCK, RON MOLINARO, JAMES HUEY, EVELYN MIMS, RICHARD O'NEILL, MIKE RIVES, VALERIE RODICH-ANNESE, JEFF SOMER, CURTIS LEBOEUF, JAMES C. SMITH, BILL VANHOOSE, BARNEY MILLER, GERALD NELSON, MAXINE GUILLORY, BOBBY COLE, CLAYBORNE HAYES, JOSEPH A. LUCIANO, CAROL DUVALL, ELIZABETH CORNETT, GLORIA BARBER, TANYA DODSON, CHESTER DAVIDSON, ANTHONY SCOTT BROWNING, JO ANN HAMEL, VALSARTAN N-NITROSODIMETHYLAMINE (NDMA) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION, JANET CHESTER, KEVORK AVEDIKIAN, PATRICIA ANN WITTE, Roger Tasker, CONNIE SMITH, CHARLES WILLIAMS, LENNY NEEDY, APRIL HARPER, MARCIA CANTRELL, PRISCILLA KLEINMAN, KEITH M. BLAKE, JAMES BETTINGER, BETTY SELPH, MARGARET RIDLEY, TALSIE NEAL, PAULETTE SILBERMAN(Plaintiff in 19-1612), GLENN BAYS, CONNIE HOWARD, RACHAEL HOLLINGSHEAD, MARGOTH STRAND, JEROLD LAMHUT, EMMANUEL MARTEY, LANA DUFRENE, RONALD DILBECK, CHERYL CAUDILL, TALMADGE HALSEY, ALPHONSE BORKOWSKI, SARMISTHA SEN, SARAH ZEHR, RANJIT SEN, ROBIN ROBERTS, RICHARD GONTESKI, PAULETTE SILBERMAN(Plaintiff in 19-9348), JOE DURBIN, Judy Tasker, GEORGE DOSS, PAUL HOWARD, BROWN GREER PLC, SANDRA MEEKS, JERRY HOLLAND, ANTHONY MARTINEZ, JOSEP CACACCIO. A-S MEDICATION SOLUTIONS LLC waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (GOLDENBERG, MARLENE)
September 10, 2019 Filing 208 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBERT FIELDS, ELIZABETH DUFFY (Plaintiff in 19-8591), KEN WISEMAN, KIM THOMPSON, SUSAN MEFFORD, JANICE BROWN, THOMAS AUSTIN, DARREN WILKERSON, CECIL BYRD, WEDAD ABDOU, KERRIE KATHLEEN STEGER, MICHAEL PATRICK SLAVICH, ALBERT LEE, DANIEL WINIECKI, ELIZABETH DUFFY(Plaintiff in 18-15076), VERONICA LONGWELL, WALTER HURENS, DOMINIC STIMMA, ROBERT P. BARBOZA, TREY WITTE, EVA CORNELL, KAREN BRACKMAN, THOMAS WILLIAMS, DENNIS KAPLAN, STEVEN BUTCHER, RAYMOND ROLLINS, SANDRA JOHNSON, JEFFREY A BERRYMAN, SHERRI CLOYD, IRA SANDERS, PEGGY WATTS, JOHN JUDSON, BUDDY LONG, FRANCES BRYANT, ELIZABETH E GREMILLION, KATHRYN HOLLAND, ALBERTA BURNS, PATRICIA SHEPHERD, DENNIS REBER, LAWRENCE HERMANN, LINDA C. BARBOZA, FELICIA C. BLAKE, WILLIAM REYNOLDS, YVONNE KELLY, JOSEPH CACACCIO, JAMES MAGEE, SR, WILLIAM LOVE, JOYCELYN STEVENS, DAVID C NUNNALLY, KAREN MEADE, ELIZABETH AXINN, EDWIN CHILDS, DANIEL L. BAUER, VIRGIE BUCKLEY, JEANNE TACK, JON KING, BESSIE R. BAKER, REBIA JACKSON, DEITRICH BROADNAX, ALAN ERNEST, JYNONA GAIL LEE, CHARLES PITTMAN, MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES, LLC, SUSAN GUITON, CHARLES BABIN, LISA DEBORD, MAINE AUTOMOBILE DEALERS ASSOCIATION, INC. INSURANCE TRUST, RICHARD HEBERT, CHARLOTTE DOYLE, STEVEN BRADSHAW, LOREN LEWIS, LUCY HOLCOMB, DEBORAH ANDERSON, NATALIE CORTEZ, BENJAMIN COX, THERESE FOUGERE, LARRY TACK, JEFFREY S. PATTON, ROGER GIBSON, TONY JUSTICE, ERIC ERWIN, JAMES JONES, NOVA ADAMS, ROBERT KRUK, JUDY GRIFFITT, BETTY F. HEBERT, ROBYN O'DANIEL, CELESTINE DARING, BRYANT J BROOKS, JAMES MULLINS, CLYDE ROLLINS, CLINTON HERRRIN, CHITIQUA HOCKER, BEVERLY PATTON, DAVID KELLEY, AMANDA LOU BABIN, AMY W LUCIANO, JAMES MOSS, KAREN POLLOCK, RON MOLINARO, JAMES HUEY, EVELYN MIMS, RICHARD O'NEILL, MIKE RIVES, VALERIE RODICH-ANNESE, JEFF SOMER, CURTIS LEBOEUF, JAMES C. SMITH, BILL VANHOOSE, BARNEY MILLER, GERALD NELSON, MAXINE GUILLORY, BOBBY COLE, CLAYBORNE HAYES, JOSEPH A. LUCIANO, CAROL DUVALL, ELIZABETH CORNETT, GLORIA BARBER, TANYA DODSON, CHESTER DAVIDSON, ANTHONY SCOTT BROWNING, JO ANN HAMEL, VALSARTAN N-NITROSODIMETHYLAMINE (NDMA) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION, JANET CHESTER, KEVORK AVEDIKIAN, PATRICIA ANN WITTE, Roger Tasker, CONNIE SMITH, CHARLES WILLIAMS, LENNY NEEDY, APRIL HARPER, MARCIA CANTRELL, PRISCILLA KLEINMAN, KEITH M. BLAKE, JAMES BETTINGER, BETTY SELPH, MARGARET RIDLEY, TALSIE NEAL, PAULETTE SILBERMAN(Plaintiff in 19-1612), GLENN BAYS, CONNIE HOWARD, RACHAEL HOLLINGSHEAD, MARGOTH STRAND, JEROLD LAMHUT, EMMANUEL MARTEY, LANA DUFRENE, RONALD DILBECK, CHERYL CAUDILL, TALMADGE HALSEY, ALPHONSE BORKOWSKI, SARMISTHA SEN, SARAH ZEHR, RANJIT SEN, ROBIN ROBERTS, RICHARD GONTESKI, PAULETTE SILBERMAN(Plaintiff in 19-9348), JOE DURBIN, Judy Tasker, GEORGE DOSS, PAUL HOWARD, BROWN GREER PLC, SANDRA MEEKS, JERRY HOLLAND, ANTHONY MARTINEZ, JOSEP CACACCIO. AUROLIFE PHARMA, LLC waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (GOLDENBERG, MARLENE)
September 10, 2019 Filing 207 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBERT FIELDS, ELIZABETH DUFFY (Plaintiff in 19-8591), KEN WISEMAN, KIM THOMPSON, SUSAN MEFFORD, JANICE BROWN, THOMAS AUSTIN, DARREN WILKERSON, CECIL BYRD, WEDAD ABDOU, KERRIE KATHLEEN STEGER, MICHAEL PATRICK SLAVICH, ALBERT LEE, DANIEL WINIECKI, ELIZABETH DUFFY(Plaintiff in 18-15076), VERONICA LONGWELL, WALTER HURENS, DOMINIC STIMMA, ROBERT P. BARBOZA, TREY WITTE, EVA CORNELL, KAREN BRACKMAN, THOMAS WILLIAMS, DENNIS KAPLAN, STEVEN BUTCHER, RAYMOND ROLLINS, SANDRA JOHNSON, JEFFREY A BERRYMAN, SHERRI CLOYD, IRA SANDERS, PEGGY WATTS, JOHN JUDSON, BUDDY LONG, FRANCES BRYANT, ELIZABETH E GREMILLION, KATHRYN HOLLAND, ALBERTA BURNS, PATRICIA SHEPHERD, DENNIS REBER, LAWRENCE HERMANN, LINDA C. BARBOZA, FELICIA C. BLAKE, WILLIAM REYNOLDS, YVONNE KELLY, JOSEPH CACACCIO, JAMES MAGEE, SR, WILLIAM LOVE, JOYCELYN STEVENS, DAVID C NUNNALLY, KAREN MEADE, ELIZABETH AXINN, EDWIN CHILDS, DANIEL L. BAUER, VIRGIE BUCKLEY, JEANNE TACK, JON KING, BESSIE R. BAKER, REBIA JACKSON, DEITRICH BROADNAX, ALAN ERNEST, JYNONA GAIL LEE, CHARLES PITTMAN, MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES, LLC, SUSAN GUITON, CHARLES BABIN, LISA DEBORD, MAINE AUTOMOBILE DEALERS ASSOCIATION, INC. INSURANCE TRUST, RICHARD HEBERT, CHARLOTTE DOYLE, STEVEN BRADSHAW, LOREN LEWIS, LUCY HOLCOMB, DEBORAH ANDERSON, NATALIE CORTEZ, BENJAMIN COX, THERESE FOUGERE, LARRY TACK, JEFFREY S. PATTON, ROGER GIBSON, TONY JUSTICE, ERIC ERWIN, JAMES JONES, NOVA ADAMS, ROBERT KRUK, JUDY GRIFFITT, BETTY F. HEBERT, ROBYN O'DANIEL, CELESTINE DARING, BRYANT J BROOKS, JAMES MULLINS, CLYDE ROLLINS, CLINTON HERRRIN, CHITIQUA HOCKER, BEVERLY PATTON, DAVID KELLEY, AMANDA LOU BABIN, AMY W LUCIANO, JAMES MOSS, KAREN POLLOCK, RON MOLINARO, JAMES HUEY, EVELYN MIMS, RICHARD O'NEILL, MIKE RIVES, VALERIE RODICH-ANNESE, JEFF SOMER, CURTIS LEBOEUF, JAMES C. SMITH, BILL VANHOOSE, BARNEY MILLER, GERALD NELSON, MAXINE GUILLORY, BOBBY COLE, CLAYBORNE HAYES, JOSEPH A. LUCIANO, CAROL DUVALL, ELIZABETH CORNETT, GLORIA BARBER, TANYA DODSON, CHESTER DAVIDSON, ANTHONY SCOTT BROWNING, JO ANN HAMEL, VALSARTAN N-NITROSODIMETHYLAMINE (NDMA) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION, JANET CHESTER, KEVORK AVEDIKIAN, PATRICIA ANN WITTE, Roger Tasker, CONNIE SMITH, CHARLES WILLIAMS, LENNY NEEDY, APRIL HARPER, MARCIA CANTRELL, PRISCILLA KLEINMAN, KEITH M. BLAKE, JAMES BETTINGER, BETTY SELPH, MARGARET RIDLEY, TALSIE NEAL, PAULETTE SILBERMAN(Plaintiff in 19-1612), GLENN BAYS, CONNIE HOWARD, RACHAEL HOLLINGSHEAD, MARGOTH STRAND, JEROLD LAMHUT, EMMANUEL MARTEY, LANA DUFRENE, RONALD DILBECK, CHERYL CAUDILL, TALMADGE HALSEY, ALPHONSE BORKOWSKI, SARMISTHA SEN, SARAH ZEHR, RANJIT SEN, ROBIN ROBERTS, RICHARD GONTESKI, PAULETTE SILBERMAN(Plaintiff in 19-9348), JOE DURBIN, Judy Tasker, GEORGE DOSS, PAUL HOWARD, BROWN GREER PLC, SANDRA MEEKS, JERRY HOLLAND, ANTHONY MARTINEZ, JOSEP CACACCIO. AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC. waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (GOLDENBERG, MARLENE)
September 10, 2019 Filing 206 Letter from Seth A. Goldberg Providing Proposed Joint Agenda for Sept. 12 Status Conference. (GOLDBERG, SETH)
September 10, 2019 Filing 205 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney REBECCA JAYNE FIEBIG terminated. (FIEBIG, REBECCA)
September 10, 2019 Filing 204 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney ENBAR TOLEDANO terminated. (TOLEDANO, ENBAR)
September 10, 2019 Filing 203 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney RICHARD WETTERSTEN SMITH terminated. (SMITH, RICHARD)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MDL TEXT ORDER -- It is hereby ORDERED that the conference call with Magistrate Judge Schneider presently scheduled on September 11, 2019 at 4:00 p.m. is rescheduled to September 12, 2019 at 4:00 p.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/9/19. (Schneider, Joel)
September 6, 2019 Filing 201 NOTICE of Change of Address by KIRSTIN B. IVES (IVES, KIRSTIN)
