GALARZA et al v. TURNWALL et al
Plaintiff: MARTA GALARZA and HEDILBERTO GALARZA
Defendant: EAN HOLDINGS, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10, JOHN DOES 1-10, MICHAEL P. TURNWALL and CENTER STAGING, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv10805
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Joseph H Rodriguez
Referring Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider: Initial Conference by phone held on 9/16/2020. (se, )
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: The Court having held a telephone initial conference on September 16, 2020, it is hereby ORDERED the following scheduling deadlines shall apply: Service of Rule 26 Disclosures to be served by September 30, 2020; Service of written discovery to be completed by October 16, 2020; Service of Discovery Confidentiality Order to be signed by the Court to be filed no later than October 16, 2020; the deadline to file motions to amend pleadings is December 31, 2020; Fact discovery deadline is February 26, 2021; Plaintiffs expert report to be served by March 31, 2021; Defendants expert report to be served by April 30, 2021; Dispositive motions to be filed no later than May 14, 2021; This case will be listed for Arbitration in June 2021. A telephone status conference call is scheduled for February 9, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. The call-in number for the call is 1-888-684-8852, access code 3436790#. Discovery dispute letters are due to the Court three (3) days prior to the scheduled conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/16/20. (Shaw, A).
September 15, 2020 Filing 14 Letter from John M. Palm. (PALM, JOHN)
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against JOHN DOES 1-10, COUNTERCLAIM against HEDILBERTO GALARZA by EAN HOLDINGS.(PALM, JOHN)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT ORDER Extending Time to Answer the Complaint by 10/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/14/2020. (dmr, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 11 STATEMENT Plaintiff's Disclosure Statement by All Plaintiffs. (HORIATES, GEORGE)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 Proposed Order extend time to answer by EAN HOLDINGS. (PALM, JOHN)
September 10, 2020 Clerk's Text Order - The document #9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by EAN HOLDINGS has been DENIED. (dmr)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to EAN Holdings. Attorney JOHN MICHAEL PALM for EAN HOLDINGS added. (PALM, JOHN)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EAN HOLDINGS. (PALM, JOHN)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN MICHAEL PALM on behalf of EAN HOLDINGS (PALM, JOHN)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND with Affirmative Defenses and Affirmative, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by MICHAEL P. TURNWALL, CENTER STAGING, LLC.(TYRRELL, JOHN)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: The Court is prepared to go forward with the initial conference scheduled on September 16, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. via telephone. The call-in number for the call is 1-888-684-8852, access code 3436790#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/27/20. (Shaw, A).
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JACQUELINE L. ZOLLER on behalf of CENTER STAGING, LLC, MICHAEL P. TURNWALL (ZOLLER, JACQUELINE)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CENTER STAGING, LLC, MICHAEL P. TURNWALL. (TYRRELL, JOHN)
August 19, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action,Jury Demand,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (pr, )
August 19, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (pr, )
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Initial Conference set for 9/16/2020 10:00 AM in Camden - Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 08/19/2020. (pr, )
August 19, 2020 Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MICHAEL P. TURNWALL, CENTER STAGING, LLC from Superior Court Camden County, case number L-02149-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11230421), filed by MICHAEL P. TURNWALL, CENTER STAGING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(TYRRELL, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GALARZA et al v. TURNWALL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAN HOLDINGS
Represented By: JOHN MICHAEL PALM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL P. TURNWALL
Represented By: JACQUELINE L. ZOLLER
Represented By: JOHN E. TYRRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTER STAGING, LLC
Represented By: JACQUELINE L. ZOLLER
Represented By: JOHN E. TYRRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTA GALARZA
Represented By: GEORGE G. HORIATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEDILBERTO GALARZA
Represented By: GEORGE G. HORIATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?