U.S. ASIA GLOBAL, INC. v. GLOBAL GEEKS, INC.
Plaintiff: U.S. Asia Global, Inc.
Defendant: Global Geeks, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv05783
Filed: May 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:5
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Renee Marie Bumb: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 6/1/2020. Continued hearing on #7 Application/Petition for a Preliminary Injunction. The parties reported the case settled. Terms of the settlement placed on the record. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter Ted Formaroli) (ar1, )
May 29, 2020 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number TRE111621 as to S. Joshua Kahane, Esq. (jjc, )
May 28, 2020 Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Renee Marie Bumb: Miscellaneous Hearing held on 5/28/2020. Hearing on #7 Application/Petition for a Preliminary Injunction. Ordered hearing continued until 6/1/20 at 2:00p.m. (Court Reporter Ted Formaroli) (ar1, )
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER Upon review of the parties' briefing, the Court finds that a hearing is necessary to address Plaintiff's motion for emergency relief. Therefore, the Court will hold a hearing tomorrow, on Thursday, May 28, 2020, at 10:00am via Zoom video conference. In the event that the Court has any questions for the parties, Counsel is required to ensure that their respective clients are available by telephone during the course of the hearing. Counsel shall contact Judge Bumb's Courtroom Deputy, Arthur Roney, at arthur_roney@njd.uscourts.gov, as soon as possible to provide an email address to which the Zoom invitation will be sent. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 05/27/2020. (Costigan, Roberta)
May 26, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, AUBREY B. GREER, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (tf, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 25 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Aubrey B. Greer, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-10856060.) (SORATHIA, ALEENA)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Aubrey B. Greer, Esquire; shall make a payment of $150.00 to the Clerk of the United States District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 5/26/2020. (tf, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE re #21 Letter. (SORATHIA, ALEENA)
May 22, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE re 17 Order,,. (SORATHIA, ALEENA)
May 21, 2020 Filing 21 Letter re 18 Order, 17 Order,,. (CHEWNING, KERRI)
May 20, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE re 19 Order,. (SORATHIA, ALEENA)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER In furtherance of the Court's Text Order, the Plaintiff shall address by written submission whether it intends to advise potential buyer(s) of the masks that a claim that they are "counterfeit KN95 masks" had been made and remains unresolved in this litigation. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 05/20/2020. (Costigan, Roberta)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: Defense counsel shall advise if there is any objection to the pending pro hac motion. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 5/20/2020. (slc)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER The hearing scheduled for May 22, 2020 is cancelled. Defendant shall file a response to the Emergent Application [Docket No. 7] by Friday, May 22, 2020 at 12:00p.m. Defendant shall address why it has refused to release the 476,000 pieces of PPE/masks while the parties attempt to work out the issue of monetary damages. Both parties shall also submit by that deadline a joint letter detailing what efforts they have taken to resolve the matter to obviate the need for emergency relief from the Court during such challenging times. The Court will determine whether to hold a hearing once it receives such submission. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 05/20/2020. (Costigan, Roberta)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Renee Marie Bumb for all further proceedings. Judge Robert B. Kugler no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/20/2020. (mmb, )
May 20, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Aubrey B. Greer, Esq.. Motion set for 6/15/2020 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Aubrey B. Greer, Esq. by U.S. ASIA GLOBAL, INC.. (SORATHIA, ALEENA)
May 20, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel submitted by Aleena Sorathia on 5/19/2020 cannot be processed until the application fee has been paid. Please review the Electronic Notification for Pro Hac Vice instructions on our website. Counsel is advised to resubmit the Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel once payment has been recorded. This message is for informational purposes only. (tf, )
May 19, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by KERRI E. CHEWNING on behalf of GLOBAL GEEKS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CHEWNING, KERRI)
May 19, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GLOBAL GEEKS, INC. identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CHEWNING, KERRI)
May 19, 2020 Filing 12 BRIEF in Response to Order to Show Cause and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Inunction (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Abdul Loul with attached exhibits, #2 Certificate of Service)(CHEWNING, KERRI)
May 19, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice S. Joshua Kahane, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SORATHIA, ALEENA)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to S. Joshua Kahane, Esquire; shall make a payment of $150.00 to the Clerk of the United States District Court. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 5/22/2020. (tf, )
May 15, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by U.S. ASIA GLOBAL, INC.. GLOBAL GEEKS, INC. waiver sent on 5/15/2020, answer due 7/14/2020. (SORATHIA, ALEENA)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff's Application #7 is GRANTED IN PART andDENIED IN PART. The Court will not issue an ex parte TRO but will employ an expedited procedure to hear this matter. The Court shall hold a preliminary injunction hearing at 11:00am on May 22, 2020. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 5/13/2020. (tf, )
May 13, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Application/Petition submitted by A. Sorathia on 5/12/2020 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. Please be advised, pro hac vice counsel are not permitted to sign documents with s/. This message is for informational purposes only. (tf, )
May 13, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of S. Joshua Kahane, Esq.. Motion set for 6/15/2020 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
May 12, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION/PETITION for ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION for by U.S. ASIA GLOBAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(SORATHIA, ALEENA)
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH ZAFFARESE on behalf of U.S. ASIA GLOBAL, INC. (ZAFFARESE, JOSEPH)
May 12, 2020 Filing 5 Amended MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of S. Joshua Kahane, Esq. by U.S. ASIA GLOBAL, INC.. (SORATHIA, ALEENA)
May 12, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Motion for Pro Hac Vice #3 submitted by Aleena Sorathia on 5/12/2020 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (tf, )
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert B. Kugler for all further proceedings. Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/12/20. (dd, )
May 12, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of S. Joshua Kahane, Esq., by U.S. ASIA GLOBAL, INC.. (SORATHIA, ALEENA)
May 12, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
May 12, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to GLOBAL GEEKS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
May 11, 2020 Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
May 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Global Geeks, Inc. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10799351), filed by U.S. Asia Global, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(SORATHIA, ALEENA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. ASIA GLOBAL, INC. v. GLOBAL GEEKS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Asia Global, Inc.
Represented By: ALEENA YASMEEN SORATHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Geeks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?