September 6, 2019 Filing 200 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/14/2019, before Judge JOEL SCHNEIDER. Court Reporter/Transcriber Carol Farrell (856-318-6100). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 9/27/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/5/2019. (tf, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 199 SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT ISSUED as to ACTAVIS LLC, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., ALBERTSONS COMPANIES LLC, AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORPORATION, ARROW PHARM (MALTA) LTD., Acteris, LLC, BRYANT RANCH PREPACK, INC., CARDINAL HEALTH INC., CIGNA CORPORATION, EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY, EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., H J HARKINS CO., INC., MCKESSON CORPORATION, MYLAN N.V., OPTUM, INC., OptumRx, PREFERRED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Red Oak Sourcing, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dmr)
September 5, 2019 Filing 198 Request for Summons to be Issued by ROBERT FIELDS, CECIL BYRD, VERONICA LONGWELL, DOMINIC STIMMA, DENNIS KAPLAN, JOHN JUDSON, JOSEPH CACACCIO, JYNONA GAIL LEE, MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES, LLC, MAINE AUTOMOBILE DEALERS ASSOCIATION, INC. INSURANCE TRUST, ERIC ERWIN, ROBERT KRUK, CELESTINE DARING, RON MOLINARO, RICHARD O'NEILL, MIKE RIVES, VALERIE RODICH-ANNESE, GERALD NELSON, JO ANN HAMEL, Roger Tasker, TALSIE NEAL, PAULETTE SILBERMAN(Plaintiff in 19-1612), ALPHONSE BORKOWSKI, SARAH ZEHR, ROBIN ROBERTS, PAULETTE SILBERMAN(Plaintiff in 19-9348), Judy Tasker as to ACTAVIS LLC, BRYANT RANCH PREPACK, INC., H J HARKINS CO., INC., MYLAN N.V., PREFERRED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Acteris, LLC, ALBERTSONS COMPANIES LLC, AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORPORATION, ARROW PHARM (MALTA) LTD., CARDINAL HEALTH INC., CIGNA CORPORATION, EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY, EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC., MCKESSON CORPORATION, OPTUM, INC., OptumRx, Red Oak Sourcing, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.. (STANOCH, DAVID)
September 5, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Short form complaint #197 filed by Joseph D. Lane on 9/4/2019 appears to have been filed incorrectly in the MASTER MDL case. PLEASE FOLLOW THE INSTRUCTIONS FOR OPENING A NEW COMPLAINT in MDL 2875 by using the following link https://www.njd.uscourts.gov/sites/njd/files/AttorneyWorkflow2875.pdf This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dmw)
September 4, 2019 Filing 197 Short Form Complaint by GEORGE DOSS. (LANE, JOSEPH)
September 3, 2019 Filing 196 AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against HUAHAI U.S. INC., PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SOLCO HEALTHCARE U.S. LLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTCAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD, filed by RONALD DILBECK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(KOHLS, DANIEL)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 Order of MDL Panel CTO 11 transferring certain actions to this court. (dd, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 194 NOTICE of Appearance by ERNEST F. KOSCHINEG, III on behalf of AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC., AUROLIFE PHARMA, LLC (KOSCHINEG, ERNEST)
September 3, 2019 Filing 193 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA MARGARET HEINZ on behalf of AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC., AUROLIFE PHARMA, LLC (HEINZ, JESSICA)
August 28, 2019 Filing 192 AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against KROGER CO., THE, MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN N.V., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SANDOZ INC., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., filed by CLYDE ROLLINS.(MCGARTLAND, MICHAEL)
August 27, 2019 Filing 191 AMENDED COMPLAINT - SHORT FORM COMPLAINT OF RACHAEL HOLLINGSHEAD against AUROBINDO PHARMA LTD., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC., AUROLIFE PHARMA, LLC, MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., filed by RACHAEL HOLLINGSHEAD.(DANIEL, SINDHU)
August 22, 2019 Filing 190 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/10/19, before Judge Schneider. Transcriber Diana Doman Transcribing (856-435-7172). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 9/12/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/23/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2019. (dd, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 189 BRIEF In Support of Request to Include Disclosure of Litigation Funding (LOCKARD, VICTORIA)
August 21, 2019 Filing 188 BRIEF In Opposition to Defendants' Request to Include Disclosure of Litigation Funding (SLATER, ADAM)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 13 APPROVING AND ORDERING USE OF SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/20/2019. (dmr)
August 20, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Withdrawal of Appearance #186 filed by ADRIANNA YANEZ on 8/19/2019 was submitted incorrectly using the wrong Notice event. The Clerk will terminate the attorney, but in the future, please file using the correct event "Notice to Withdraw from NEF as to Case" found under Notices. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only (dmr)
August 19, 2019 Filing 186 NOTICE by AVKARE, INC., CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS INC., KROGER CO., THE (YANEZ, ADRIANNA)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MDL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 12 Defendants shall produce the facility, corporate organization, and ANDA information agreed to by the parties by 9/16/2019. Plaintiffs request that defendants supplement their list of responsive Bates numbers is DENIED, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/16/2019. (rtm, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 184 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Status Conference held on 8/15/2019. In Person Status Conference held on the record. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder Carol Farrell.) (dmr)
August 15, 2019 Filing 183 LETTER to Counsel denying without prejudice Defendants' request for leave to file motion to dismiss, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/14/2019. (dmr)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MDL TEXT ORDER -- It is hereby ORDERED the record is corrected to reflect that the CMO entered on July 26, 2019 [Doc. No. 167] should reflect that it is CMO NO. 11 (rather than 10). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/14/19. (Schneider, Joel)
August 12, 2019 Filing 181 Letter from Seth A. Goldberg re: Core Discovery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(GOLDBERG, SETH)
August 9, 2019 Filing 180 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney CHRISTINA LYNN SAVERIANO terminated. (SAVERIANO, CHRISTINA)
August 8, 2019 Filing 179 Letter from Adam M. Slater. (SLATER, ADAM)
August 6, 2019 Filing 178 Letter from Adam M. Slater Regarding Core Discovery. (SLATER, ADAM)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 Order of MDL Panel transferring certain actions from Southern District of California to this court. (dd, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 176 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/24/19, before Judge Kugler and Schneider. Court Reporter/Transcriber Karen Friedlander (856-756-0160). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter due, but not filed, by 8/21/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/3/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/29/2019. (dd, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 175 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/24/19, before Judge Schneider. Court Reporter/Transcriber Karen Friedlander (856-756-0160). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter due, but not filed, by 8/21/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/3/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/29/2019. (dd, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 174 Letter from Seth A. Goldberg Requesting to Brief Motions to Dismiss. (GOLDBERG, SETH)
July 29, 2019 Filing 173 AMENDED DOCUMENT by JOYCELYN STEVENS. Notice of Appearance. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(TUMOLO, LOUIS)
July 29, 2019 Filing 172 NOTICE of Appearance by LOUIS FRANCIS TUMOLO on behalf of KEN WISEMAN (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(TUMOLO, LOUIS)
