DUNMORE v. POWELL
Petitioner: MIDDLETOWN DUNMORE
Respondent: JOHN POWELL
Case Number: 1:2020cv10682
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Respondent's request for a 45 day extension, until December 14th, to file an answer or motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 9/30/2020. (tf, n.m.)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Respondent re #2 Order to Answer, #4 Letter. (PICKERING, GRETCHEN)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from respondent's counsel re #3 Letter: Remove DAG from noticing, #2 Order to Answer,. (PICKERING, GRETCHEN)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 Letter request from DAG to be removed from noticing.. (HENDERSON, CAROL)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO ANSWER: Respondents may file a Motion to Dismiss within forty-five (45) days of the date this Order is filed; if Respondents do not file a Motion to Dismiss the Petition, they shall file a full and complete Answer to all claims asserted in the Petition within forty-five (45) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 9/14/2020. (tf, n.m.)
August 25, 2020 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number CAM011602 (dd, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by MIDDLETOWN DUNMORE. NO IFP/FF (Attachments: #1 ENVELOPE)(pr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DUNMORE v. POWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOHN POWELL
Represented By: JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN
Represented By: GRETCHEN ANDERSON PICKERING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MIDDLETOWN DUNMORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?