HENDERSON v. ORTIZ
Petitioner: BRIAN D. HENDERSON
Respondent: WARDEN DAVID ORTIZ
Case Number: 1:2020cv05769
Filed: May 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Dismissing the petition for writ of habeas corpus #1 . Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 6/19/2020. (rtm, )(nm)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 OPINION. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 6/19/2020. (rtm, )(nm)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from BRIAN D. HENDERSON requesting appointment of counsel and an extension of time to reply to the government's response. (rtm, )(nm)
June 18, 2020 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number CAM011445 (dd, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by DAVID ORTIZ. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christina Clark with Exhibit, #2 Declaration of James Reiser with Exhibits, #3 Certificate of Service)(PASCAL, ELIZABETH)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO ANSWER Respondent shall file an answer within 7 days of the date of this entry responding to the allegations and grounds in the Petition, etc. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 5/12/2020. (rtm, )(nm)
May 11, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus COVID-19, filed by BRIAN D. HENDERSON. NO FF/IFP (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HENDERSON v. ORTIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN DAVID ORTIZ
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: ELIZABETH ANN PASCAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BRIAN D. HENDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?