JAN'S BOUTIQUE, INC. v. CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA et al
Plaintiff: JAN'S BOUTIQUE, INC.
Defendant: CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, ABC COMPANIES (1-10), JOHN DOES (1- 10) and THE HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP
Case Number: 1:2020cv09984
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph H Rodriguez
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Initial Conference by phone held on 9/2/2020. (se, )
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The Court having held an initial conference by phone on September 2, 2020, it is hereby ORDERED the following scheduling deadlines shall apply: Service of Rule 26 Disclosures to be served by September 9, 2020; Service of written discovery to be completed by September 16, 2020; Service of Discovery Confidentiality Order to be signed by the Court to be filed no later than October 1, 2020; the deadline to file motions to amend pleadings is November 2, 2020; Fact discovery deadline is February 26, 2021; Plaintiffs expert report to be served by March 31, 2021; Defendants expert report to be served by April 30, 2021; Expert depositions to be completed by May 31, 2021; Dispositive motions to be filed no later than June 15, 2021; A telephone status conference call is scheduled for February 1, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. The call-in number for the call is 1-888-684-8852, access code 3436790#. Discovery dispute letters are due to the Court three (3) days prior to the scheduled conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/2/20. (Shaw, A).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The Court is prepared to go forward with the initial conference scheduled on September 2, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. via telephone. The call-in number for the call is 1-888-684-8852, access code 3436790#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/21/20. (Shaw, A).
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendant The Hanover Insurance Group Only by CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, THE HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendant The Hanover Insurance Group Only)(ZAGHA, JONATHAN)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 Joint Discovery Plan by CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, THE HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP. (Attachments: #1 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan)(ZAGHA, JONATHAN)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JAN'S BOUTIQUE, INC.. (WILLIAMS, ROBERT)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN M. ZAGHA on behalf of CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, THE HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP (ZAGHA, JONATHAN)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set for 9/2/2020 11:00 AM in Camden - Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/4/2020. (cry, )
August 4, 2020 Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, THE HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP. (O'LEARY, JEREMIAH)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA from Camden County Superior Court, case number CAM-L-2035-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11161353), filed by THE HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP, CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - C to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'LEARY, JEREMIAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JAN'S BOUTIQUE, INC. v. CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAN'S BOUTIQUE, INC.
Represented By: ASHLEY NECHEMIA
Represented By: ROBERT WINFIELD WILLIAMS
Represented By: ASHLEY SOBLE NECHEMIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIZENS INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: JEREMIAH L. O'LEARY
Represented By: JONATHAN M. ZAGHA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC COMPANIES (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES (1- 10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HANOVER INSURANCE GROUP
Represented By: JEREMIAH L. O'LEARY
Represented By: JONATHAN M. ZAGHA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?