U.A. LOCAL 322 PENSION FUND et al v. DIRECT AIR L.L.C.
Plaintiff: U.A. LOCAL 322 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, U.A. LOCAL 322 ANNUITY FUND, LOCAL 322 OF THE UNITED ASSOCIATION OF JOURNEYMEN AND APPRENTICES OF THE PLUMBING AND PIPE FITTING INDUSTRY OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA, AFL-CIO, U.A. LOCAL 322 POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE, U.A. LOCAL 322 PENSION FUND, U.A. LOCAL 322 EDUCATION FUND and KURT R. KRUEGER, JR.
Defendant: DIRECT AIR L.L.C. doing business as Direct Air, LLC doing business as Direct Air Heating & Cooling
Case Number: 1:2020cv09003
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Initial Conference set for 10/6/2020 10:30 AM in Camden - Room 2010 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 8/27/2020. (tf, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by DIRECT AIR L.L.C..(GIACOMETTI, HARRY)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Lynn of Direct Air, LLC on 07/31/2020, filed by KURT R. KRUEGER, JR, LOCAL 322 OF THE UNITED ASSOCIATION OF JOURNEYMEN AND APPRENTICES OF THE PLUMBING AND PIPE FITTING INDUSTRY OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA, AFL-CIO, U.A. LOCAL 322 ANNUITY FUND, U.A. LOCAL 322 EDUCATION FUND, U.A. LOCAL 322 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, U.A. LOCAL 322 PENSION FUND, U.A. LOCAL 322 POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE. (MCCARTHY, RYAN)
July 16, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DIRECT AIR L.L.C.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
July 16, 2020 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, )
July 16, 2020 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KURT R. KRUEGER, JR, LOCAL 322 OF THE UNITED ASSOCIATION OF JOURNEYMEN AND APPRENTICES OF THE PLUMBING AND PIPE FITTING INDUSTRY OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA, AFL-CIO, U.A. LOCAL 322 ANNUITY FUND, U.A. LOCAL 322 EDUCATION FUND, U.A. LOCAL 322 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, U.A. LOCAL 322 PENSION FUND, U.A. LOCAL 322 POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE. (MCCARTHY, RYAN)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Direct Air L.L.C. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11084735), filed by U.A. LOCAL 322 POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE, U.A. LOCAL 322 ANNUITY FUND, KURT R. KRUEGER, JR, U.A. LOCAL 322 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND, U.A. LOCAL 322 EDUCATION FUND, U.A. LOCAL 322 PENSION FUND, LOCAL 322 OF THE UNITED ASSOCIATION OF JOURNEYMEN AND APPRENTICES OF THE PLUMBING AND PIPE FITTING INDUSTRY OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(MCCARTHY, RYAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.A. LOCAL 322 PENSION FUND et al v. DIRECT AIR L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.A. LOCAL 322 HEALTH & WELFARE FUND
Represented By: RYAN PATRICK MCCARTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.A. LOCAL 322 ANNUITY FUND
Represented By: RYAN PATRICK MCCARTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOCAL 322 OF THE UNITED ASSOCIATION OF JOURNEYMEN AND APPRENTICES OF THE PLUMBING AND PIPE FITTING INDUSTRY OF THE UNITED STATES AND CANADA, AFL-CIO
Represented By: RYAN PATRICK MCCARTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.A. LOCAL 322 POLITICAL ACTION COMMITTEE
Represented By: RYAN PATRICK MCCARTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.A. LOCAL 322 PENSION FUND
Represented By: RYAN PATRICK MCCARTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.A. LOCAL 322 EDUCATION FUND
Represented By: RYAN PATRICK MCCARTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KURT R. KRUEGER, JR.
Represented By: RYAN PATRICK MCCARTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECT AIR L.L.C. doing business as Direct Air, LLC doing business as Direct Air Heating & Cooling
Represented By: HARRY J. GIACOMETTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?