PENZA v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE PENZA
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION and COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2020cv01778
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by STEPHANIE PENZA. (GIORDANO, THOMAS)
March 6, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dmr)
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Summons to be Issued by STEPHANIE PENZA as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. (GIORDANO, THOMAS)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED ORDER Granting IFP application; ORDERED that the Clerk shall file the Complaint. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 2/28/2020. (dmr)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S LETTER: Transmittal of USM 285 Forms. (dmr)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting IFP application; ORDERED that the Clerk shall file the Complaint; ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue summons for the US Marshal to serve. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 2/27/2020. (dmr)
February 25, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Amended Complaint #3 filed by THOMAS J. GIORDANO on 2/24/2020 was submitted incorrectly using the "Complaint" event used for initial complaints. In the future, please us the "Amended Complaint" event. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (dmr)
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by STEPHANIE PENZA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application IFP)(GIORDANO, THOMAS)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's IFP application; Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within 10 days etc. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 2/21/2020. (cry, )
February 20, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Complaint entered by STEPHANIE PENZA on 2/19/20 was submitted with an Application for In forma pauperis (IFP). For future filings of complaints with an IFP application please use the event COMPLAINT RECEIVED, which can be found under Service of Process. This message is for informational purposes only. (cry, )
February 20, 2020 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, )
February 19, 2020 Judge Renee Marie Bumb added. (dd, )
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, filed by STEPHANIE PENZA. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(GIORDANO, THOMAS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/20/2020: #3 Text of Proposed Order) (cry, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PENZA v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE PENZA
Represented By: THOMAS J. GIORDANO, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?