800 CREEK ACQUISITIONS, LLC et al v. LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: CLEAN GREEN TEXTILE SERVICES, LLC, 800 CREEK ACQUISITIONS, LLC and CLEAN GREEN TEXTILE SERVICES, LLC doing business as SINGLE SOURCE PLUS
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2020cv06846
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 9/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 7/31/2020. (rss, )
July 30, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Settlement Conference held on 7/30/2020. (se, )
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the settlement conference on July 30, 2020 will begin at 3:30 p.m. The dial in information is the same. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 7/28/20. (Shaw, A)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the settlement conference on July 30, 2020 will begin at 3:00 p.m. The dial in information is the same. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 7/28/20. (Shaw, A)
July 1, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Initial Conference held via telephone on 7/1/2020. (se, )
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The Court having held an initial conference by phone on July 1, 2020, it is hereby ORDERED Rule 26 disclosures shall be served by July 15, 2020. The Court will hold a settlement conference by phone on July 30, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. Clients and representatives with settlement authority shall be available by phone. The call in and access numbers have already been provided. Confidential settlement memos shall be served via fax or email at least three (3) days before the conference. It is further ORDERED plaintiffs bad faith and Consumer Fraud Act claims are SEVERED and STAYED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 7/1/20. (Shaw, A)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.(O'LEARY, JEREMIAH)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 Joint Discovery Plan by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY.(MOLFETTA, FRANK)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANK G. MOLFETTA on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (MOLFETTA, FRANK)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: The Court is prepared to go forward with the initial Conference scheduled for July 1, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. via telephone. The call-in number is 1-888-684-8852, access code 3436790#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/23/20. (Shaw, A)
June 12, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/25/2020. (rtm, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company. Attorney JEREMIAH L. O'LEARY for LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY added. (O'LEARY, JEREMIAH)
June 4, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set for 7/1/2020 09:30 AM in Camden - Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 6/4/2020. (cry, )
June 4, 2020 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, )
June 4, 2020 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (O'LEARY, JEREMIAH)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY from Camden County Superior Court, case number CAM-L-1356-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10900849), filed by LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal - Camden County Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'LEARY, JEREMIAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 800 CREEK ACQUISITIONS, LLC et al v. LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLEAN GREEN TEXTILE SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: DAVID A. WARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 800 CREEK ACQUISITIONS, LLC
Represented By: DAVID A. WARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLEAN GREEN TEXTILE SERVICES, LLC doing business as SINGLE SOURCE PLUS
Represented By: DAVID A. WARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JEREMIAH L. O'LEARY
Represented By: FRANK G. MOLFETTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?