July 29, 2019 Filing 171 NOTICE of Appearance by LOUIS FRANCIS TUMOLO on behalf of JOYCELYN STEVENS (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(TUMOLO, LOUIS)
July 29, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Requests for Default #168 and #170 filed by DANIEL ROBERTSON on 7/26/2019 appears to be filed in the incorrect case. PLEASE REVIEW THE DOCUMENT and file it in the MEMBER case. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dmr)
July 26, 2019 Filing 170 APPLICATION/PETITION for Entry of Default re Def Edna Dilbeck for by RONALD DILBECK. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl re Application for Entry of Default re Def Edna Dilbeck)(ROBERTSON, DANIEL)
July 26, 2019 Filing 169 NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY MICHAEL CHRISTINA on behalf of MAINE AUTOMOBILE DEALERS ASSOCIATION, INC. INSURANCE TRUST (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CHRISTINA, ANTHONY)
July 26, 2019 Filing 168 STIPULATION for Entry of Default as to Def Cordelia Morris by RONALD DILBECK. (ROBERTSON, DANIEL)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 10: The next In-Person Conference is set for 8/14/2019 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 7/26/2019. (dmr)
July 24, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Status Conference held on 7/24/2019. (tf, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 166 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Status Conference held on 7/24/2019. In-Person Status Conference held on the record.Order to be entered (Court Reporter/Recorder Karen Friedlander.) (dmr)
July 24, 2019 Filing 165 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Kugler: Status Conference held on 7/24/2019. Status conference held on the record.Ordered status conference set for September 25, 2019.Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder Karen Friedlander.) (dmr)
July 24, 2019 Filing 164 NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY HEAVLIN RIFFER on behalf of SANDOZ INC. (RIFFER, TIFFANY)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Order of MDL Panel CTO 10 transferring certain actions to this court. (dd, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 162 NOTICE of Appearance by DEVORA WHITMAN ALLON on behalf of TORRENT PHARMA INC., TORRENT PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED (ALLON, DEVORA)
July 23, 2019 Filing 161 NOTICE of Appearance by JAY PHILIP LEFKOWITZ on behalf of TORRENT PHARMA INC., TORRENT PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED (LEFKOWITZ, JAY)
July 22, 2019 Filing 160 Letter from Seth A. Goldberg re: July 24, 2019 CMC. (GOLDBERG, SETH)
July 22, 2019 Filing 159 Letter from Adam M. Slater re 07-24-19 CMC Agenda. (SLATER, ADAM)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Order of MDL Panel CTO -9 transferring certain action from the District of Kentucky Eastern; Case# 5:19-229 to this court. (dd, )
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MDL TEXT ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/24/2019 at 01:30 PM in Camden - Courtroom 4D before Judge Robert B. Kugler. So Ordered by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 7/28/2019. (lm)
July 18, 2019 Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance by TYLER G. JOHANNES on behalf of HUMANA INC., HUMANA PHARMACY, INC. (JOHANNES, TYLER)
July 18, 2019 Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by MEGAN A. ZMICK on behalf of HUMANA INC., HUMANA PHARMACY, INC. (ZMICK, MEGAN)
July 18, 2019 Filing 154 NOTICE of Appearance by KIRSTIN B. IVES on behalf of HUMANA INC., HUMANA PHARMACY, INC. (IVES, KIRSTIN)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting letter request to modify deadlines in CMO #4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 7/17/2019. (dmr)
July 17, 2019 Filing 152 NOTICE of Appearance by MYLES MCGUIRE on behalf of ROBERT KRUK (MCGUIRE, MYLES)
July 16, 2019 Filing 151 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY PATRICK KINGSBURY on behalf of ROBERT KRUK (KINGSBURY, TIMOTHY)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Order of MDL Panel CTO-8 transferring certain actions to this court. (dd, )
July 15, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Short Form Complaint document #149 filed by Kay Van Wey on 7/12/19 was filed incorrectly on the Master Case docket. In order for the Clerk to assign a civil action number please file the complaint using the instructions found in the Guide for Attorney case opening located on the Court's Website. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. n.m. (dd, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 149 Short Form Complaint by Barney Miller. (VAN WEY, KAY)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER regarding disputes to be raised prior to the in-person Discovery Conference set for 7/24/2019 at 10:00 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 7/11/2019. (dmr)
July 10, 2019 Filing 147 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Status Conference held on 7/10/2019. Telephone Status Conference held on the record. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder Electronic Court Reporter.) (dmr)
July 9, 2019 Filing 146 STATEMENT Defendants' Position Statement for July 10, 2019 Telephonic Status Conference by All Defendants. (GOLDBERG, SETH)
July 9, 2019 Filing 145 Letter from Adam M. Slater, Esq. regarding June 10, 2019 discovery status conference. (SLATER, ADAM)
July 9, 2019 Filing 144 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/26/19, before Judge Schneider. Court Reporter Karen Friedlander (856-756-0160). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter due, but not filed, by 7/30/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/9/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/7/2019. (dd, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 143 NOTICE by HUAHAI U.S. INC., PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICALS INC., RITE AID CORPORATION, SOLCO HEALTHCARE U.S. LLC, THROGGS NECK PHARMACY, WAL-MART STORES, INC, WALGREEN CO.,, ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD AGENDA FOR JULY 10, 2019 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE (GOLDBERG, SETH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 142 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney MARY WU TULLIS; LINDA WONG; DANIEL C. FLEMING and BRUCE ANTHONY MCMULLEN terminated. Attorney WALTER H. SWAYZE, III,MEGAN E. GROSSMAN for AVKARE, INC.,ADRIANNA MARIE YANEZ,WALTER H. SWAYZE, III,MEGAN E. GROSSMAN for KROGER CO., THE,ADRIANNA MARIE YANEZ for TEVA PHARMACEUTCAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. added.. (YANEZ, ADRIANNA)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 10: All discovery disputes will be addressed at the in-person conference scheduled on 10/23/2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3C. The Court will address with the parties during the next scheduled conference call with the Court on 7/10/2019 (4:00 p.m.) are disputes regarding the Fact Sheets for plaintiffs and defendants and the status of the proposed Form Complaint, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 7/1/2019. (dmr)
June 26, 2019 Filing 140 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: In-Person Status Conference held on the record. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder Karen Friedlander.) (rss, )
June 26, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Status Conference held on 6/26/2019. (tf, )
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 6/26/2019. (dmr)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER finding as moot #20 Motion to Quash -- With the consent of moving counsel, it is hereby ORDERED this motion is DENIED as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/26/19. (Schneider, Joel)
June 26, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Status Conference held on 6/26/2019. (lm)
June 25, 2019 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN JOSEPH CRONAN, III on behalf of MAINE AUTOMOBILE DEALERS ASSOCIATION, INC. INSURANCE TRUST (CRONAN, JOHN)
June 25, 2019 Filing 136 Letter from Lori G. Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Confidentiality and Protective Order)(LOCKARD, VICTORIA)
June 24, 2019 Filing 135 STATEMENT - Defendants' Position Statement for June 26th CMC by All Defendants. (GOLDBERG, SETH)
June 24, 2019 Filing 134 Letter from Adam M. Slater, Esq. regarding agenda for June 26, 2019 Case Management Conference. (SLATER, ADAM)
