PHYSICIAN AND TACTICAL HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC v. INOVA HEALTH CARE SERVICES
Plaintiff: PHYSICIAN AND TACTICAL HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC
Defendant: INOVA HEALTH CARE SERVICES
Case Number: 1:2020cv10808
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Referring Judge: Karen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 11/16/2020 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss . (RARDIN, JONATHAN)
October 2, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 11/2/2020 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by INOVA HEALTH CARE SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Certification of Susan Karlovich, #4 Exhibit)(KARLOVICH, SUSAN)
September 11, 2020 Clerk's Text Order - The document #8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by INOVA HEALTH CARE SERVICES has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/1/2020. (dmr)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Inova Health Care Services. Attorney SUSAN KARLOVICH for INOVA HEALTH CARE SERVICES added. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appearance, #2 Certificate of Service Certification of Service)(KARLOVICH, SUSAN)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHYSICIAN AND TACTICAL HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC. INOVA HEALTH CARE SERVICES served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. (RARDIN, JONATHAN)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint served on Ashleigh Nobers, Agent in Charge on 8/31/20, filed by PHYSICIAN AND TACTICAL HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC. (RARDIN, JONATHAN)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against INOVA HEALTH CARE SERVICES, filed by PHYSICIAN AND TACTICAL HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-11)(RARDIN, JONATHAN)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff shall have fifteen (15) days to amend its complaint to properly comply with 28 U.S.C. 1332. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 8/28/2020. (dmr)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHYSICIAN AND TACTICAL HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC. (RARDIN, JONATHAN)
August 19, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (cry, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to INOVA HEALTH CARE SERVICES. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties, #click here, no later than the first Rule 16 conference.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 8/19/2020. (cry, )
August 19, 2020 Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PHYSICIAN AND TACTICAL HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11230531) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PHYSICIAN AND TACTICAL HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-11, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(RARDIN, JONATHAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHYSICIAN AND TACTICAL HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC v. INOVA HEALTH CARE SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHYSICIAN AND TACTICAL HEALTHCARE SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: JONATHAN P. RARDIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INOVA HEALTH CARE SERVICES
Represented By: SUSAN KARLOVICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?