ZABACK et al v. SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC.
Plaintiff: ZABACK, BRENT GARRETT, BRITTANY FUNK, ALLAN ZABACK, JAMES JONES and RANDY ROBBIE
Defendant: SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02845
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Robert B Kugler
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATED CONSENT ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE AND SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE. This action is consolidated for all purposes under the docket of Powell v. Subaru of America, Inc., No. 1:19-cv-19114-NLH-JS. The Clerk shall close the Zaback case, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 4/29/2020. (dmr)
April 29, 2020 Cases associated: Create association to 1:19-cv-19114-NLH-JS. (dmr)
April 29, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (dmr)
April 28, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION and Consent Order to Consolidate and Set Briefing Schedule by SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC.. (WATKINS, CASEY)
April 28, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC.. SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC. waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (WATKINS, CASEY)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BRITTANY FUNK, ALLAN ZABACK, RANDY ROBBIE, BRENT GARRETT, JAMES JONES. SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC. served on 4/22/2020, answer due 5/13/2020. (WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL)
April 21, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BRITTANY FUNK, BRENT GARRETT, JAMES JONES, RANDY ROBBIE, ALLAN ZABACK. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit)(WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL)
April 21, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Affidavit of Jason S. Rathod attached to the Motion for Pro Hac Vice #4 submitted by MICHAEL WEINKOWITZ on 4/21/2020 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER SCANNED SIGNATURE using the "Affidavit in Support" event found under Response and Replies. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dmr)
April 21, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 5/18/2020 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED DOCUMENT by BRITTANY FUNK, BRENT GARRETT, JAMES JONES, RANDY ROBBIE, ALLAN ZABACK. Amendment to #1 Complaint Amended Signature Page. (WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10555160) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Randy Robbie, Allan Zaback, James Jones, Brittany Funk, Brent Garrett.(WEINKOWITZ, MICHAEL)
March 16, 2020 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
March 16, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Party Information,Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS. In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do not select "all plaintiffs" or "all defendants." . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZABACK et al v. SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZABACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENT GARRETT
Represented By: DANIEL CALEB LEVIN
Represented By: MICHAEL M. WEINKOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRITTANY FUNK
Represented By: DANIEL CALEB LEVIN
Represented By: MICHAEL M. WEINKOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLAN ZABACK
Represented By: DANIEL CALEB LEVIN
Represented By: MICHAEL M. WEINKOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES JONES
Represented By: DANIEL CALEB LEVIN
Represented By: MICHAEL M. WEINKOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDY ROBBIE
Represented By: DANIEL CALEB LEVIN
Represented By: MICHAEL M. WEINKOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?