WUNDER CAPITAL V, LLC et al v. CLEANLIGHT POWER+ENERGY, MT. LAUREL, LLC
Plaintiff: WUNDER CAPITAL V, LLC and PROJECT 300533, LLC
Defendant: CLEANLIGHT POWER+ENERGY, MT. LAUREL, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv10822
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Referring Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT ANTHONY MCKINLEY on behalf of PROJECT 300533, LLC, WUNDER CAPITAL V, LLC (MCKINLEY, ROBERT)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's letter requesting an adjournment of tomorrow's hearing. The hearing is adjourned without date. The Court wishes Mr. Doto a speedy recovery. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 09/23/2020. (Costigan, Roberta)
September 23, 2020 Filing 16 Letter from Plaintiffs. (DOTO, STEVEN)
September 23, 2020 Filing 15 BRIEF in Opposition to ECF #2 Application for Preliminary Injunctive Relief (Attachment #1 to Complaint) (Attachments: #1 Certification of Karen Lichten, Managing Member of Defendant)(POLLACK, MITCHELL)
September 23, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Memorandum in Opposition #14 filed by Mitchell Pollack on 9/22/2020 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. Please be advised the motion event should be used when filing a formal motion only. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE RESPONSE WITH THE PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE (s/ Attorney's Name.) (tf, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 14 Counter MOTION re #2 Complaint, Opposition to Plaintiffs' OTSC for Preliminary Injunctive Relief by CLEANLIGHT POWER+ENERGY, MT. LAUREL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Karen Lichten, Managing Member of Defendant)(POLLACK, MITCHELL)
September 16, 2020 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Renee Marie Bumb: Temporary Restraint hearing held via video on 9/16/2020. Hearing on plaintiffs pending Temporary Restraints. Ordered Temporary Restraints extended and brief by defendant to the Order to Show due by 9/23/20. Ordered defendant to produce certain documents and Preliminary Injunction Hearing with witnesses set for 9/24/20 at 10:00a.m. (Court Reporter Ted Formaroli) (ar1, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Renee Marie Bumb: Telephone Conference held on 9/4/2020. (Court Reporter Ted Formaroli) (ar1, ) Modified on 10/2/2020 (ar1).
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Temporary Restraints pending the September 16, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Conference and Extending time for defendant to file an answer or otherwise plead pending further Order of the Court. The Court will hold a hearing on September 16, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 9/4/20. (dd, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 10 Proposed Order for TRO and Extension to Answer/Move by CLEANLIGHT POWER+ENERGY, MT. LAUREL, LLC re #9 Proposed Pretrial Order, 8 Order. (POLLACK, MITCHELL)
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Order for TRO by PROJECT 300533, LLC, WUNDER CAPITAL V, LLC. (DOTO, STEVEN)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER. The Court will conduct a telephone conference today at 11:30 a.m. Counsel shall use the following call in information. 1-888-684-8852, Access code 22349999#. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 9/4/20. (Bumb, Renee)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Mitchell B. Pollack re 5 Order,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email re. Non Consent to Adjournment)(POLLACK, MITCHELL)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MITCHELL B. POLLACK on behalf of CLEANLIGHT POWER+ENERGY, MT. LAUREL, LLC (POLLACK, MITCHELL)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER. This matter comes before the Court upon the application filed by Plaintiff on August 19, 2020. [Docket No. 2.] It not appearing that Counsel for Defendant has yet entered an appearance, the Court will schedule a conference for September 8, 2020, at 10:30 a.m., at which, if Counsel for Defendant still has not entered its appearance, Counsel for Plaintiff will present its argument as to why the Court shall issue a temporary restraining order, or, if Counsel for Defendant has entered its appearance, the Court will hear argument as to whether the Court shall issue a preliminary order enjoining Defendant pursuant to Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The link to the conference, which will be held via Zoom, will be sent to the email addresses listed for Counsel on the docket. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 9/2/20. (ar1, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WUNDER CAPITAL V, LLC. All Defendants. (DOTO, STEVEN)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CLEANLIGHT POWER+ENERGY, MT. LAUREL, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, )
August 20, 2020 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (cry, )
August 19, 2020 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against CLEANLIGHT POWER+ENERGY, MT. LAUREL, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11231386), filed by WUNDER CAPITAL V, LLC, PROJECT 300533, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Summons)(cry, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROJECT 300533, LLC, WUNDER CAPITAL V, LLC. (DOTO, STEVEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WUNDER CAPITAL V, LLC et al v. CLEANLIGHT POWER+ENERGY, MT. LAUREL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WUNDER CAPITAL V, LLC
Represented By: STEVEN H. DOTO
Represented By: ROBERT ANTHONY MCKINLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROJECT 300533, LLC
Represented By: STEVEN H. DOTO
Represented By: ROBERT ANTHONY MCKINLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEANLIGHT POWER+ENERGY, MT. LAUREL, LLC
Represented By: MITCHELL B. POLLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?