June 24, 2019 Filing 133 NOTICE of Appearance by KARTIK MADIRAJU on behalf of VALERIE RODICH-ANNESE (MADIRAJU, KARTIK)
June 24, 2019 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by RACHEL GEMAN on behalf of VALERIE RODICH-ANNESE (GEMAN, RACHEL)
June 21, 2019 Filing 131 NOTICE by All Defendants Agenda for June 26, 2019 Case Management Conference (GOLDBERG, SETH)
June 20, 2019 Filing 130 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/20/2019. Telephone Status Conference held on the record, (Court Reporter/Recorder Electronic Court Reporter.) (dmr)
June 19, 2019 Filing 129 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/29/19, before Judge Schneider. Court Reporter Carl Nami (856-757-5019). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter due, but not filed, by 7/10/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2019. (dd, )
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 9: Service Through MdL Centrality Stipulated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/19/2019. (dmr)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 8: Electronic Discovery Protocol Stipulated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/19/2019. (dmr)
June 18, 2019 Filing 126 Proposed Pretrial Order No. 9 Stipulated Service Protocol by All Plaintiffs. (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
June 18, 2019 Filing 125 Proposed Pretrial Order No. 8 Stipulated Electronic Discovery Protocol by All Plaintiffs. (PAREKH, BEHRAM)
June 18, 2019 Filing 124 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/12/19, before Judge Schneider. Transcriber Diana Doman Transcribing (856-435-7172). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 7/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/19/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/16/2019. (dd, )
June 18, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #122 Application filed by Marlene Goldenberg on 6/17/2019 was submitted incorrectly as an Application for Stay of execution. The clerk's office has modified the entry to Amended complaint filed pursuant to Court's Order #103 . This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dmw)
June 17, 2019 Filing 123 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Amended Medical Monitoring Class Action Complaint against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by ROBERT FIELDS, JOHN JUDSON, ROBERT KRUK, CELESTINE DARING, MIKE RIVES, VALERIE RODICH-ANNESE, SARAH ZEHR, PAULETTE SILBERMAN(Plaintiff in 19-9348), Judy Tasker, Roger Tasker.(SLATER, ADAM)
June 17, 2019 Filing 122 Amended Complaint pursuant to #103 Master Personal Injury, COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9748730) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JEANNE TACK, LARRY TACK.(GOLDENBERG, MARLENE) Modified on 6/18/2019 (dmw).
June 17, 2019 Filing 121 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Amended Economic Loss Class Action Complaint against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by ERIC ERWIN, CECIL BYRD, VERONICA LONGWELL, DOMINIC STIMMA, DENNIS KAPLAN, RON MOLINARO, RICHARD O'NEILL, GERALD NELSON, JO ANN HAMEL, JOSEPH CACACCIO, JYNONA GAIL LEE, MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES, LLC, TALSIE NEAL, MAINE AUTOMOBILE DEALERS ASSOCIATION, INC. INSURANCE TRUST, ALPHONSE BORKOWSKI, ROBIN ROBERTS.(STANOCH, DAVID)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER regarding insurance disclosures, proposed fact sheets, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/14/2019. (dmr)
June 12, 2019 Filing 119 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/12/2019. (Court Reporter/Recorder Electronic Court Reporter.) (dmr)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MDL TEXT ORDER -- It is hereby ORDERED the start time for the conference call on June 12, 2019 is changed from 4:00 p.m. to 3:00 p.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/11/19. (Schneider, Joel)
June 11, 2019 Filing 117 Letter from Seth A. Goldberg regarding the 6/12/19 teleconference. (GOLDBERG, SETH)
June 11, 2019 Filing 116 Letter from Adam M. Slater, Esq. regarding the 6/12/19 discovery status conference. (SLATER, ADAM)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MDL TEXT ORDER -- To the extent a conference call was scheduled on June 5, 2019, it is hereby ORDERED the call is POSTPONED. The Court will proceed with the scheduled conference call on June 12, 2019, at 4:00 p.m. Plaintiffs' counsel shall arrange the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/3/19. (Schneider, Joel)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 7, Telephone Conference scheduled for 6/12/2019 at 4:00 PM. In-person Status Conference set for 6/26/2019 at 10:00 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider and with Judge Kugler at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 4D, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/3/2019. (dmr)
May 31, 2019 Filing 113 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/8/19, before Judge Schneider. Transcriber Diana Doman Transcribing (856-435-7172). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 6/21/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/1/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/29/2019. (dd, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 112 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Status Conference held on 5/29/2019. In-Person Status Conference held on the record. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder Carl Nami.) (dmr)
May 29, 2019 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN M. HARKINS on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTCAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (HARKINS, STEVEN)
May 28, 2019 Filing 110 Letter from Enbar Toledano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (1) Draft ESI Protocol)(TOLEDANO, ENBAR)
May 28, 2019 Filing 109 Letter from Lori G. Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Draft Confidentiality and Protective Order)(LOCKARD, VICTORIA)
May 28, 2019 Filing 108 Letter from Lori G. Cohen. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff Profile Form, #2 Highlighted Class Rep Profile Form, #3 Highlighted Pl Plaintiff Profile Form)(LOCKARD, VICTORIA)
May 24, 2019 Filing 107 NOTICE by All Defendants Agenda for May 29, 2019 Case Management Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(GOLDBERG, SETH)
May 22, 2019 Filing 106 NOTICE of Appearance by ERNEST F. KOSCHINEG, III on behalf of AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC., AUROLIFE PHARMA, LLC (KOSCHINEG, ERNEST)
May 22, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA MARGARET HEINZ on behalf of AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC., AUROLIFE PHARMA, LLC (HEINZ, JESSICA)
May 14, 2019 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by ENBAR TOLEDANO on behalf of TORRENT PHARMA INC. (TOLEDANO, ENBAR)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER directing Plaintiffs' Master Complaint to be filed by 6/17/2019; Roger W. Orlando, Esq, Plaintiffs' counsel in the pending New Jersey State Court cases, shall appear in person at the scheduled conferences on 5/29/2019 to address the consolidation of the State and Federal related cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 5/9/2019. (dmr)
May 9, 2019 Filing 102 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Status Conference held on 5/9/2019. Telephone Status Conference held on the record. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder Electronic Court Reporter.) (dmr)
May 8, 2019 Filing 101 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/10/2019, before Judge JOEL SCHNEIDER. Court Reporter/Transcriber DIANA DOMAN TRANSCRIBING, LLC ((856) 435-7172). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 5/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/6/2019. (tf, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 100 COMPLAINT against AUROBINDO PHARMA LTD., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC., HUAHAI U.S. INC., PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SOLCO HEALTHCARE U.S. LLC, ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD, AUROLIFE PHARMA, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9649978) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Frances Bryant.(MENDENHALL, CALLE) The clerk's office has filed this complaint under Civil Action No. 19-12283 (ssp, ).
