AMTRUST NORTH AMERICA v. GENERAL MOTORS COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: AMTRUST NORTH AMERICA and JEFFREY BURGESS
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS COMPANY, APTIV PLC, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10, SMALL BUICK GMC, DELPHI TECHNOLOGIES, JOHN AND JANES DOES 1-10, DEF COMPANIES 1-10 and DELPHI AUTOMOTIVE PLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv05285
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (dd, )
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: The Initial Conference scheduled for May 27, 2020 is hereby cancelled. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 5/15/20 (Shaw, A).
May 14, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal by AMTRUST NORTH AMERICA. (HESSEL, DANIEL)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER This matter comes before the Court upon Plaintiff's letter requesting dismissal of all claims and all parties without prejudice. Plaintiff is directed to file a stipulation of dismissal signed by all parties who have appeared, in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 05/08/2020. (Costigan, Roberta)
May 8, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by AMTRUST NORTH AMERICA (HESSEL, DANIEL)
May 6, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMTRUST NORTH AMERICA. (HESSEL, DANIEL)
May 1, 2020 Filing 11 Letter from Counsel for Defendant, Smail Buick GMC. (BUNIS, LAWRENCE)
May 1, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SMALL BUICK GMC. (BUNIS, LAWRENCE)
May 1, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from General Motors Company to Judge Bumb. (GREY, FRANCIS)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER This matter comes before the Court upon a Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 5], filed by Defendant General Motors Company ("GM") on April 29, 2020. The Court notes that GM filed its motion without first complying with Section I.A. of this Court's Individual Rules and Procedures, which states that "In an effort to resolve cases expeditiously, before bringing a motion to dismiss a party must submit a letter," as described therein. Therefore, GM's Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. No. 5] is ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED. If GM wishes to bring its motion, it should first comply with this Court's individual pre-motion procedures. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 05/01/2020. (Costigan, Roberta)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SMALL BUICK GMC.(KAPLAN, ROBERT)
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN LEE WOLENSKY on behalf of GENERAL MOTORS COMPANY (WOLENSKY, BRIAN)
April 30, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 6/1/2020 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by GENERAL MOTORS COMPANY. Responses due by 5/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B)(GREY, FRANCIS)
April 29, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by GENERAL MOTORS COMPANY. (GREY, FRANCIS)
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GENERAL MOTORS COMPANY. (GREY, FRANCIS)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Initial Conference set for 5/27/2020 10:30 AM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 4/29/2020. (cry, )
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GENERAL MOTORS COMPANY ("GM") from Superior Court, Atlantic County, case number 0898-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10749488), filed by GENERAL MOTORS COMPANY ("GM"). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(GREY, FRANCIS)
April 29, 2020 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
April 29, 2020 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, )
April 29, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (cry, )
April 29, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Cause of Action,Jury Demand,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMTRUST NORTH AMERICA v. GENERAL MOTORS COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS COMPANY
Represented By: FRANCIS J. GREY, JR.
Represented By: BRIAN LEE WOLENSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APTIV PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMALL BUICK GMC
Represented By: ROBERT M. KAPLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELPHI TECHNOLOGIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANES DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEF COMPANIES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELPHI AUTOMOTIVE PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMTRUST NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: DANIEL L. HESSEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY BURGESS
Represented By: DANIEL L. HESSEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?