EHRLICH v. ALVAREZ et al
Plaintiff: JONATHAN S. EHRLICH
Defendant: JUDGE SUSAN F MAVEN, CARMEN H. ALVAREZ, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-30, GLENN GRANT, MICHAEL J. KASSEL, PHILIP D. MURPHY, JUDGE WILLIAM E. NUGENT, FRANCINE L. AXELRAD, GURBIR S. GREWAL, BONNIE NUTT MADERA, JUDGE KAREN L. SUTER, STUART RABNER, DIANE GEROFSKY, RICHARD J. STEIGER, RONALD E. BOOKBINDER, HARRY O'MALLEY, MICHAEL J. HOGAN, GEORGE KOTCH, HON. MARY C. JACOBSON and JOHN TONELLI
Case Number: 1:2020cv06398
Filed: May 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Robert B Kugler
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Filing 4 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-02134. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 27, 2020 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER FORTHWITH THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 5/26/20. 5/26/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(jpd,)
May 22, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 214675 (amas, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CARMEN H. ALVAREZ, FRANCINE L. AXELRAD, RONALD E. BOOKBINDER, DIANE GEROFSKY, GLENN GRANT, GURBIR S. GREWAL, MICHAEL J. HOGAN, MARY C. JACOBSON, JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-30, MICHAEL J. KASSEL, GEORGE KOTCH, BONNIE NUTT MADERA, SUSAN F. MAVEN, PHILIP D MURPHY, WILLIAM E. NUGENT, HARRY O'MALLEY, STUART RABNER, RICHARD J. STEIGER, KAREN L. SUTER, JOHN TONELLI, filed by JONATHAN S. EHRLICH. (NO FEE; NO IFP)(Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 DEFENDANTS LIST)(bw, ) Modified on 5/4/2020 (bw, ).
May 1, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JONATHAN S. EHRLICH. (bw, ) Modified on 5/5/2020 (lisad, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EHRLICH v. ALVAREZ et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDGE SUSAN F MAVEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARMEN H. ALVAREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENN GRANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL J. KASSEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIP D. MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDGE WILLIAM E. NUGENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCINE L. AXELRAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GURBIR S. GREWAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BONNIE NUTT MADERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUDGE KAREN L. SUTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STUART RABNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANE GEROFSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD J. STEIGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD E. BOOKBINDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRY O'MALLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL J. HOGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE KOTCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HON. MARY C. JACOBSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN TONELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN S. EHRLICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?