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER regarding due process notice. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 5/7/2019. (dmr)
May 7, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE by HUAHAI U.S. INC., PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SOLCO HEALTHCARE U.S. LLC, ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD OF AGENDA FOR MAY 8, 2019 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE (GOLDBERG, SETH)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER re insurance information and FOIA requests; The next in-person conference will be held on May 29, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider in Courtroom 3C and at 1:30 p.m. before Judge Robert B. Kugler in Courtroom 4D.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 5/6/2019. (dmr)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 6 APPROVING PLAINTIFFS' AND DEFENDANTS' LEADERSHIP STRUCTURE. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 5/6/2019. (dmr)
May 6, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Complaint doc #95 filed by Steven Babin, Esquire on 5/3/2019 has been filed in the incorrect case. The clerk's office has filed this complaint under Civil Action No. 19-12143 and counsel will receive an notice of electronic filing, once the case is processed. PLEASE REVIEW Guide for Attorney case opening on our website before opening any cases in the future. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dmw)
May 3, 2019 Filing 95 COMPLAINT against CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS INC., CVS HEALTH CO., HETERO LABS LTD, HETERO USA INC., HUAHAI U.S. INC., MYLAN INC., MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICALS INC., ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., JOHN DOE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9639074) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Celestine Daring, Mike Rives, Robert Fields, Anthony Martinez, Jeff Somer, Connie Howard, Deitrich Broadnax, Bill Vanhoose, Tanya Dodson, Eva Cornell, Deborah Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BABIN, STEVEN)
May 2, 2019 Filing 94 Letter from Adam M. Slater. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SLATER, ADAM)
May 1, 2019 Filing 93 Letter from Ruben Honik. (HONIK, RUBEN)
May 1, 2019 Filing 92 BRIEF Regarding General Service of Process on Defendants (HONIK, RUBEN)
May 1, 2019 Filing 91 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/24/2019, before Judge JOEL SCHNEIDER. Court Reporter/Transcriber DIANA DOMAN TRANSCRIBING, LLC ((856) 435-7172). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 5/22/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/3/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2019. (tf, )
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 5: ORDERED that interested parties shall submit by the close of business on May 2, 2019, briefs not exceeding five (5) describing whether Mylan Laboratories Limited has been successfully served with process and whether the plaintiffs must serve each of the three Master Complaints upon non U.S. defendants pursuant to the Hague Convention. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 5/1/2019. (dmr)
May 1, 2019 Filing 89 BRIEF on Service of Multiple Complaints (LOCKARD, VICTORIA)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MDL ORDER regarding core discovery. Status Conference Call set for 5/8/2019 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 4/29/2019. (dmr)
April 25, 2019 Filing 86 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/24/2019, before JUDGE ROBERT B. KUGLER AND MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOEL SCHNEIDER. Court Reporter/Transcriber Carl Nami (856-757-5019). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 5/16/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2019. (tf, )
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 4 TIME AND EXPENSE REPORTING OF COMMON BENEFIT FEES AND RELATED COSTS. The first time and expense report due 7/15/2019, the second submission will be due 10/15/2019, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/25/2019. (dmr)
April 25, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW DAVID KAPLAN on behalf of MAJOR PHARMACEUTICALS (KAPLAN, ANDREW)
April 25, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW DAVID KAPLAN on behalf of HARVARD DRUG GROUP, LLC (KAPLAN, ANDREW)
April 24, 2019 Filing 82 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Kugler: Status Conference held on 4/24/2019. Ordered status conference set for May 29, 2019 at 2:00PM. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder CARL NAMI, JR..) (tf, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 81 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: In-Person Status Conference held on 4/24/2019. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder Electronic Court Recorder.) (tf, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re: AGENDA FOR APRIL 24, 2019 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(SLATER, ADAM)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Order of MDL Panel CTO 4 transferring certain actions to this court. (dd, )
April 10, 2019 Filing 78 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Status Conference held on the record on 4/10/2019. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder Electronic Court Reporter.) (dmr)
April 10, 2019 Filing 77 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/27/2019, before THE HONORABLE ROBERT B. KUGLER SENIOR UNITED STATES DISTRICT JUDGE MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOEL SCHNEIDER. Court Reporter/Transcriber Carl Nami (856-757-5019). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 5/1/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/13/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2019. (tf, ) (Main Document 77 replaced on 4/15/2019) (dd). (Main Document 77 replaced on 4/16/2019) (dd).
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 3: Any plaintiff who files a complaint in accordance with this CMO prior to the Court's approval of the short form complaint must file a short form complaint within 30 days of the Court's approval of the short form complaint, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/9/2019. (dmr)
April 5, 2019 Filing 75 Letter from Adam Slater. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Direct Filing Order)(SLATER, ADAM)
April 4, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by PAIGE NICOLE BOLDT on behalf of PRISCILLA KLEINMAN (BOLDT, PAIGE)
April 3, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by ALAN KLEIN on behalf of HUAHAI U.S. INC., PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICALS INC., RITE AID CORPORATION, SOLCO HEALTHCARE U.S. LLC, THROGGS NECK PHARMACY, WAL-MART STORES, INC, WALGREEN CO.,, ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD (KLEIN, ALAN)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO: 2: ORDERED that the next monthly status conference shall occur on Wednesday, April 24, 2019, in Courtroom 3C at 10:00 am, and in Courtroom 4D at 1:30 pm, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 4/2/2019. (dmr)
April 2, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by ALYSON LOUISE OLIVER on behalf of Walter Hurens (OLIVER, ALYSON)
April 1, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE NICOLE MICHAEL on behalf of REMEDYREPACK INC. (MICHAEL, MICHELLE)
April 1, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by PAULINE F. TUTELO on behalf of REMEDYREPACK INC. (TUTELO, PAULINE)
April 1, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by HOWARD B. MANKOFF on behalf of REMEDYREPACK INC. (MANKOFF, HOWARD)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Order of MDL Panel (CTO-3)transferring certain action from the District of Mississippi Southern; Case# 3:19-195 to this court. (dd, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 66 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney KENNETH MARC KLEMM terminated. (KLEMM, KENNETH)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MDL TEXT ORDER -- In accordance with the Court's direction at the March 27, 2019 conference, it is hereby ORDERED the Court will hold a status conference call with the parties' leadership counsel on April 10, 2019 at 4:00 p.m. Until the entry of the Court's Order designating the parties' leadership counsel, the parties shall designate the appropriate counsel to participate on the conference call. Plaintiffs' counsel shall arrange the call. At least two(2) days before the conference call the parties shall serve a joint letter with the list of issues to address. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 3/29/19. (Schneider, Joel)
March 29, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by HILARY ELIZABETH JOHNSON on behalf of MAJOR PHARMACEUTICALS (JOHNSON, HILARY)
March 29, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBBIE FREYDA ROGART on behalf of HARVARD DRUG GROUP, LLC (ROGART, ROBBIE)
March 29, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBBIE FREYDA ROGART on behalf of MAJOR PHARMACEUTICALS (ROGART, ROBBIE)
March 28, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN C. BABIN, JR on behalf of KAREN POLLOCK (BABIN, STEVEN)
March 28, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA ANN PRISELAC on behalf of HUAHAI U.S. INC., PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SOLCO HEALTHCARE U.S. LLC, ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD (PRISELAC, JESSICA)
March 28, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by CLEM C. TRISCHLER on behalf of MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (TRISCHLER, CLEM)
March 28, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL CALEB LEVIN on behalf of VALERIE RODICH-ANNESE (LEVIN, DANIEL)
March 27, 2019 Filing 57 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Kugler and Judge Joel Schneider: Initial Discovery Scheduling Conference held on 3/27/2019. Ordered status conference set for April 24, 2019 at 1:30PM. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter/Recorder CARL NAMI, JR..) (tf, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 56 Letter from Ashleigh Raso to Hon. Robert B. Kugler re 5 Order. (RASO, ASHLEIGH)
March 26, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by REBECCA JAYNE FIEBIG on behalf of TORRENT PHARMA INC. (FIEBIG, REBECCA)
March 26, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD WETTERSTEN SMITH on behalf of TORRENT PHARMA INC. (SMITH, RICHARD)
March 26, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL A. NIGH on behalf of KEVORK AVEDIKIAN, GLORIA BARBER, EMMANUEL MARTEY, KAREN POLLOCK, RANJIT SEN, SARMISTHA SEN, PEGGY WATTS, CHARLES WILLIAMS, THOMAS WILLIAMS, DANIEL WINIECKI (NIGH, DANIEL)
March 26, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON MICHAEL REEFER on behalf of MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (REEFER, JASON)
March 26, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by HILARY ELIZABETH JOHNSON on behalf of HARVARD DRUG GROUP, LLC (JOHNSON, HILARY)
March 26, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by JULIA KOESTNER WITTMAN on behalf of A-S MEDICATION SOLUTIONS LLC (WITTMAN, JULIA)
March 26, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN ELLIOTT STINE on behalf of A-S MEDICATION SOLUTIONS LLC (STINE, LAUREN)
March 26, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL S. CATLETT on behalf of A-S MEDICATION SOLUTIONS LLC (CATLETT, MICHAEL)
