GARRETT v. MURPHY
Petitioner: ALLEN DUPREE GARRETT
Respondent: GOVENOR PHIL MURPHY
Case Number: 1:2020cv11502
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Noel L Hillman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO ANSWER: Respondent shall file a full and complete answer to all claims asserted in the Petition within thirty (30) of the entry of this Order.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 10/14/2020. (tf, n.m.)
October 14, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from ALLEN DUPREE GARRETT dated 10/4/2020 (tf, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 3 SUBMISSION from ALLEN DUPREE GARRETT; re: Motion of Release of Dismissal of Complaint. (tf, )
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Granting Petitioner's IFP application. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 8/28/2020. (cry, n.m.)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus COVID-19, filed by ALLEN DUPREE GARRETT. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Order)(cry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GARRETT v. MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ALLEN DUPREE GARRETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: GOVENOR PHIL MURPHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?