FIELDS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: KELLIE FIELDS
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2020cv09013
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Robert B Kugler
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT ANTHONY PETRUZZELLI on behalf of KELLIE FIELDS (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(PETRUZZELLI, ROBERT)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KELLIE FIELDS. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY served on 7/24/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service U S Attorney General, #2 Proof of service of General Counsel, #3 Proof of Service on U S Attty Carpenito)(MELLO, TIMOTHY)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
July 16, 2020 Judge Robert B. Kugler added. (dd, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11085417), filed by KELLIE FIELDS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service)(MELLO, TIMOTHY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FIELDS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLIE FIELDS
Represented By: TIMOTHY JOSEPH MELLO
Represented By: ROBERT ANTHONY PETRUZZELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?