March 26, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by VICTORIA DAVIS LOCKARD on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (LOCKARD, VICTORIA)
March 25, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY PAUL HANSEL on behalf of MAINE AUTOMOBILE DEALERS ASSOCIATION, INC. INSURANCE TRUST (HANSEL, GREGORY)
March 25, 2019 Filing 45 Letter from James C. Shah to Hon. Robert B. Kugler re #5 Order. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SHAH, JAMES)
March 25, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by SIGMUND DAVID SCHUTZ on behalf of MAINE AUTOMOBILE DEALERS ASSOCIATION, INC. INSURANCE TRUST (SCHUTZ, SIGMUND)
March 25, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by EIZABETH FLETCHER QUINBY on behalf of MAINE AUTOMOBILE DEALERS ASSOCIATION, INC. INSURANCE TRUST (QUINBY, EIZABETH)
March 25, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN H. RUBENSTEIN on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN)
March 25, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW JOSEPH OBERGFELL on behalf of CECIL BYRD, JOSEP CACACCIO, JOSEPH CACACCIO, ELIZABETH DUFFY (Plaintiff in 19-8591), GERALD NELSON (OBERGFELL, ANDREW)
March 25, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW JOSEPH OBERGFELL on behalf of ELIZABETH DUFFY(Plaintiff in 18-15076), JYNONA GAIL LEE, DOMINIC STIMMA, MARGOTH STRAND (OBERGFELL, ANDREW)
March 22, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by NICHOLAS A. MIGLIACCIO on behalf of VALERIE RODICH-ANNESE (MIGLIACCIO, NICHOLAS)
March 22, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON S. RATHOD on behalf of VALERIE RODICH-ANNESE (RATHOD, JASON)
March 21, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE by All Defendants of Ex Parte Submission of Defendants' Position Statement Pursuant to Case Mgmt. Order 1 (GOLDBERG, SETH)
March 21, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by STACY ANN BURROWS on behalf of RICHARD O'NEILL (BURROWS, STACY)
March 20, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Joint Submission Agenda Items Pursuant to Case Mgmt. Order No. 1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule 1, #2 Exhibit Schedule 2)(STANOCH, DAVID)
March 20, 2019 Filing 34 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by MAINE AUTOMOBILE DEALERS ASSOCIATION, INC. INSURANCE TRUST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Case Management Proposal and Motion)(RABINOVITZ, URIEL)
March 20, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by NICOLE D. GALLI on behalf of NORTHWIND PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC (GALLI, NICOLE)
March 20, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM R. CREDEUR on behalf of ELIZABETH E GREMILLION (CREDEUR, ADAM)
March 20, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by KENNETH W DEJEAN on behalf of ELIZABETH E GREMILLION (DEJEAN, KENNETH)
March 20, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by NATALIE M. DEJEAN on behalf of ELIZABETH E GREMILLION (DEJEAN, NATALIE)
March 19, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL T. GESKE on behalf of ROBERT KRUK (GESKE, PAUL)
March 19, 2019 Filing 28 Letter from Lanny Darr re #5 Order. (DARR, LANNY)
March 19, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE ALLEN BARTON on behalf of RICHARD O'NEILL (BARTON, GEORGE)
March 18, 2019 Filing 26 Letter from Edwin E. Wallis, III, Esq. re #5 Order. (WALLIS, EDWIN)
March 14, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN LUCAS SPADORA on behalf of NUCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (SPADORA, BRIAN)
March 14, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by BETH S. ROSE on behalf of NUCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (ROSE, BETH)
March 14, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES J. FALLETTA on behalf of NUCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (FALLETTA, CHARLES)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order of MDL Panel CTO-2 transferring certain actions to this court. (dd, )
March 13, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by LORI G. COHEN on behalf of TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. (COHEN, LORI)
March 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #20 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Service of Process. Motion set for 4/15/2019 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
March 12, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Quash/Compel/Enforce Service of Process by ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G)(GOLDBERG, SETH)
March 11, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by ERNEST F. KOSCHINEG, III on behalf of AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC. (KOSCHINEG, ERNEST)
March 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA MARGARET HEINZ on behalf of AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC. (HEINZ, JESSICA)
March 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by DONALD R. MCMINN on behalf of SANDOZ INC. (MCMINN, DONALD)
March 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by HEATHER ANN PIGMAN on behalf of SANDOZ INC. (PIGMAN, HEATHER)
March 7, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW LANE REISSAUS on behalf of SANDOZ INC. (REISSAUS, ANDREW)
March 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDRES RIVERO on behalf of MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES, LLC (RIVERO, ANDRES)
March 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER D. ST. PHILLIP, JR on behalf of MAINE AUTOMOBILE DEALERS ASSOCIATION, INC. INSURANCE TRUST (ST. PHILLIP, PETER)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by URIEL RABINOVITZ on behalf of MAINE AUTOMOBILE DEALERS ASSOCIATION, INC. INSURANCE TRUST (RABINOVITZ, URIEL)
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by BRUCE ANTHONY MCMULLEN on behalf of KROGER CO., THE, QUALITY FOOD CENTERS INC. (MCMULLEN, BRUCE)
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN SAWIN on behalf of ROBERT KRUK (SAWIN, JOHN)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by MARY WU TULLIS on behalf of KROGER CO., THE, QUALITY FOOD CENTERS INC. (TULLIS, MARY)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA MARGARET HEINZ on behalf of CVS HEALTH CO. (HEINZ, JESSICA)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion to Reassign tag-along cases. SO ORDERED by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 2/27/2019. (lm)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #4 Motion to Stay; All deadlines in the actions currently pending in or later transferred to the multidistrict litigation are SUSPENDED and VACATED pending the initial case management conference, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 2/26/2019. (dmr)
February 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Vacate Deadlines Pending Entry of a Case Management Order. Motion set for 4/1/2019 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MDL Case Management Order No. 1. The Court will hold the Initial Conference in Courtroom 4D on 3/27/2019 at 2:00 PM, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 2/25/2019.
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order MDL Case Management Order No. 1. The Court will hold the Initial Conference in Courtroom 4D on 3/27/2019 at 2:00 PM, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 2/25/2019. (dmr)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Vacate Deadlines Pending Entry of a Case Management Order by HUAHAI U.S. INC., PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SOLCO HEALTHCARE U.S. LLC, ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GOLDBERG, SETH)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order of MDL Panel(CTO-1) transferring certain actions to this court.(dd, )
February 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Reassign Case Tag-Alongs into the MDL. Motion set for 3/18/2019 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Reassign Case Tag-Alongs into the MDL by HUAHAI U.S. INC., PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICALS INC., SOLCO HEALTHCARE U.S. LLC, ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule of Actions)(GOLDBERG, SETH)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Order of MDL Panel transferring certain actions to this court. (dd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VALSARTAN N-NITROSODIMETHYLAMINE (NDMA) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA INDUSTRIES LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HETERO USA INC.
Represented By: ROBERT ELMORE BLANTON, JR.
Represented By: JANET LYNN POLETTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMBER PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: MEGAN E. GROSSMAN
Represented By: WALTER H. SWAYZE, III
Represented By: ADRIANNA MARIE YANEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOLCO HEALTHCARE U.S. LLC
Represented By: SETH A. GOLDBERG
Represented By: MELISSA S. GELLER
Represented By: PAUL EVANS CHRONIS
Represented By: MEREDITH PROCTOR GRANT
Represented By: ELINOR HART MURAROVA
Represented By: KEVIN F HORMUTH
Represented By: JESSICA ANN PRISELAC
Represented By: ALAN KLEIN
Represented By: DAWNN ELAYNE BRIDDELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUAHAI U.S. INC.
Represented By: SETH A. GOLDBERG
Represented By: DREW T DORNER
Represented By: MELISSA S. GELLER
Represented By: MEREDITH PROCTOR GRANT
Represented By: KEVIN F HORMUTH
Represented By: JESSICA ANN PRISELAC
Represented By: ALAN KLEIN
Represented By: DAWNN ELAYNE BRIDDELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA BIOPHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: AARON VAN NOSTRAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRINSTON PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: SETH A. GOLDBERG
Represented By: MELISSA S. GELLER
Represented By: PAUL EVANS CHRONIS
Represented By: MEREDITH PROCTOR GRANT
Represented By: ELINOR HART MURAROVA
Represented By: KEVIN F HORMUTH
Represented By: JESSICA ANN PRISELAC
Represented By: ALAN KLEIN
Represented By: DAWNN ELAYNE BRIDDELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TORRENT PHARMA INC.
Represented By: CHRISTINA LYNN SAVERIANO
Represented By: REBECCA JAYNE FIEBIG
Represented By: RICHARD WETTERSTEN SMITH
Represented By: ENBAR TOLEDANO
Represented By: JAY PHILIP LEFKOWITZ
Represented By: DEVORA WHITMAN ALLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALGREEN CO.,
Represented By: SETH A. GOLDBERG
Represented By: ALAN KLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: JASON MICHAEL REEFER
Represented By: CLEM C. TRISCHLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTIVIS PHARMA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVKARE, INC.
Represented By: MEGAN E. GROSSMAN
Represented By: WALTER H. SWAYZE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-S MEDICATION SOLUTIONS LLC
Represented By: MICHAEL C. SALVO
Represented By: MICHAEL S. CATLETT
Represented By: JULIA KOESTNER WITTMAN
Represented By: LAUREN ELLIOTT STINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NUCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: BRIAN LUCAS SPADORA
Represented By: BETH S. ROSE
Represented By: CHARLES J. FALLETTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUALITY FOOD CENTERS INC.
Represented By: BRUCE ANTHONY MCMULLEN
Represented By: KENNETH MARC KLEMM
Represented By: LINDA WONG
Represented By: MARY WU TULLIS
Represented By: DANIEL C. FLEMING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HETERO LABS LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC.
