SOUTH v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Plaintiff: MS. JASON SOUTH and Anna
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Case Number: 1:2020cv09045
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Robert B Kugler
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from MS. JASON SOUTH re: status of Pro Bono Counsel appointment. (Docket sheet sent) (dmr)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 Letter from MS. JASON SOUTH re #7 Address Change (Docket sheet resent). (dmr)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by JASON SOUTH (Docket sheet sent) (dmr)
August 11, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Amend. Motion set for 9/8/2020 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend by JASON SOUTH. (dmr)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Clerk to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel; Granting Plaintiff's IFP application and Directing the Clerk to file the complaint; Dismissing Plaintiffs Bivens claim WITH PREJUDICE; Allowing Plaintiffs Rehabilitation Act and Affordable Care Act claims to PROCEED; Directing appointed counsel enter a notice of appearance within seven (7) days of the date of appointment and within twenty (20) days file a counseled amended complaint; Plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction is TERMINATED WITHOUT PREJUDICE etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/1/2020. (cry, n.m.)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 8/1/2020. (cry, n.m.)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION to Amend Exhibit Documents to Emergency Preliminary Injunction by JASON SOUTH. (dmr)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Amend Emergency Injunction by JASON SOUTH. (dmr)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Exhibit, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope)(cry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOUTH v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MS. JASON SOUTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?