Represented By: JESSICA MARGARET HEINZ
Represented By: ERNEST F. KOSCHINEG, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDOZ INC.
Represented By: AARON VAN NOSTRAND
Represented By: DONALD R. MCMINN
Represented By: ANDREW LANE REISSAUS
Represented By: HEATHER ANN PIGMAN
Represented By: TIFFANY HEAVLIN RIFFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRYANT RANCH PREPACK, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN LABORATORIES LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARVARD DRUG GROUP, LLC
Represented By: HILARY ELIZABETH JOHNSON
Represented By: ROBBIE FREYDA ROGART
Represented By: ANDREW DAVID KAPLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCIEGEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRIS TEETER, LLC
Represented By: LINDA WONG
Represented By: DANIEL C. FLEMING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHWIND PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC
Represented By: NICOLE D. GALLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THROGGS NECK PHARMACY
Represented By: SETH A. GOLDBERG
Represented By: ALAN KLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART STORES, INC
Represented By: PAUL EVANS CHRONIS
Represented By: DAVID E. SELLINGER
Represented By: ELINOR HART MURAROVA
Represented By: ALAN KLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TORRENT PHARMACEUTICALS LIMITED
Represented By: JAY PHILIP LEFKOWITZ
Represented By: DEVORA WHITMAN ALLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Represented By: LORI G. COHEN
Represented By: BRIAN H. RUBENSTEIN
Represented By: VICTORIA DAVIS LOCKARD
Represented By: STEVEN M. HARKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H J HARKINS CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTCAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
Represented By: STEVEN M. HARKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PREFERRED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRIS TEETER SUPERMARKETS, INC.
Represented By: LINDA WONG
Represented By: DANIEL C. FLEMING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALGREENS
Represented By: SETH A. GOLDBERG
Represented By: ALAN KLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZHEJIANG HUAHAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD
Represented By: SETH A. GOLDBERG
Represented By: DREW T DORNER
Represented By: PAUL EVANS CHRONIS
Represented By: ELINOR HART MURAROVA
Represented By: KEVIN F HORMUTH
Represented By: JESSICA ANN PRISELAC
Represented By: ALAN KLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KROGER CO., THE
Represented By: BRUCE ANTHONY MCMULLEN
Represented By: KENNETH MARC KLEMM
Represented By: LINDA WONG
Represented By: MARY WU TULLIS
Represented By: DANIEL C. FLEMING
Represented By: MEGAN E. GROSSMAN
Represented By: WALTER H. SWAYZE, III
Represented By: ADRIANNA MARIE YANEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITE AID CORPORATION
Represented By: ALAN KLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAJOR PHARMACEUTICALS
Represented By: Kelly T. Currie
Represented By: ROBBIE FREYDA ROGART
Represented By: HILARY ELIZABETH JOHNSON
Represented By: ANDREW DAVID KAPLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REMEDYREPACK INC.
Represented By: PAULINE F. TUTELO
Represented By: HOWARD B. MANKOFF
Represented By: MICHELLE NICOLE MICHAEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZHEJIANG TIANYU PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS HEALTH CO.
Represented By: JESSICA MARGARET HEINZ
Represented By: ERNEST F. KOSCHINEG, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROLIFE PHARMA, LLC
Represented By: JESSICA MARGARET HEINZ
Represented By: ERNEST F. KOSCHINEG, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUMANA INC.
Represented By: MEGAN A. ZMICK
Represented By: TYLER G. JOHANNES
Represented By: KIRSTIN B. IVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUMANA PHARMACY, INC.
Represented By: MEGAN A. ZMICK
Represented By: TYLER G. JOHANNES
Represented By: KIRSTIN B. IVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPRESS SCRIPTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Oak Sourcing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBERTSONS COMPANIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPTUM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARDINAL HEALTH INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acteris, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARROW PHARM (MALTA) LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOMINIC STIMMA
Represented By: ANDREW JOSEPH OBERGFELL
Represented By: DAVID JOHN STANOCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JYNONA GAIL LEE
Represented By: ANDREW JOSEPH OBERGFELL
Represented By: DAVID JOHN STANOCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGOTH STRAND
Represented By: ANDREW JOSEPH OBERGFELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC ERWIN
Represented By: DAVID JOHN STANOCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATH HOLLAND
Represented By: Andrea T McKellar
Represented By: GEORGE T. WILLIAMSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES WILLIAMS
Represented By: Kathleen M. O'Donnell
Represented By: DANIEL A. NIGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL WINIECKI
Represented By: CHERISSE HEIDI ALCANTARA CLEOFE
Represented By: DANIEL A. NIGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN GUITON
Represented By: BEHRAM V. PAREKH
Represented By: MICHAEL L. KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RON MOLINARO
Represented By: Brian T. Ku
Represented By: ALLAN KANNER
Represented By: DAVID JOHN STANOCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CECIL BYRD
Represented By: SCOTT A. BURSOR
Represented By: ANDREW JOSEPH OBERGFELL
Represented By: DAVID JOHN STANOCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETTY SELPH
Represented By: ANNESLEY HODGES DEGARIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VERONICA LONGWELL
Represented By: Peter J. Ainsworth
Represented By: DAVID JOHN STANOCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRA SANDERS
Represented By: ANDREW JOSEPH OBERGFELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAULETTE SILBERMAN
Represented By: ADAM M. SLATER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA C. BARBOZA
Represented By: Kathleen M. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TALSIE NEAL
Represented By: RUBEN HONIK
Represented By: DAVID JOHN STANOCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN POLLOCK
Represented By: STEVEN C. BABIN, JR.
Represented By: DANIEL A. NIGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALERIE RODICH-ANNESE
Represented By: NICHOLAS A. MIGLIACCIO
Represented By: DANIEL AARON RIHN
Represented By: JASON S. RATHOD
Represented By: DANIEL CALEB LEVIN
Represented By: KARTIK MADIRAJU
Represented By: RACHEL GEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP RECOVERY CLAIMS, SERIES, LLC
Represented By: Alan H. Rolnick
Represented By: ANDRES RIVERO
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER LUKE COFFIN
Represented By: DAVID JOHN STANOCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS WILLIAMS
Represented By: Jason Ruskin Reese
Represented By: DANIEL A. NIGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRISCILLA KLEINMAN
Represented By: David V. McLendon
Represented By: PAIGE NICOLE BOLDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD GONTESKI
Represented By: JAMES C. SHAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALPHONSE BORKOWSKI
Represented By: DAVID JOHN STANOCH
Represented By: RUBEN HONIK
Represented By: JOHN RANDOLPH DAVIS
Represented By: PAUL G. JOYCE
Represented By: MICHAEL L. SLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBIN ROBERTS
Represented By: RUBEN HONIK
Represented By: DAVID JOHN STANOCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH DUFFY
Represented By: ANDREW JOSEPH OBERGFELL
Represented By: SCOTT A. BURSOR
Represented By: JOSEPH I. MARCHESE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEP CACACCIO
Represented By: SCOTT A. BURSOR
Represented By: ANDREW JOSEPH OBERGFELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARMISTHA SEN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER T. HELLUMS
Represented By: DANIEL A. NIGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS KAPLAN
Represented By: RUBEN HONIK
Represented By: DAVID JOHN STANOCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT KRUK
Represented By: JOHN SAWIN
Represented By: PAUL T. GESKE
Represented By: SCOTT ANTHONY MORGAN
Represented By: TIMOTHY PATRICK KINGSBURY
Represented By: MYLES MCGUIRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BESSIE R. BAKER
Represented By: Jason Ruskin Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALD NELSON
Represented By: SCOTT A. BURSOR
Represented By: ANDREW JOSEPH OBERGFELL
Represented By: DAVID JOHN STANOCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN JUDSON
Represented By: ALLAN KANNER
Represented By: JOHN RANDOLPH DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERRY HOLLAND
Represented By: Andrea T McKellar
Represented By: GEORGE T. WILLIAMSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVORK AVEDIKIAN
Represented By: BEHRAM V. PAREKH
Represented By: DANIEL A. NIGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEGGY WATTS
Represented By: Andrea T McKellar
Represented By: DANIEL A. NIGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOREN LEWIS
Represented By: ROBERT A COX
Represented By: EDWIN EARL WALLIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY TACK
Represented By: MARLENE J GOLDENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH E GREMILLION
Represented By: NATALIE M. DEJEAN
Represented By: KENNETH W DEJEAN
Represented By: QUENTIN F. URQUHART, JR.
Represented By: ADAM R. CREDEUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES JONES
Represented By: LANNY H. DARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWIN CHILDS
Represented By: PAIGE NICOLE BOLDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD O'NEILL
Represented By: STEFANIE LYNN COLELLA-WALSH
Represented By: STACY ANN BURROWS
Represented By: GEORGE ALLEN BARTON
Represented By: DAVID JOHN STANOCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANJIT SEN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER T. HELLUMS
Represented By: DANIEL A. NIGH
Represented By: JONATHAN S MANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL PATRICK SLAVICH
Represented By: PAIGE NICOLE BOLDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT P. BARBOZA
Represented By: Kathleen M. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLORIA BARBER
Represented By: DANIEL A. NIGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAINE AUTOMOBILE DEALERS ASSOCIATION, INC. INSURANCE TRUST
Represented By: PETER D. ST. PHILLIP, JR.
Represented By: URIEL RABINOVITZ
Represented By: EIZABETH FLETCHER QUINBY
Represented By: SIGMUND DAVID SCHUTZ
Represented By: GREGORY PAUL HANSEL
Represented By: DAVID JOHN STANOCH
Represented By: JOHN JOSEPH CRONAN, III
Represented By: ANTHONY MICHAEL CHRISTINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APRIL HARPER
Represented By: ADAM M. SLATER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JO ANN HAMEL
Represented By: ALLAN KANNER
Represented By: JOHN RANDOLPH DAVIS
Represented By: DAVID JOHN STANOCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMMANUEL MARTEY
Represented By: Michael Brandon Smith
Represented By: DANIEL A. NIGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEANNE TACK
Represented By: MARLENE J GOLDENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH CACACCIO
Represented By: SCOTT A. BURSOR
Represented By: ANDREW JOSEPH OBERGFELL
Represented By: DAVID JOHN STANOCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHRYN HOLLAND
Represented By: Andrea T McKellar
Represented By: GEORGE T. WILLIAMSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Hurens
Represented By: ALYSON LOUISE OLIVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGARET RIDLEY
Represented By: Michael Brandon Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAXINE GUILLORY
Represented By: DANIEL A. NIGH
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER LUKE COFFIN
Represented By: JESSICA A. PEREZ
Represented By: NICHOLAS RYAN ROCKFORTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN BRADSHAW
Represented By: DANIEL A. NIGH
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BRETT VAUGHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND ROLLINS
Represented By: PAIGE NICOLE BOLDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN BRACKMAN
Represented By: Andrea T McKellar
Represented By: DANIEL A. NIGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA SHEPHERD
Represented By: DANIEL A. NIGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Martinez
Represented By: STEVEN C. BABIN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Vanhoose
Represented By: STEVEN C. BABIN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Somer
Represented By: STEVEN C. BABIN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deitrich Broadnax
Represented By: STEVEN C. BABIN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Fields
Represented By: STEVEN C. BABIN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Rives
Represented By: STEVEN C. BABIN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Howard
Represented By: STEVEN C. BABIN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Anderson
Represented By: STEVEN C. BABIN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celestine Daring
Represented By: STEVEN C. BABIN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Dodson
Represented By: STEVEN C. BABIN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Cornell
Represented By: STEVEN C. BABIN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Bryant
Represented By: CALLE M. MENDENHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CURTIS LEBOEUF
Represented By: JASON CHARLES CHAMBERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YVONNE KELLY
Represented By: MARLENE J GOLDENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WEDAD ABDOU
Represented By: DANIEL A. NIGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAH ZEHR
Represented By: DANIEL A. NIGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE HERMANN
Represented By: MORRIS S. DWECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEROLD LAMHUT
Represented By: MORRIS S. DWECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Tasker
Represented By: ADAM M. SLATER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Tasker
Represented By: ADAM M. SLATER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MOSS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BRETT VAUGHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD HEBERT
Represented By: DAMON J. BALDONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETTY F. HEBERT
Represented By: DAMON J. BALDONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOVA ADAMS
Represented By: JASON CHARLES CHAMBERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANDA LOU BABIN
Represented By: DAMON J. BALDONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLINTON HERRRIN
Represented By: JASON CHARLES CHAMBERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES BABIN
Represented By: DAMON J. BALDONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERYL CAUDILL
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLENN BAYS
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH CORNETT
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHESTER DAVIDSON
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUCY HOLCOMB
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONY JUSTICE
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN MEFFORD
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALAN ERNEST
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOBBY COLE
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERRI CLOYD
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIRGIE BUCKLEY
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM LOVE
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA DEBORD
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL DUVALL
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY SCOTT BROWNING
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERT LEE
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN BUTCHER
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL HOWARD
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERTA BURNS
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL L. BAUER
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TALMADGE HALSEY
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCIA CANTRELL
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARREN WILKERSON
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS REBER
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBYN O'DANIEL
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM REYNOLDS
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barney Miller
Represented By: KAY L. VAN WEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAYBORNE HAYES
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDY GRIFFITT
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOE DURBIN
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES BETTINGER
Represented By: JOSEPH D. LANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MULLINS
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROGER GIBSON
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LENNY NEEDY
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIM THOMPSON
Represented By: LARACLAY PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RACHAEL HOLLINGSHEAD
Represented By: SINDHU SUSAN DANIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN MEADE
Represented By: BEHRAM V. PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONSTANCE GRAHAM GARNES
Represented By: ADAM M. SLATER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID KELLEY
Represented By: ADAM M. SLATER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JON KING
Represented By: MATTHEW PALMER LAMBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD DILBECK
Represented By: DANIEL V KOHLS
Represented By: DANIEL WILLIAM ROBERTSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES HUEY
Represented By: MATTHEW PALMER LAMBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BUDDY LONG
Represented By: JOSEPH D. LANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENJAMIN COX
Represented By: ALYSON LOUISE OLIVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHITIQUA HOCKER
Represented By: JENNIFER A. MOORE
Represented By: ASHTON R. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS AUSTIN
Represented By: JOSEPH D. LANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MAGEE, SR.
Represented By: JOSEPH D. LANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LANA DUFRENE
Represented By: MATTHEW PALMER LAMBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLYDE ROLLINS
Represented By: MICHAEL P. MCGARTLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH A. LUCIANO
Represented By: NATALIE M. DEJEAN
Represented By: KENNETH W DEJEAN
Represented By: ADAM R. CREDEUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES PITTMAN
Represented By: JOHN D. SILEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID C NUNNALLY
Represented By: NATALIE M. DEJEAN
Represented By: KENNETH W DEJEAN
Represented By: L Clayton Burgess
Represented By: ADAM R. CREDEUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMY W LUCIANO
Represented By: NATALIE M. DEJEAN
Represented By: KENNETH W DEJEAN
Represented By: ADAM R. CREDEUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONNIE SMITH
Represented By: NATALIE M. DEJEAN
Represented By: KENNETH W DEJEAN
Represented By: ADAM R. CREDEUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOYCELYN STEVENS
Represented By: LOUIS FRANCIS TUMOLO
Represented By: PETER JOSEPH JOHNSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY A BERRYMAN
Represented By: JENNIFER A. MOORE
Represented By: ASHTON R. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEN WISEMAN
Represented By: LOUIS FRANCIS TUMOLO
Represented By: PETER JOSEPH JOHNSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES C. SMITH
Represented By: NATALIE M. DEJEAN
Represented By: KENNETH W DEJEAN
Represented By: ADAM R. CREDEUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYANT J BROOKS
Represented By: NATALIE M. DEJEAN
Represented By: KENNETH W DEJEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVELYN MIMS
Represented By: JOSEPH D. LANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA MEEKS
Represented By: DANIEL A. NIGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH AXINN
Represented By: DANIEL A. NIGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLOTTE DOYLE
Represented By: PAIGE NICOLE BOLDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBIA JACKSON
Represented By: DANIEL A. NIGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA JOHNSON
Represented By: CALLE M. MENDENHALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA ANN WITTE
Represented By: MATIAS JOSE ADROGUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANICE BROWN
Represented By: DANIEL A. NIGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TREY WITTE
Represented By: MATIAS JOSE ADROGUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KERRIE KATHLEEN STEGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATALIE CORTEZ
Represented By: JOSE D. ROMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEVERLY PATTON
Represented By: Weston P. Pesillo
Represented By: Patricia L. McGrail
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Ries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE DOSS
Represented By: JOSEPH D. LANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANET CHESTER
Represented By: JOSEPH D. LANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THERESE FOUGERE
Represented By: Evan J. Godofsky
Represented By: Morgan J. Wells, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Chike Obioha
Represented By: Pius Akamdi Obioha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FELICIA C. BLAKE
Represented By: NATALIE M. DEJEAN
Represented By: KENNETH W DEJEAN
Represented By: L Clayton Burgess
Represented By: ADAM R. CREDEUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY S. PATTON
Represented By: Weston P. Pesillo
Represented By: Patricia L. McGrail
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Ries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEITH M. BLAKE
Represented By: NATALIE M. DEJEAN
Represented By: KENNETH W DEJEAN
Represented By: L Clayton Burgess
Represented By: ADAM R. CREDEUR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: VALSARTAN N-NITROSODIMETHYLAMINE (NDMA) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?